Henderson v. California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr.
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation and Pelican Bay State Prison
Case Number: 4:2007cv02838
Filed: May 31, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2012 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT re 305 Proposed Order filed by D. A. Christ, M.D. Bullock, C. Speaker, J. Petersen. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/28/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 7, 2012 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE RE 297 MOTION for Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER BY 3/15/12. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/7/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
August 4, 2011 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/29/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011) Modified on 8/4/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2011 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Armstrong Denying 180 Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's IFP and to Dismiss; Granting 183 Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate; Denying 193 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 222 Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1 Through 10; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 226 Plaintiff's Motions in Limine (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 22, 2011 230 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM: That the Warden of Corcoran State Prison to produce Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr., H-43488, to San Quentin State Prison no later than 07/06/11; and to Courtroom 1 U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, 4th Floor, Oakland, California, 94612, on 07/18/11 at 8:30 a.m. re 219 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 193 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by D. A. Christ, M.D. Bullock, C. Speaker, J. Petersen, G. Kelley, J. McBride. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 20, 2011 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 190 Stipulation, filed by D. A. Christ, M.D. Bullock, C. Speaker, Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr., J. Petersen, G. Kelley, J. McBride. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/20/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 18, 2011 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 165 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
April 13, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 161 MOTION for Referral to Magistrate Judge filed by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr., 162 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 11, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 155 Excusing Defendants' Attendance at April 22, 2011 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 6, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM issued. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/5/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 31, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/31/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 24, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE IN CAMERA REVIEW 149 Stipulation and Order,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/24/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 22, 2011 151 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER OF REFERENCE re 150 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. The deadline for Magistrate Bernard Zimmerman to conduct his review is ENLARGED from 03/24/11, to (7) seven-days after Magistrate Judge Zimmerman receives files to be review. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/22/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 145 Stipulation, filed by D. Mandel, R. Tupy, K. Cruse, Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr., J. Brown, S. Wright, G. Kelly, S. Luckett, D. A. Christ, M.D. Bullock, M. Cook, J.T. Patch, K. Getz, S.L. Thompson, J. McBride, C. Speaker, J. Moulton, J. Petersen, J. Akin. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/11/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
February 3, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 27, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Service re docket entry No. 121. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 14, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: That opposition shall be filed by 01/18/11 re 131 Motion to Reopen Discovery. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 122 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
October 25, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued for Plaintiff's appearance November 18, 2010 at Solano State Prison. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/25/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
June 24, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 96 Motion to Stay; denying 97 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; dismissing 98 Motion to Compel; granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
March 17, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 74 Motion for Writ of Mandamus; DENYING 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010) Modified on 3/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion. The for Defendants to file Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED (32) thirty-two days to 03/01/10. Plaintiff's Opposition due (45) forty-five days after the date of Defendants' Motion is filed. Defendants' Reply to Opposition due (15) fifteen-days after filing date of Plaintiff's Opposition. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) Modified on 2/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispostive Motion. Defendants to file Motion for Summary Judgment by 01/28/10. Plaintiff's Opposition due within (45) forty-five days after Defendants' Motion is filed. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 47 Motion for Sanctions; terminating 50 Motion for Default Judgment; terminating 51 Motion for Default Judgment; terminating 52 Motion for Defau lt Judgment; terminating 57 Motion to Strike ; terminating 65 Motion to Compel; terminating 65 Motion for Sanctions; terminating 67 Motion ; terminating 71 Motion to Stay; terminating 20 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 22 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 22 Motion for TRO; terminating 26 Motion for Writ of Mandamus (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
March 25, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
February 11, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. A Settlement Conference is set for 03/10/09 at 11:00 AM., at the California State Prison, Solano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas, on 2/11/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009) Modified on 2/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 10 Motion for TRO (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Bay State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?