Lucas v. Silva et al

Plaintiff: Isiah Lucas, Jr.
Defendant: Jarvis, M. Miranda, Silva, I. Guerra and Ben Curry
Case Number: 4:2007cv01673
Filed: March 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 63 MOTION TO STRIKE MEDICAL RECORDS; AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS' [67MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
February 22, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND 71 MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING HIS 70 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/22/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
November 23, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 60 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 12, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 53 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD DEFENDANTS; REQUIRING SERVICE ON CERTAIN DEFENDANTS; GRANTING 54 SERVED DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION; AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULES (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 6, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge 10/6/2010 Denying 32 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies and Addressing Pending Motions 49 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REINSTATING JULY 12, 2010 BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/5/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 40 DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR STAY AND GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTION; DENYING HIS REQUEST FOR THE RETURN OF HIS PERSONAL PROPERTY; AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
October 28, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/28/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Silva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isiah Lucas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?