Midwest Transport, Inc. v. FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.
Plaintiff: Midwest Transport, Inc.
Defendant: FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc. and Califia Development Corporation
Case Number: 4:2007cv04408
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re 114 granting JOINT STIPULATION for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/25/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting re 96 Stipulation Amending Scheduling Order (only changing discovery dates) filed by FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc., Califia Development Corporation, Midwest Transport, Inc.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 THIRD DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/20/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/17/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re 81 granting Stipulation Amending Scheduling Order Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2009 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2010 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2009 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 granting as modified STIPULATION Amending Scheduling Order. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Transport, Inc. v. FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Meghan M. Lamping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCE Benefit Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Oliver Quinn Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Califia Development Corporation
Represented By: John M. Drath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?