Fernandez et al v. K-M Industries Holding Co, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Fernandez, Lora Smith and Tosha Thomas
Defendant: K-M Industries Holding Co, Inc, K-M Industries Holding Co, Inc. ESOP Plan Committee, Wiliam E. and Desiree B. Moore Revocable Trust, Trustees of the William E. and Desiree B. Moore Revocable Trust, Administrator of the Estate of William E. Moore, Deceased, CIG ESOP Plan Committee, North Star Trust Company, Desiree B. Moore Revocable Trust, William E. Moore Marital Trust, William E. Moore Generation-Skipping Trust and Desiree B. Moore
Case Number: 4:2006cv07339
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER re 391 Granting MOTION Plantiff's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs, and Approval of Service Payments. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER re 379 granting Stipulation Setting Schedule for Class Action Settlement Approval. Fairness Hearing set for 4/22/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER re 373 granting as modified JOINT NOTICE of Settlement; Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, and STIPULATION Clearing All Dates in This Matter. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/1/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 334 North Star's Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Reconsideration And Alternative Motion For Entry Of Judgment Against Settling Defendants (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER re 330 CORRECTING ORDER DENYING NORTH STARS MOTION FORJUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND GRANTING THE SETTLING PARTIESCROSS-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOCKET NO. 330). Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/8/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 304 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 274 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER re 320 granting STIPULATION Modifying Hearing Date on Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER re 285 granting motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Cost, and Approval of Service Payments. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/8/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER re 293 granting STIPULATION SETTING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. Bench Trial set for 8/23/2010 08:30 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2009 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER re 245 granting STIPULATION Modifying Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/10/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER re 242 GRANTING STIPULATION Continuing Hearing on re 238 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/24/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying as moot 130 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 140 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 210 Motion for Summary Judgment (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER re 235 granting STIPULATION Extending Time for Cross Defendants to Answer Defendant North Star Trust Company's Cross Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER BRIEFING (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. K-M Industries Holding Co, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Smith
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tosha Thomas
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-M Industries Holding Co, Inc
Represented By: Henry I. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-M Industries Holding Co, Inc. ESOP Plan Committee
Represented By: Henry I. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiliam E. and Desiree B. Moore Revocable Trust
Represented By: Bruce Scott Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the William E. and Desiree B. Moore Revocable Trust
Represented By: Allison K. Chock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator of the Estate of William E. Moore, Deceased
Represented By: Kirsten Gibney Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIG ESOP Plan Committee
Represented By: Henry I. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Trust Company
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree B. Moore Revocable Trust
Represented By: Allison K. Chock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Moore Marital Trust
Represented By: Allison K. Chock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Moore Generation-Skipping Trust
Represented By: Allison K. Chock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree B. Moore
Represented By: Allison K. Chock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?