Fleming v. Director of Corrections

Plaintiff: Gary Lee Fleming
Defendant: Director of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2007cv02338
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT NURSE CASTRO AND CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/2/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
December 9, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 GRANTING PLAINTIFF EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROVIDE REQUIRED INFORMATION NECESSARY TO IDENTIFY DEFENDANT CASTRO. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
October 22, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE REQUIRED INFORMATION NECESSARY TO IDENTIFY DEFENDANT CASTRO WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/22/2009. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
March 23, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 19 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary interim relief (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Director of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?