Internet Archive et al v. Mukasey et al Featured Case

On November 26, 2007, an FBI agent served a National Security Letter on the Internet Archive seeking records pertaining to one of its patrons and, pursuant to 18 USC Section 2709(c), prohibiting the Internet Archive from disclosing that the FBI had sought information from it through the NSL. Plaintiffs filed a Complaint challenging the constitutionality of the NSL statute (18 USC Sections 2709 and 3511). Plaintiff Internet Archive also filed a Petition to Set Aside the NSL pursuant to 18 USC Section 3511(a).

Plaintiff: Internet Archive, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc. and Electronic Frontier Foundation
Defendant: Michael B. Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III and Arthur M. Cummings, II
Case Number: 4:2007cv06346
Filed: December 14, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRanting re 35 Notice of Appearance. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/17/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
May 9, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 30 granting Voluntary Dismissal by Stipulation Between the Parties and Stipulated Request That the Court Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce the Terms of the Settlement Agreement Between the Parties. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/9/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 8, 2008 30
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stipulation Between the Parties; Stipulated Request That the Court Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce the Terms of the Settlement Agreement Between the Parties; and Proposed Order by Michael B. Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III, Arthur M. Cummings, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit April 21, 2008, Settlement Agreement between the parties, # 2 Exhibit A to Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit B to Settlement Agreement, # 4 Exhibit C to Settlement Agreement)(Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 7, 2008 29
REDACTION Declaration of Brewster Kahle by Internet Archive, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Brick, Ann) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 2, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 24 Motion to Unseal Case (kcS, ) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
May 1, 2008 24
Joint Administrative MOTION to Unseal Case filed by Internet Archive, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Michael B. Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III, Arthur M. Cummings, II. (kcS, ) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
April 22, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATED Request to Stay all Pending Deadlines AND ORDER as modifed setting Initial Case Management Conference for 6/17/2008 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/22/08. (kcS, ) (Filed on 4/22/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting stipulated request to continue the case management conference and defendants' answer deadline. Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2008 02:00 PM; joint case management statement continued to 4/22/08; answer to complaint is extended to 4/21/08.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/10/08. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting stipulated request to continue the case management conference and defendants' answer deadling; Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/25/08. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION to continue case management conference; declaration of Melissa Goodman AND ORDER. Case Management Conference continued to 4/1/2008 at 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/10/08. (kcS, ) (Filed on 3/10/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 19
STIPULATION extending defendants' time to respond to the complaint by Internet Archive, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Michael B. Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III, Arthur M. Cummings, II. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 18
NOTICE of Appearance Michael B. Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III, Arthur M. Cummings, II (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Melissa Goodman. (kcS, ) (Filed on 1/3/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2007 14
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND RELATED DOCUMENTS as to Robert S. Muller III, Arthur M. Cummings II, Michael B. Mukasey, U.S. Attorney's Office filed by Internet Archive, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2007) (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2007 13
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Jameel Jaffer ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001643.) filed by Internet Archive, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007) (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 9
Declaration of ANN BRICK in Support of 8 MOTION to Seal Case filed byInternet Archive, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s) 8 ) (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (kc, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Archive et al v. Mukasey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Archive
Represented By: L. Danielle Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: L. Danielle Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: L. Danielle Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Represented By: L. Danielle Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc.
Represented By: L. Danielle Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: L. Danielle Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Mukasey
Represented By: Steven Yale Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller, III
Represented By: Steven Yale Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur M. Cummings, II
Represented By: Steven Yale Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?