Kinlaw et al v. Kozak et al

Plaintiff: Arthur Kinlaw and Atheia Rohnbach
Defendant: Nancy Kozak, Melissa Phillips and Mendocino County Department of Social Services, Family and Children Services Division
Case Number: 4:2007cv00430
Filed: January 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. All pending matters are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/15/10. ***Civil Case Terminated.. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010) Modified on 3/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Plaintiff Atheia Rohnbach is DISMISSED. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinlaw et al v. Kozak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Kinlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atheia Rohnbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendocino County Department of Social Services, Family and Children Services Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?