Park Village Apartment Tenants Association et al v. Mortimer Howard Trust et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv07389
Filed: December 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Injunctive/Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 117 Motion to Relate Case C-09-4780 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) Modified on 10/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2008 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/2/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
February 8, 2008 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice and Order Scheduling Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2008 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 14, 2007 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Park Village Apartment Tenants Association,, ORDER REOPENING CASE Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2007 02:45 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/13/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 12, 2007 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/9/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Village Apartment Tenants Association et al v. Mortimer Howard Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?