Best Deals on TV, Inc. et al v. Naveed et al

Plaintiff: Muhammad Aslam Mughal, Sondos Fund Management, LLC, 3Znet, Inc., Regalcom, Inc. and Best Deals on TV, Inc.
Defendant: Mohtashim Naveed, Qamar Ali Khan, Asma Tullah Khan, Mian Naeem Uddin, Siavash Tehrani, Shaker Nakhjavani Pour, Al Kanz General Trading LLC and TSSC FZCO
Case Number: 4:2007cv01610
Filed: March 21, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2008 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/12/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 6, 2008 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/6/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 15, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: That the Settlement Conference is set for 10/14/2008 at 10:00 AM, Before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA 91402. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/15/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/16/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 4 Motion for TRO (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Deals on TV, Inc. et al v. Naveed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Aslam Mughal
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Kimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondos Fund Management, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Kimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3Znet, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Walter Brilliant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regalcom, Inc.
Represented By: Fred M. Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Deals on TV, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Kimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohtashim Naveed
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qamar Ali Khan
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asma Tullah Khan
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mian Naeem Uddin
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siavash Tehrani
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaker Nakhjavani Pour
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Kanz General Trading LLC
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSSC FZCO
Represented By: John Stuart Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?