United States of America Ex Rel. et al v. Maxxam, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America Ex Rel., Richard Wilson and Chris Maranto
Defendant: Maxxam, Inc., The Pacific Lumber Corporation, Scotia Pacific Company, LLC, Salmon Creek LLC and Charles E. Hurwitz
Miscellaneous: United States of America, Morrison & Foerster LLP and State of California
Case Number: 4:2006cv07497
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2010 424 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON WILLIAM G. BERTAIN'S 406 MOTION to Modify 9-3-08 Stipulation and Protective Order and/or for Alternative Relief filed by United States of America Ex Rel. Motion Hearing specially set for 2/12/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/26/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 15, 2010 421 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DFTS' FILING OF SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/15/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
May 19, 2009 403 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 400 granting Stipulation to Allow The United States District Court, Northern District of California, To Approve Settlement of State of California Ex Rel. Richard Wilson and Chris Maranto v. Maxxam Inc., et al. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
April 19, 2009 350 Opinion or Order of the Court DRAFT PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2009)
April 16, 2009 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 339 granting STIPULATION AUTHORIZING ENTRY AND USE OF EQUIPMENT DURING TRIAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 14, 2009 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 13, 2009 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING DEPOSITIONS OF CDF OFFICIALS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/13/09. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
March 31, 2009 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 271 granting Administrative Motion of Special Counsel of Record for Morrison and Foerster LLP to Withdraw and to Terminate ECF Notifications. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 30, 2009 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 267 GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding Lodging of Proposed Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/30/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 27, 2009 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Denying 184 Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 25, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 258 granting STIPULATION Extending Pretrial Filing Deadline. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 10, 2009 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 170 MOTION to Exclude New Fraud Allegations in Plaintiffs' Expert Reports ; denying 174 Motion for Summary Judgment (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 6, 2009 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING EXCHANGE OF PRETRIAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/6/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 9, 2009 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 95 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 22, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 169 granting STIPULATION Extending Expert Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/22/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 16, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 133 SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 7, 2009 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 166 granting STIPULATION Regarding Non-Waiver of Privilege in Connection with Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/7/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 5, 2008 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 148 NOT ACCEPTING Stipulation Regarding Deposition Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 22, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 93 SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/22/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 6, 2008 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 123 GRANTING REVISED Stipulation Regarding Extension of Case Management Deadlines. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2009 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/6/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 23, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 93 DIRECTING DEBTOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 8, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 90 Letter filed by Maxxam, Inc., Charles E. Hurwitz, 67 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Scotia Pacific Company, LLC, Salmon Creek LLC, United States of America Ex Rel., Chris Maranto, Richard Wilson, Maxxam, Inc., Char les E. Hurwitz, The Pacific Lumber Corporation, 83 Letter filed by United States of America Ex Rel., Chris Maranto, Richard Wilson, 87 Order of Recusal, 82 Letter filed by United States of America Ex Rel., Chris Maranto, Richard Wilson, 86 Case Management Statement, filed by United States of America Ex Rel., Chris Maranto, Richard Wilson. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/8/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 3, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 84 Stipulation And Protective Order Governing Confidentiality, filed by United States of America Ex Rel., Chris Maranto, Richard Wilson, Maxxam, Inc., Charles E. Hurwitz. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/2/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America Ex Rel. et al v. Maxxam, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America Ex Rel.
Represented By: William Gerard Bertain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wilson
Represented By: William Gerard Bertain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Maranto
Represented By: William Gerard Bertain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxxam, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pacific Lumber Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotia Pacific Company, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salmon Creek LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Hurwitz
Represented By: James P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: United States of America
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Morrison & Foerster LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: State of California
Represented By: Frederick Wayne Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?