Hines v. California Public Utilities Commission et al
Plaintiff: Donna Hines
Defendant: California Public Utilities Commission, Arocles Aguilar, Dana S. Appling and Robert J. Wullenjohn
Case Number: 4:2007cv04145
Filed: August 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 412 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURTS SEPTEMBER 10, 2010 ORDER ON COSTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON PLAINTIFFS 409 MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COURT PAYMENT OF TRANSCRIPT FEES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 403 Motion to Stay. Certificate of Service as to Donna Hines. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 391 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/27/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER Re Discovery Dispute Re New Interrogatories and Document Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE RE PURA IV AND V POSITIONS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 262 Defendant's Motion to Compel (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 247 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Defendant's Noncompliance with Court Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 AMENDED ORDER granting 267 Defendant's Motion to Change Time. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/2010. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 232 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order; Granting 236 Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief; and Setting Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Compliance with Court Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER - PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen re 185 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER TERMINATING ASSISTED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/22/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER re Parties' Status Reports of December 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Re 206 Plaintiff's Supplemental Notice to November 25, 2009 Oral Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER Re 203 Plaintiff's Request Re Oral Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ASSISTED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re 138 CONCERNING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re 132 Denying REQUEST FOR RULE 54 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER PROVIDING NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF OF REQUIREMENTS FOR OPPOSING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/3/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting re 121 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by California Public Utilities Commission; Attorney Marion McWilliams, David Ernest Lyon for California Public Utilities Commission added. Attorney Vera Kazumi Kawamura; Fiel Dizon Tigno; David Antony Carrillo and Christine G. Esperanza terminated.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/24/09. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Dismiss; granting 112 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. California Public Utilities Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Public Utilities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arocles Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana S. Appling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Wullenjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?