Board Of Trustees Of The Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Royce B. Peterson Roofing Inc.

Plaintiff: Bruce Lau and Board Of Trustees Of The Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: Royce B. Peterson Roofing Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv01035
Filed: February 20, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM. Judgment Debtor Exam as to Linda Jenkins re-set for 10/2/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/13/09. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/13/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 13, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FILED IN ERROR. SEE NEXT DOCKET ENTRY. TYPOGRAPHICAL ERROR REGARDING NEW DATE ORDER CONTINUING JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM. Judgment Debtor Exam as to Linda Jenkins re-set for 10/2/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/13/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009) Modified on 8/14/2009 (klh, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF EXAMINATION. Judgment Debtor Exam of Linda Jenkins set for 7/31/2009 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/12/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 16, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court **PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET NO. 24** ORDER OF EXAMINATION. Judgment Debtor Exam of Linda Jenkins set for 7/31/2009 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/12/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009) Modified on 6/17/2009 (klh, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board Of Trustees Of The Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Royce B. Peterson Roofing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lau
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board Of Trustees Of The Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce B. Peterson Roofing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?