Helio LLC v. Palm, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Helio LLC alleged that Defendant Palm, Inc. use the slogan "Not Just a Cell Phone" that is confusingly similar to Plaintiff's "Don't Call It a Phone" trademark, slogan and brand.

Plaintiff: Helio LLC
Defendant: Palm, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2006cv07754
Filed: December 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2007. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re 43 MOTION to Seal Documents Designated Attorneys-Eyes Only filed by Helio LLC,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/24/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 63 First MOTION to Seal re: Documents Supporting Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Palm, Inc.,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/24/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 10, 2007 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, granting 78 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 5, 2007 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helio LLC re 89 Declaration in Support, 88 Reply Memorandum (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 Filing 89 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of 88 Reply Memorandum filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Modified on 4/6/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 88 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 87 *** Reply Memorandum re 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed byHelio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Modified on 4/6/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 87 Reply Memorandum re 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed byHelio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
March 30, 2007 Filing 86 Proposed Order re 85 Memorandum in Opposition Denying Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal Without Terms and Conditions by Palm, Inc.. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 30, 2007 Filing 85 Memorandum in Opposition re 78 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Palm Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal Without Terms and Conditions filed byPalm, Inc.. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 29, 2007 Filing 84 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 86 *** Proposed Order re 82 Memorandum in Opposition Granting Defendant's Request for Terms and Conditions in Connection with Dismissal Without Prejudice Or, in the Alternative, Request for Dismissal With Prejudice by Palm, Inc.. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/29/2007) Modified on 4/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2007 Filing 83 Declaration of Andrea Roberts in Support of 82 Memorandum in Opposition (REQUEST FOR CONDITIONS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) filed byPalm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 82 ) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/29/2007)
March 29, 2007 Filing 82 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 85 *** Memorandum in Opposition re 78 MOTION to Dismiss (REQUEST FOR CONDITIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) filed byPalm, Inc.. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/29/2007) Modified on 4/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2007 Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Defendant's Failure to E-File re 9 , 10 & 11 . (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2007)
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 76 Motion to Shorten Time (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 79 Proposed Order re 78 MOTION to Dismiss by Helio LLC. (Trock, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Helio LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2007 01:00 PM. (Trock, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 77 Proposed Order re 76 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear its Motion to Dismiss; Declaration of Kevin C. Trock by Helio LLC. (Trock, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 76 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear its Motion to Dismiss; Declaration of Kevin C. Trock filed by Helio LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2007 01:00 PM. (Trock, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 75 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 64 *** Declaration of Doug Colt in Support of 74 MOTION to Seal Document filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 74 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 63 *** MOTION to Seal Documents filed by Palm, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 73 EXHIBIT 14 (is a CD Containing Media Files) re 72 Declaration in Support filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 72 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 72 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 61 *** Declaration of Doug Colt in Support of 69 Memorandum in Opposition filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 69 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 71 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 59 *** Declaration of Julie Patterson in Support of 69 Memorandum in Opposition filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 69 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 70 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 60 *** Declaration of Scott Hancock in Support of 69 Memorandum in Opposition filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 69 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 69 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 56 *** Memorandum in Opposition re 34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byPalm, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 68 NOTICE by Palm, Inc. re 61 Declaration in Support, Notice of Manual Filing (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice 48 Motion to Shorten Time (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helio LLC of Clerk's Notice (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2007 01:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 64 Declaration of DOUG COLT in Support of 63 First MOTION to Seal re: Documents Supporting Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 63 ) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 63 First MOTION to Seal re: Documents Supporting Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Palm, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2007 01:00 PM. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 62 Proposed Order re 56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Palm, Inc.. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 61 Declaration of DOUG COLT in Support of 56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byPalm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 60 Declaration of SCOTT HANCOCK in Support of 56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byPalm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 92 *** # 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007) Modified on 4/25/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2007 Filing 59 Declaration of JULIE PATTERSON in Support of 56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byPalm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 58 Declaration of HOWARD MARYLANDER in Support of 56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Consumer Confusion) filed byPalm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 57 Declaration of HOWARD MARYLANDER in Support of 56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byPalm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 56 Memorandum in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support filed byPalm, Inc.. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 19, 2007 Filing 55 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Helio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
March 14, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 MOTIONS 48 MOTION to Shorten Time Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule; and Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/13/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 53 Proposed Order re 48 MOTION to Shorten Time Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule; and Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions Proposed Order Granting Defendant Palm, Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions by Palm, Inc.. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 52 Proposed Order re 48 MOTION to Shorten Time Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule; and Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions Proposed Order Granting Defendant Palm, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule by Palm, Inc.. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 51 Declaration of Brian Cannon in Support of 48 MOTION to Shorten Time Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule; and Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 50 Declaration of Doug Colt in Support of 48 MOTION to Shorten Time Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule; and Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 49 Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of 48 MOTION to Shorten Time Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule; and Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 48 MOTION to Shorten Time Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule; and Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions filed by Palm, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2007 10:00 AM. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 7, 2007 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helio LLC (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/7/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 94 EXHIBITS filed byHelio LLC.***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 93 *** (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helio LLC re 35 Declaration in Support, 41 Declaration in Support, 43 MOTION to Seal Documents Designated Attorneys-Eyes Only, 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support, 45 Proposed Order, 42 Proposed Order, 44 Declaration in Support (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 45 Proposed Order re 43 MOTION to Seal Documents Designated Attorneys-Eyes Only by Helio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 44 Declaration of Harold H. Davis, Jr. in Support of 43 MOTION to Seal Documents Designated Attorneys-Eyes Only filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 43 MOTION to Seal Documents Designated Attorneys-Eyes Only filed by Helio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 42 Proposed Order re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support by Helio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 41 Declaration of Kathryn M. Wheble in Support of 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 40 EXHIBITS re 35 Declaration in Support -Part 5 filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 39 EXHIBITS re 35 Declaration in Support -Part 4 filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 38 EXHIBITS re 35 Declaration in Support -Part 3 filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 37 EXHIBITS re 35 Declaration in Support -Part 2 filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 36 EXHIBITS re 35 Declaration in Support -Part 1 filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 35 Declaration of Harold H. Davis, Jr. in Support of 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 Filing 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support filed by Helio LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2007 01:00 PM. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
February 22, 2007 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harold H. Davis, Jr (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2007 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/12/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 12, 2007 Filing 31 Proposed Order re 30 Stipulation to Extend Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule by Palm, Inc.. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 12, 2007 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Palm, Inc.. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2007 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/30/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007) Modified on 1/31/2007 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2007 Filing 28 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation by Helio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 25, 2007 Filing 27 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 28 . *** Proposed Order by Helio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/25/2007) Modified on 1/25/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2007 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Extend Date of Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Briefing Schedule by Helio LLC. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/25/2007) Modified on 1/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2007 Filing 25 Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order by Palm, Inc.. (Stern, Claude) (Filed on 1/24/2007) Modified on 1/25/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE by Helio LLC of Firm Name Change (Trock, Kevin) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 3 Motion for TRO (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 9, 2007 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Defendant's Failure to E-File re 9 , 10 & 11 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 8, 2007 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint byPalm, Inc.. (Stern, Claude) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 5, 2007 Filing 20 Proposed Order re 9 Memorandum in Opposition to Application for Temporary Restraining Order by Palm, Inc.. (Stern, Claude) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
January 4, 2007 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2007 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
December 29, 2006 Filing 18 Proposed Order DENYING HELIO'S APPLICATION FOR TRO by Palm, Inc.. (Stern, Claude) (Filed on 12/29/2006)
December 29, 2006 Filing 17 Proposed Order DENYING HELIO'S APPLICATION FOR TRO by Palm, Inc.. (Stern, Claude) (Filed on 12/29/2006)
December 28, 2006 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/21/06 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helio LLC Proof of Service (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 21, 2006 Filing 14 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2006 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 12/21/2006) re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Helio LLC, Papers due 1/30/07. Responses due by 2/13/2007. Replies due by 2/20/2007. Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/6/2007 01:00 PM. (Court Reporter DIANE SKILLMAN.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2006)
December 20, 2006 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helio LLC. Palm, Inc. served on 12/19/2006, answer due 1/8/2007 (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/20/2006) Modified on 12/21/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2006 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helio LLC Proof of Service (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/20/2006)
December 20, 2006 Filing 11 Declaration of Doug Colt in Support of 9 Memorandum in Opposition filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 9 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2006 Filing 10 Declaration of Scott Hancock in Support of 9 Memorandum in Opposition filed byPalm, Inc.. (Related document(s) 9 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2006 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byPalm, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2006 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006)
December 20, 2006 Received Order re 9 Memorandum in Opposition by Palm, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006)
December 19, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helio LLC re 6 Declaration in Support, 5 Declaration in Support, 1 Complaint, 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Proposed Order Granting TRO (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/19/06. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 Filing 6 Declaration of Jessica Weeks in Support of 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 3 ) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2006 (kcS, ).
December 19, 2006 Filing 5 Declaration of Kathyrn M. Wheble in Support of 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 3 ) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2006 (kcS, ).
December 19, 2006 Filing 4 Declaration of Harold H. Davis, Jr. in Support of 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed byHelio LLC. (Related document(s) 3 ) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2006 (kcS, ).
December 19, 2006 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Helio LLC. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2006 (kcS, ).
December 19, 2006 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2007. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2007 @ 3:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, jury trial demanded, against Palm, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611000761)(Summons Issued). Filed byHelio LLC. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) Modified on 12/20/2006 (kcS, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2006 (kcS, ).
December 19, 2006 Summons Issued as to Palm, Inc.. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helio LLC v. Palm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helio LLC
Represented By: Kevin Charles Trock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm, Inc.
Represented By: Claude Michael Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?