McCurdy v. Curry et al
Petitioner: Kenneth Donald McCurdy
Respondent: Ben Curry and Jim Tilman
Case Number: 4:2007cv05084
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/6/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 6 RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurdy v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Donald McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Tilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?