Covert v. Graham et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv06626
Filed: October 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 50 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 12, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING re 61 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by R. Harrison, D. Graham. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/11/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
September 21, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/3/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/21/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
April 24, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
March 13, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by James W. Covert. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 31, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/30/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
December 4, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
September 1, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/31/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
July 20, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 12 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due within (14) fourteen-days from the date of this Order (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009) Modified on 7/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covert v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?