Rodgers v. Horsley

Plaintiff: Russell Dwayne Rodgers
Defendant: Denton, Hoss, Justice, Don Horsley, Munk, Schumaker, Sanchez, M.A. #69, Overman, Firkins and Goulart
Case Number: 4:2007cv00520
Filed: January 25, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 56 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff's discovery requests are QUASHED. Plaintiff may not serve further discovery on Defendants until further Order of the Court. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/9/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 54 Motion for Extension/Suspension of Proceedings; DENYING 54 Motion for Reconsideration (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's Opposition due 03/08/2010. Defendants' Reply to Opposition due 03/22/2010. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the excessive force and due process claims. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/19/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010) Modified on 1/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/16/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 17, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 19 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Horsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Horsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. #69
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Dwayne Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?