Hutchens et al v. Alameda County Social Services Agency et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv06870
Filed: November 3, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 128 Motion to Modify Minor Compromise (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) Modified on 12/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 126 Motion for Exemplary Manifest Justice. Mr. Hutchens is represented by counsel and CANNOT file documents pro se. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/11/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 123 Motion for Compromise. The minor's claims amount of $17,500 is approved. The settlement proceeds will be deposited forthwith into an interest earning annuity sponsored by Prudential Ins urance Company of America payable as follows: $15,000 on Baby's 18th birthday on 11/04/2023 and $27,912 on Baby's 25th birthday on 11/04/2030, for a total payout of $42,912. There will be no distributions of funds to any person(s) other than Baby. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified on 7/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009) Modified on 5/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 116 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009) Modified on 5/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING Request to Continue Case Management Conference. A telephonic case management conference is set for 10/16/2008 at 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/9/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008) Modified on 9/11/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchens et al v. Alameda County Social Services Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?