Liberal v. Estrada et al

Plaintiff: Kesner Junior Liberal
Defendant: Estrada and City of Menlo Park
Mediator: Steven Saltiel
Case Number: 4:2007cv00024
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 6, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
February 18, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2011 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
October 28, 2008 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/28/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 20, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: presence at pretrial conference. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/20/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2008 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2008 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/24/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 11, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FROM ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/11/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberal v. Estrada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesner Junior Liberal
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrada
Represented By: Dan Kahn Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Menlo Park
Represented By: Dan Kahn Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Steven Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?