Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Cabeceira Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Cabeceira Construction, Inc. and Lois Cabeceira
Case Number: 4:2007cv04380
Filed: August 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 7/2/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 46 Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Luis Cabeceira. Case Management Conference continued to 6/2/2009 at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 4/30/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009) Modified on 5/1/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Following February 18, 2009 Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 2/18/09. (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Following Further Status Conference. Signed by Judge Brazil on 1/13/09. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009) Modified on 1/15/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 12/11/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 11/13/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 13, 2008, AT 4:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/30/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008) Modified on 10/1/2008 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Cabeceira Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabeceira Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Cabeceira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?