Stiener et al v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs allege that defendans Apple, Inc. and AT&T Mobility, LLC failed to inform initial purchasers of the iPhone that fees of over $100 would be required to replace the iPhone battery and maintain service while the battery was being replaced.

Plaintiff: Zoltan Stiener and Ynez Stiener
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 4:2007cv04486
Filed: August 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending matters are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010) Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That ATTM's name be STRICKEN from the Court's Caption. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/11/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009) Modified on 9/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Joint MOTION Strike AT&T Mobility, LLC from Case Caption and Proposed Order, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/8/2009) Modified on 9/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC.. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/8/2009) Modified on 9/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MANDATE of USCA: That this appeal is voluntarily dismissed, pursuant to FRAP Rule 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal, as to 60 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 08-15612 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 63 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 84 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Letter from AT&T Mobility LLC re: plaintiffs non-opposition to motion for leave to file reply brief. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Reply Memorandum re 63 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of 63 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENY as moot 65 Motion to Stay; DENY as moot 72 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2008 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/21/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal 60 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 08-15612. Counsel notified. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference; Proposed Order, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Apple, Inc., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 4/15/2008) Modified on 4/15/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re 78 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by AT&T Mobility LLC (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener re 76 Memorandum in Opposition (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/11/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Memorandum in Opposition re 65 Motion to Stay filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/11/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CLERK'S NOTICE)(Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2008 01:00 PM. to follow the hearing on the motion. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT, filed by Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 4/3/2008) Modified on 4/4/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Administrative Motion to Stay filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 USCA Case Number 08-15612 Ninth Circuit for 60 Notice of Appeal. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2008)
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 3/27/2008)
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Memorandum in Opposition re 65 Administrative Motion to Stay filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 3/27/2008) Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That ATTM's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due 04/22/2008, re 62 Stipulation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/26/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008) Modified on 3/27/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Proposed Order re 65 Motion to Stay by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Declaration of Rena Chng in Support of 65 Motion to Stay filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 65 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Administrative MOTION to Stay, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Proposed Order re 63
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2008 01:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum I, # 2 Addendum II, # 3 Addendum III, # 4 Addendum IV)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION Extending Time For AT&T Mobility LLC To Respond To Complaint; [Proposed] Order Thereon by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 3/20/2008) Modified on 3/21/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 60 Notice of Appeal. Counsel notified. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re 60 Notice of Appeal (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 59 Order on Motion to Compel by AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 44611001945. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 38 Motion to Compel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 54 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Proposed Order re 54 Motion for Leave to File Williams Declaration To Correct The Record On ATTM's Motion To Compel Arbitration With Respect To Restocking Fee by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION re 54 Motion for Leave to File Williams Declaration to Correct The Record on ATTM's Motion to Compel Arbitration with Respect to Restocking Fee by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Declaration of Victoria Collado in Support of 54 MOTION for Leave to File Williams Declaration To Correct The Record On ATTM's Motion To Compel Arbitration With Respect To Restocking Fee filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 54 ) (Collado, Victoria) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Williams Declaration To Correct The Record On ATTM's Motion To Compel Arbitration With Respect To Restocking Fee filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc., Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener re 51 Statement of Recent Decision, (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION in Opposition re Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decision)(Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION re in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decision)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/20/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Reply Declaration of Neal S. Berinhout in Support of 38 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/12/2008) Modified on 2/13/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Reply Memorandum re 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener re 46 Declaration in Support of Motion, 45 Memorandum in Opposition (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Declaration of Max Folkenflik in Support of 45 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition re 38 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 33 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Proposed Order by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Declaration of Neal S. Berinhout in Support of 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Declaration of Victoria R. Collado in Support of 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Declaration of Richard A. Nagareda in Support of 38 Defendant ATTM'S Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support of 38 Motion of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Collado, Victoria) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 11/15/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 11/15/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 11/15/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration of Victoria R. Collado in Support of 33 MOTION to Stay Its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 33 ) (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/8/2007) Modified on 11/9/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Stay Its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Proposed Order by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Declaration of Victoria Collado in Support of 29 MOTION to Stay It's Obligations Under the Court's Intial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-to-be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Proposed Order by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Stay It's Obligations Under the Court's Intial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-to-be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER: to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2008 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/5/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007) Modified on 11/7/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue Initial Case Management Conference, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Apple, Inc., Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/2/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Declaration of Victoria R. Collado in Support of 23 MOTION to Stay its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Proposed Order re 23 Motion to Stay by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Stay its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 20 Answer to Complaint, 18 Notice of Appearance, 19 Certificate of Interested Entities (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Penelope Athene Preovolos filed by Apple, Inc. (Morrison & Foerster LLP) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007) Modified on 10/22/2007 (kk, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Max Folkenflik (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Max Folkenflik ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001348.) filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Received Order re 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Max Folkenflik ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001348.) by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Victoria R. Collado ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001245.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Reynolds ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001244.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Received Order re 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Sarah E. Reynolds ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001244.) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Received Order re 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Victoria R. Collado ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001245.) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC., Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/18/2007) Modified on 9/19/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/18/2007) Modified on 9/19/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener Proof of Service of Clerk's Notice (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 9/11/2007)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 9/6/2007) Modified on 9/7/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener Proof of Service of Clerk's Notice (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. Apple, Inc. served on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. Proof of Service of Summons in a Civil Case (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order ......Disregard this entry - case was previously designated.....CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2007) Modified on 8/31/2007 (kk, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener Certificate of Service of Clerk's Notice (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2007 03:45 PM. via telephone. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2007. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2007 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order - SBA)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT; with jury demand, against Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611001153.). Filed byZoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiener et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoltan Stiener
Represented By: Margaret McGerity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ynez Stiener
Represented By: Margaret McGerity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Sarah E Reynolds*
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?