Nalducci v. Secretary of the Army et al

Plaintiff: Robert L. Nalducci
Defendant: Secretary of the Army and Francis J. Harvey
Case Number: 4:2006cv07702
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND GENERAL RELEASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Arsmtrong, on 7/6/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice. All dates are VACATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/11/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER: That by no later than 05/18/09, Plaintiff may file a surreply re 89 Supplemental Declaration in Support. The motion hearing set for 05/19/09 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/12/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009) Modified on 5/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/6/2009 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2009 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/15/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
February 13, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CHANGING DATE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to 04/22/09 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge James Larson on 2/13/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to 04/21/09 at 10:00 AM, re 67 Letter Signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson on 1/20/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 01/20/09 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/11/08. re 55 Letter (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/29/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 17, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/09/2008 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/17/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008) Modified on 9/18/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalducci v. Secretary of the Army et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Nalducci
Represented By: Daniel Robert Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Army
Represented By: Melissa K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Harvey
Represented By: Melissa K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?