Pasternak v. Trans Union LLC et al
Defendant: Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC and Capital One Bank
Petitioner: Emelia M. Pasternak
Case Number: 4:2007cv04980
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re 186 granting STIPULATION to Dismiss Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/5/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER ON FILING OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying (103) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (106) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot (113) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-04980-CW; denying (28) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:08-cv-02972-CW (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION. Case consolidated with C-08-2972 CW. ***FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION C-07-4980 CW***. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/10/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/25/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/26/2008 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2008.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re 99 GRANTING STIPULATION to Dismiss Third Claim Against Capital One Bank. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/6/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re 92 granting Joint Request Extending Date for Completing Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 THIRD DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/18/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasternak v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emelia M. Pasternak
Represented By: Veronica Kuiumdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Donald E. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Angela M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Sidney Stewart Haskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Represented By: Veronica Kuiumdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?