Bradley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Bradley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2007cv05186
Filed: October 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, That JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Defendant on claims brought by Plaintiff Jacqueline Bradley. Any pending matters matters terminated, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/18/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008) Modified on 12/19/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and AFFIRMING the decision of the defendant's (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008) Modified on 12/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/16/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?