Dunbar et al v. Gottwald et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Tommy Dunbar and James Gangwer
Defendant: Lucasz Gottwald, Avril Lavigne, Kasz Money Publishing, Avril Lavigne Publishing LLC, Almo Music Corp., RCA Records and Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv02758
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2007 20
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Avril Lavigne, Avril Lavigne Publishing LLC and Rondor Music International, Inc. dba Almo Music. (Ruttenberg, Edward) (Filed on 8/15/2007) Modified on 8/16/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2007 16
Joint ADR Certification with Stipulation to ADR Process. (Given, David) (Filed on 8/8/2007) Modified on 8/9/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2007 14
First Amended STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer by Apple, Inc. (Schecter, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2007) Modified on 8/3/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2007 13
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. [DBA ALMO MUSIC]. (Ruttenberg, Edward) (Filed on 7/30/2007) Modified on 7/31/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2007 9
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Avril Lavigne Publishing LLC. (Ruttenberg, Edward) (Filed on 7/27/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2007 6
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Docket #5 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
June 28, 2007 4
***PLAINTIFF FAILED TO COMPLY WITH CLERK'S NOTICE, DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCKET #1.***
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT - JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350.). Filed byTommy Dunbar, James Gangwer. (Given, David) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 6/29/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/29/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2007 3
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Docket #1. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunbar et al v. Gottwald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Dunbar
Represented By: Spencer Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gangwer
Represented By: Spencer Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucasz Gottwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avril Lavigne
Represented By: Edward A. Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasz Money Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avril Lavigne Publishing LLC
Represented By: Edward A. Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almo Music Corp.
Represented By: Edward A. Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCA Records
Represented By: Edward A. Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Buckner Vandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?