Wilder v. Doris et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Walter and James Pinno
Defendant: Robert J. Doris, Mary C. Sauer, A. Clay Leighton, Robert M. Greber, Peter J. Marguglio, R. Warren Langley and Sonic Solutions
Consol_plaintiff: James Forseth
Consol_defendant: Michael C Child, Michael J. Costello, Christopher A. Kryzan, James A. Moorer, Kirk Paulsen and Mary C. Sauer
Case Number: 4:2007cv01500
Filed: March 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement And Providing For Notice Final Settlement Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re 82 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION re 81 Status Report Setting Schedule. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 WRONG DOCUMENT FILED - SEE DOCKET #84 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT ORDER re 82 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION Setting Schedule. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/13/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009) Modified on 3/16/2009 (scc, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re 79 granting STIPULATION Setting Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 77 granting STIPULATION Setting Schedule.Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/22/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 73 granting STIPULATION Setting Schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/17/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder v. Doris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Doris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C. Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Clay Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Greber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Marguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Warren Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Solutions
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: James Forseth
Represented By: J. Daniel Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Walter
Represented By: J. Daniel Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pinno
Represented By: J. Daniel Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Michael C Child
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Michael J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Christopher A. Kryzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: James A. Moorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Kirk Paulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Mary C. Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?