In re Flash Memory Antitrust Litigation

Plaintiff: Trong Nguyen, Calif-Coast Investigative Services, Dan Harrison, Dee Cravens and Stuart Go
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Electronics Devices (USA), Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corp., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Inc. and Hitachi Ltd.
Intervenor: Antitrust Division,Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2007cv00086
Filed: January 5, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 775 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
August 30, 2012 773 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 772 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(2). With Plaintiff and Toshiba Corp. and TAEC each bearing their own costs and attorneys' fees. Toshiba Corp. and TAEC shall no longer be parties to this action. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/30/12 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 2, 2012 771 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISAL OF HYNIX,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/1/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
June 8, 2012 768 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Hitachi America, Ltd terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/4/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
May 10, 2012 766 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF SANDISK CORPORATION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
January 3, 2012 756 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2012 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/3/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
May 12, 2011 746 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/12/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
June 10, 2010 725 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 632 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 9, 2010 724 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 567 MOTION to Certify Class filed by James Burt, 562 MOTION to Substitute Party Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiffs, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Substitute Party Pla intiffs filed by James Burt, 593 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Claims of Christopher Bessette Without Prejudice; Memorandum of Law in Support Therein filed by James Burt PUBLIC VERSION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/31/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 6, 2010 718 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 714 MOTION for Leave to File Recent Decision with Proposed Order filed by Westell Technologies, Inc., Timothy Chanda, A Computer Place, Inc., 705 MOTION for Leave to File Recent Decision filed by Westell Technologies, Inc., Timothy Chanda, A Computer Place, Inc... Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/5/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
January 26, 2010 697 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART 557 Motion to Seal, 582 Motion to Seal, 602 Motion to Seal, 614 Motion to Seal, 636 Motion to Seal, 644 Motion to Seal, and 669 Motion to Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2009 635 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re Page Limitations on 632 Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/16/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2009 492 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES; TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Discovery Conference set for 6/12/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 05/27/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009) Modified on 5/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2009 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 370 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 371 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 372 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 373 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 374 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 376 Mo tion to Dismiss; DENYING AS MOOT 379 Motion to Stay; DENYING 382 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 454 Motion to consider additional district court authorities. Plaintiffs are GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 05/20/09 at 3:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009) Modified on 4/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2008 463 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That McDermott Wiil & Emory substitutes in as counsel for Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Corporation and Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA, Inc., in place of Jenner & Block LLP and Krieg, Keller, et al.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/17/08. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Flash Memory Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Bruce Nemerovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Gary L. Halling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesas Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesas Technology America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Corporation
Represented By: Belinda S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi America, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronics Devices (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trong Nguyen
Represented By: Henry A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calif-Coast Investigative Services
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Harrison
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Cravens
Represented By: Scott Justin Yundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Go
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Antitrust Division,Department of Justice
Represented By: Lara Meredith Kroop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?