In re: Static Random Access Memory (SRAM) Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Michael Brooks, Rhonda L. Jacobs, Sharon Defren, Ward Cater, Pastor Romney Darkins, Mark Alon Davis, Craig Sparks, Kym Masters, Patricia Fitzsimmons, Paul Hickman, Jo Nash, Mark Miles, Susan Juiles, Stacy Salzman, Donna Hark, Don Thompson, Roman Munoz, Michael Baranic, Joshua A. Belke, Justin Austin, III, Mark Pierce, Robert Schuyler Watson, Alec Berezin, Timothy Show, Frank Gertzen, Ronald A. Kramer, Dustin Van Dyk, Renee Steinberg, Christopher J. Stawski, Cade Oyadomori, David Loomis, E. Carol Vinson, Bruce Sullivan, James Allen, Martha M. McDonald, Sean Koch, Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA, Catherine L. Morgan, David Reedy, Mr. Alexander Ma, Trong H. Nguyen, Mitchell Salzman, Daniel Yohalem, Andrew Ditton, Janet Hall, Greg Proiette, Joseph Hastings, Terry Bisel, Cristi Ferguson, Stephanie Luekel, Scott Redpath, Autotime Corporation, Lara Sterenberg, Daniel Price, Westell Technologies, Inc., Chip-Tech, Ltd., Nicholas Kane, Mark Stephen Karadsheh, Robert Vinson, Nuja Show, David Perez, Reclaim Center, Inc., Jamie Maites, Christopher C. Crawford, Stargate Films Inc., Westell, Inc., Tabbatha Benson, Javier Oyola Alemany, Rebecca Bly, Sherry Choi, Scott Friedson, Karl Johnson, Yoni Ribo, Thomas Hark, Mark Lambert, Ronnie Barnes, CMP Consulting, Inc., Robert S. Harmon, Henry Truong, Arthur Madsen, Judd Eliasoph, Lawrence Markey, Alfred Livingston, Leslie Leighty, Craig Friedson, Henry Kornegay, Jai Paguirigan, Terrence Martin, Karol Juskiewicz, Ryan Edwards, Allen Nassiff, Elena Ralik, Rachael Zaas, Granite Communications, Inc., James W. Barnes, Joseph Englander, Kenneth W. Hebert, Heather Hawk, Paul Lauttamus, Chad Klebs, Todd Berg, Stephanie Truong, Telular Corporation, Reuben Canada, Bekah Zietz, Jacob Greenwell, Michael Francis Ayers, Scott L. Clarke, Richard Romero, Jaimie Thompson, Bradley Chase, Laura Magnuson, Michael Katz, Robert C. Bedore, Jr., Marc Cuevas, Kenneth Bagwell, Joe Solo, Penny Hochstein, Ron Birdsong, Candace Rowlette, Jason Smith, Blaine Olson, Brian Kreitzer, Carlos R. Carrillo, Renae Awakuni, Dataplex, Inc., Frederick Rozo, Dan Rempe, David Takeda, Alexander Ma and Brittany Chung
Defendant: Renesas Technology America, Inc., Epson America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, STMicroelectronics N.V., Toshiba America, Inc., Sony Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., Etron Technology America, Inc., Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Sony Electronic Inc., Integrated Device Technology, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Company, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd., STMicroelectronics Inc, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Fujitsu Limited, Inc., Toshiba America Corporation, Hitachi America Ltd, Sharp Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation, GSI Technology Inc, IBM Microelectronics Ltd, Crucial Technology, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Cypress Semiconductor, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Fujitsu America, Inc., Mosel Vitelic Inc., Micron Technology Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Etron Technology, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Electronics America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Toshiba Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Fujitsu Ltd., International Business Machines Corporation, Alliance Semiconductor Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Semiconductor Company, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Integrated Silicon Solution Inc, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. and Renesas Technology Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Smart Modular Technologies, Inc., Extreme Networks, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, U.S. Cellular Corp., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Third Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp., F5 Networks, Inc., Avnet, Inc., Research In Motion Limited, Cisco Systems, Inc., Intel Corporation and Renesas Electronics Corp.
Intervenor: David Bratton, Communication Mega-Sat Inc., Bryar Law Corporation and United States Department of Justice
Interested Party: James B Wright and Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Special Master: Judge (Ret.) Fern M Smith and Martin Quinn
Consolidated Plaintiff: Robin McEntee
In Re: Static Random Access Memory (SRAM)
Other: Barbara Cochran
Case Number: 4:2007md01819
Filed: February 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #1439 MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 1441 REPLY (re #1439 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlment Fund ) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response in Support of Motion for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Fund filed byWestell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 1440 Supplemental Declaration of Markham Sherwood in Support of #1439 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlment Fund filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1439 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/13/2013) Modified on 5/14/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 Filing 1439 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlment Fund; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/17/2013. Replies due by 5/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Steven N. Williams, #2 Declaration Of Markham Sherwood, #3 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/3/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #1428 MOTION TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR EXCLUSION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 1437 REPLY (re #1428 MOTION to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement ) filed byHewlett-Packard Company. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 1436 NOTICE by Autotime Corporation NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ATTORNEY'S NAME FROM THE COURT'S ECF NOTICES (Green, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 1435 NOTICE by Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronic Inc. Notice of Removal of Attorneys' Names from the Court's ECF Notices (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 1434 RESPONSE (re #1428 MOTION to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement ) Direct Purchaser Class' Opposition to Motion of Hewlett Packard to Revoke Exclusion Request and Share in Class Settlement filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 1433 Statement of Non-Opposition re #1428 MOTION to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement (from all Settling Defendants) filed byHewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua C. Stokes In Support of Notice of Defendants Non-Opposition to Motion to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement)(Related document(s) #1428 ) (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 25, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to #1428 MOTION to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement: Responses due by 3/7/2013. Replies due by 3/14/2013. Reset Hearing as to #1425 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Fund : Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket No. 1432. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken CONCERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re ( #1425 , #1427 , #1428 ). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 21, 2013 Filing 1431 FURTHER STATEMENT in support of (re #1425 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Fund ) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to #1428 MOTION to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket No. 1429. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 1430 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Courtney Stokes (Stokes, Joshua) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 1429 RE-NOTICE re #1428 MOTION to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement (New hearing date March 28, 2013) by Hewlett-Packard Company (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/19/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #1428 motion to withdraw request for exclusion from the direct purchaser class and to join the class settlement pursuant to L.R. 7-2(a). The hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, March 14, 2013, is vacated. If the #1427 motion to shorten time is granted, the Court will reset the date. Responses due by 2/28/2013. Replies due by 3/7/2013. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/15/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 Filing 1428 MOTION to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 3/7/2013. Replies due by 3/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua C. Stokes in Support of Hewlett-Packard Companys Motion to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement, #2 Proposed Order Granting Hewlett-Packard Companys Motion to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class and to Join the Class Settlement)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 1427 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua C. Stokes in Support of Hewlett-Packard Companys Administrative Motion to Shorten Time, #2 Proposed Order Granting Hewlett-Packard Companys Administrative Motion to Shorten Time)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 1426 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Allen Sasse (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 1425 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Fund; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/14/2013. Replies due by 2/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams, #2 Declaration of Markham Sherwood, #3 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 1/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2012 Filing 1424 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation and Withdrawal of Former Firmby Ron Birdsong, Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA, Mark Miles. (Nast, Dianne) (Filed on 12/12/2012) Modified on 12/13/2012 (kcS, ).
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #1421 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1421 MOTION for Disbursement of Settlement Funds filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Reclaim Center Inc Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/30/2012. Replies due by 9/6/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, #2 Declaration of Markham Sherwood, #3 Proposed Order)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified on 8/17/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 Filing 1420 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1419 Order (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 1423 Letter from Donald Lee Rice re settlement payment not received. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1418 Letter from George Wyatt, Jr. re objection to the plan distribution of the settlement and attorney fee and request attorney fee $41,322.00. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
December 5, 2011 Filing 1417 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. of Dissemination of Claim Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1412 Motion for Approval of Claim Form and Claim Period for Direct Purchaser Action. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #1343 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND TO MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1414 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for an Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 24, 2011 Filing 1413 Proposed Order re #1412 MOTION Approval of Claim Form and Claim Period for Direct Purchaser Action by Westell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/24/2011) Modified on 10/25/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2011 Filing 1412 MOTION Approval of Claim Form and Claim Period for Direct Purchaser Action filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/24/2011) Modified on 10/25/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2011 Filing 1411 OPPOSITION (re #1395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno) filed by Barbara Cochran, Kelsey Foligno. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 10/19/2011) Modified on 10/20/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2011 Filing 1410 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on October 14, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1409 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on October 14, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SAMSUNG AND CYPRESS SETTLEMENTS AND PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on October 14, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1375 Motion for Attorneys' Fees (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 1406 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 10, 2011 Filing 1404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. re #1402 , #1401 , #1400 , #1403 Amended Proposed Orders (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2011 Filing 1403 Amended [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Cypress Semiconductor Corporation by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2011 Filing 1402 Amended [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Samsung Defendants by Reclaim Center, Inc.. . (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2011 Filing 1401 Second Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Award of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and for Class Representative Incentive Payments by Reclaim Center, Inc.. . (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2011 Filing 1400 Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval of Samsung and Cypress Settlements and Plan of Distribution by Reclaim Center, Inc... (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2011 Filing 1405 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 10/6/2011). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1399 RESPONSE (re #1398 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno ) filed byBarbara Cochran, Kelsey Foligno. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 1398 MOTION to Shorten Time Motion for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Micheletti Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1397 Amended Notice of Hearing re #1395 Motion for an Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/19/2011. Replies due by 10/26/2011. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 1396 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ralph B. Kalfayan (Kalfayan, Ralph) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice #1395 motion for an order to show cause. 35 days notice was not given and an order shortening time was not filed and approved. Hearing date of October 6, 2011, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 1395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Finding of Civil Contempt and Award of Sanctions Against Objectors Barbara Cochran and Kelsey Foligno; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/17/2011. Replies due by 10/24/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Micheletti Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Micheletti Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Micheletti Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Micheletti Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Micheletti Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Micheletti Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Micheletti Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Micheletti Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Micheletti Declaration, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2011 Filing 1394 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. re #1393 Order Certificate of Service re: Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery From Objectors (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS #1386 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM OBJECTORS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 1392 Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery From Objectors (re: D.E. 1386) byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/20/2011) Modified on 9/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 Filing 1391 RESPONSE plantiff's Motion to Compel Discovery #1386 by Objectors Barbara Cochran, Kelsey Foligno. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Darrell Palmer in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A - Evidentiary Objections)(Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2011 Filing 1390 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. re #1387 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Certificate of Service re: Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That The Court Decide, or That The Court Appoint an Interim Discovery Master to Decide, Motion to Compel Discovery from Objectors (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 1389 Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Samsung and Cypress Settlements and Distribution Plan filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, #2 Exhibit 1 to Micheletti Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Samsung Defendants, #5 [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2011 Filing 1388 REPLY (re #1375 MOTION for Award of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards ) Reply in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended [Proposed] Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #1386 Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting That The Court Decide, or That The Court Appoint an Interim Discovery Master to Decide, Motion to Compel Discovery from Objectors. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 1386 MOTION for Administrative Relief Requesting That The Court Decide, or That The Court Appoint an Interim Discovery Master to Decide, Motion to Compel Discovery from Objectors filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Reclaim Center, Inc.. Responses due by 9/28/2011. Replies due by 10/5/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Administrative Relief, #2 Appendix A to Exhibit A to Motion for Administrative Relief, #3 Appendix B to Exhibit A to Motion for Administrative Relief, #4 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, #5 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Micheletti, #6 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Micheletti, #7 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of Micheletti, #8 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of Micheletti, #9 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of Micheletti, #10 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of Micheletti, #11 Exhibit 7 to Decl. of Micheletti, #12 Exhibit 8 to Decl. of Micheletti, #13 Exhibit 9 to Decl. of Micheletti, #14 Exhibit 10 to Decl. of Micheletti, #15 Exhibit 11 to Decl. of Micheletti, #16 Exhibit 12 to Decl. of Micheletti, #17 Exhibit 13 to Decl. of Micheletti, #18 Exhibit 14 to Decl. of Micheletti, #19 Exhibit 15 to Decl. of Micheletti, #20 Exhibit 16 to Decl. of Micheletti, #21 Exhibit 17 to Decl. of Micheletti, #22 Exhibit 18 to Decl. of Micheletti, #23 Proposed Order, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2011 Filing 1385 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Darrell Palmer (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 1384 Declaration of (provisional) acceptance of settlement and (generalized) Objection to terms of settlement; Motion to submit document at future hearing. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1383 OBJECTIONS to the settlement filed by Barbara Cochran. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1382 Notice of Appearance and OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement and Attorneys' Fees filed by Kelsey D. Foligno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 1381 OBJECTIONS to proposed class action settlement by Bjorn R. Aune. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 1, 2011 Filing 1380 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Notice Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 2))(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2011 Filing 1379 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Cy Pres Distribution Plan filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memo, #2 Exhibit B to Memo)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2011 Filing 1378 Exhibits 61-77 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of re #1375 MOTION for Award of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62 to Micheletti Decl., #2 Exhibit 63 to Micheletti Decl., #3 Exhibit 64 to Micheletti Decl., #4 Exhibit 65 to Micheletti Decl., #5 Exhibit 66 to Micheletti Decl., #6 Exhibit 67 to Micheletti Decl., #7 Exhibit 68 to Micheletti Decl., #8 Exhibit 69 to Micheletti Decl., #9 Exhibit 70 to Micheletti Decl., #10 Exhibit 71 to Micheletti Decl., #11 Exhibit 72 to Micheletti Decl., #12 Exhibit 73 to Micheletti Decl., #13 Exhibit 74 to Micheletti Decl., #14 Exhibit 75 to Micheletti Decl., #15 Exhibit 76 to Micheletti Decl., #16 Exhibit 77 to Micheletti Decl.)(Related document(s) #1375 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2011 Filing 1377 Exhibits 41-60 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of re #1375 MOTION for Award of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42 to Micheletti Decl., #2 Exhibit 43 to Micheletti Decl., #3 Exhibit 44 to Micheletti Decl., #4 Exhibit 45 to Micheletti Decl., #5 Exhibit 46 to Micheletti Decl., #6 Exhibit 47 to Micheletti Decl., #7 Exhibit 48 (Part 1 of 2) to Micheletti Decl., #8 Exhibit 48 (Part 2 of 2) to Micheletti Decl., #9 Exhibit 49 to Micheletti Decl., #10 Exhibit 50 to Micheletti Decl., #11 Exhibit 51 to Micheletti Decl., #12 Exhibit 52 to Micheletti Decl., #13 Exhibit 53 to Micheletti Decl., #14 Exhibit 54 to Micheletti Decl., #15 Exhibit 55 to Micheletti Decl., #16 Exhibit 56 to Micheletti Decl., #17 Exhibit 57 to Micheletti Decl., #18 Exhibit 58 to Micheletti Decl., #19 Exhibit 59 to Micheletti Decl., #20 Exhibit 60 to Micheletti Decl.)(Related document(s) #1375 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2011 Filing 1376 Exhibits 21-40 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of re #1375 MOTION for Award of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22 to Micheletti Decl., #2 Exhibit 23 to Micheletti Decl., #3 Exhibit 24 to Micheletti Decl., #4 Exhibit 25 to Micheletti Decl., #5 Exhibit 26 to Micheletti Decl., #6 Exhibit 27 to Micheletti Decl., #7 Exhibit 28 to Micheletti Decl., #8 Exhibit 29 to Micheletti Decl., #9 Exhibit 30 to Micheletti Decl., #10 Exhibit 31 to Micheletti Decl., #11 Exhibit 32 to Micheletti Decl., #12 Exhibit 33 to Micheletti Decl., #13 Exhibit 34 to Micheletti Decl., #14 Exhibit 35 to Micheletti Decl., #15 Exhibit 36 to Micheletti Decl., #16 Exhibit 37 to Micheletti Decl., #17 Exhibit 38 to Micheletti Decl., #18 Exhibit 39 to Micheletti Decl., #19 Exhibit 40 to Micheletti Decl.)(Related document(s) #1375 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2011 Filing 1375 MOTION for Award of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/10/2011. Replies due by 8/17/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Micheletti, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 to Micheletti Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Micheletti Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Micheletti Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Micheletti Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 1 of 3) to Micheletti Decl., #8 Exhibit 5 (Part 2 of 3) to Micheletti Decl., #9 Exhibit 5 (Part 3 of 3) to Micheletti Decl., #10 Exhibit 6 to Micheletti Decl., #11 Exhibit 7 to Micheletti Decl., #12 Exhibit 8 to Micheletti Decl., #13 Exhibit 9 to Micheletti Decl., #14 Exhibit 10 to Micheletti Decl., #15 Exhibit 11 to Micheletti Decl., #16 Exhibit 12 to Micheletti Decl., #17 Exhibit 13 to Micheletti Decl., #18 Exhibit 14 to Micheletti Decl., #19 Exhibit 15 to Micheletti Decl., #20 Exhibit 16 to Micheletti Decl., #21 Exhibit 17 to Micheletti Decl., #22 Exhibit 18 to Micheletti Decl., #23 Exhibit 19 to Micheletti Decl., #24 Exhibit 20 to Micheletti Decl.)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2011 Filing 1374 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/30/2011), Status Conference held on 6/30/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/30/2011). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 1373 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE CYPRESS DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 1372 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS. Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Samsung Electronics America and Samsung Electronics Company Ltd. terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Settlement with Cypress and Samsung and Plan of Allocation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011) Modified on 7/1/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken #1334 Awarding Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Award. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 ORDER EXCUSING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS FROM ATTENDANCE AT JUNE 30, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE #1367 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 1368 NOTICE by Sharp Electronics Corporation of Removal of Roxane A. Polidora from ECF Mailing List (Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 1367 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Westell, Inc., Cypress Semicondutor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd, Samsung Seminconductor Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for Final Approval set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) .
June 16, 2011 Filing 1366 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Samsung Defendants by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 1365 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Cypress Defendant by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 1364 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #1362 , #1363 Final Approval of Settlements (Cypress and Samsung), Plan of Allocation, Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Award filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1362 , #1363 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2011) Modified on 6/17/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2011 Filing 1363 Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Award re #1345 Order on Motion for Settlement filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1345 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2011) Modified on 6/17/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2011 Filing 1362 Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlement with Cypress and Samsung and Plan of Allocation re #1345 Order on Motion for Settlement filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1345 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2011) Modified on 6/17/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 ORDER Granting #1359 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Distribution Plan and Notice Plan and Setting Fairness Hearing. Fairness Hearing set for 10/6/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 ORDER Granting (Attachment #1 to #1359 ) Stipulation. #1359 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Distribution Plan and Notice Plan and Setting Fairness Hearing set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/26/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 1359 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Distribution Plan and Notice Plan and Setting Fairness Hearing filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order, #2 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, #3 Exhibit A to Micheletti Declaration, #4 Declaration of Dennis Gilardi, #5 Exhibit A to Gilardi Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Gilardi Declaration, #7 Exhibit C to Gilardi Declaration, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order, #10 Exhibit 2 to Proposed Order, #11 Exhibit 3 to Proposed Order, #12 Exhibit 4 to Proposed Order, #13 Exhibit 5 to Proposed Order)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 1358 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Status Conference Statement due by 6/23/2011. Status Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 18, 2011 Filing 1357 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2011) Modified on 5/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2011 Filing 1356 Joint Status Conference Statement filed by Westell, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/17/2011) Modified on 5/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2011 Filing 1355 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Notice of Dissemination of Class Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 1354 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew J. Jacobs (Jacobs, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 1353 REPLY (re #1343 MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Protective Order ) filed by Bryar Law Corporation, David Bratton, Communication Mega-Sat Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of David W. Stanley, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Second Declaration of David W. Stanley)(Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 4/7/2011) Modified on 4/8/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2011 Filing 1352 Joinder re #1350 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Protective Order by Third Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Felix, Victor) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 1, 2011 Filing 1351 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Statement of Nonopposition to Motion to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Protective Order (Canadian Plaintiffs) by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 4/1/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2011 Filing 1350 RESPONSE (re #1343 MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Protective Order ) OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF SEEKING MODIFICATION TO PROTECTIVE ORDER (CANADIAN PLAINTIFFS) filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Swartz, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 ORDER GRANTING PROPOSED FORMS OF CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Wilken on 3/30/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 1348 Proposed Order re #1347 Notice of Proposed Forms of Class Notice by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 Filing 1347 Notice of Proposed Forms of Class Notice by Westell, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 ORDER REGARDING MODIFICATIONS TO CLASS NOTIFICATIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting GRANTING #1330 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH SAMSUNG AND CYPRESS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION, AND ISSUANCE OF CLASS NOTICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 ORDER REGARDING CANADIAN PLAINTIFFS' #1343 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 1343 MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Seeking Modification to Protective Order filed by David Bratton, Bryar Law Corporation, Communication Mega-Sat Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reidar Mogerman in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibits A - D to Declaration of Reidar Mogerman, #3 Exhibits E - G to Declaration of Reidar Mogerman, #4 Declaration of David W. Stanley, #5 Proposed Order)(Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 1342 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 1341 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FROM BERMAN DEVALERIO ON BEHALF OF RESELLER PLAINTIFF GRANITE COMMUNICATIONS, INC. AND NOTICE ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING APPEARANCE (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 ORDER Granting #1326 Motion for Appointment of Settlement Class Reseller Representative And Reseller Counsel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 ORDER Granting #1333 Stipulation to shorten time on hearing on re #1330 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH SAMSUNG AND CYPRESS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION,AND ISSUANCE OF CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #1326 Motion for Appointment of Settlement Class Reseller Representative And Reseller Counsel. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) *** DISREGARD. SIGNATURE MISSING, SEE CORRECT ORDER (DOCKET NO 1340) ***
March 11, 2011 Filing 1337 Proposed Order re #1334 MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, REINBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 1336 Declaration of MARK SKOWRONSKI in Support of #1334 MOTION for Attorney Fees NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, REINBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1334 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1335 Declaration of STEVEN N. WILLIAMS in Support of #1334 MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, REINBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Time and Cost Report of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy LLP, #2 Exhibit 2 - Time and Cost Reports of Class Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Litigation Fund Expense Report, #4 Exhibit SRAM Litigation Docket Sheet)(Related document(s) #1334 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 1334 MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, REINBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 1333 STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER to Shorten Time on Hearing re #1330 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH SAMSUNG AND CYPRESS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION,AND ISSUANCE OF CLASS NOTICE by Westell, Inc., Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 1332 Proposed Order re #1330 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH SAMSUNG AND CYPRESS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION,AND ISSUANCE OF CLASS NOTICE by Westell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mailed Notice to Class, #2 Exhibit B - Summary Notice to Class)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 1331 Declaration of STEVEN N. WILLIAMS in Support of #1330 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH SAMSUNG AND CYPRESS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION,AND ISSUANCE OF CLASS NOTICE filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cypress Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Samsung Settlement Agreement)(Related document(s) #1330 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 1330 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH SAMSUNG AND CYPRESS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION,AND ISSUANCE OF CLASS NOTICE filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #1307 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH CYPRESS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 1328 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/10/2011). Status Conference set for 5/24/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 1327 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 1326 MOTION for Appointment of Settlement Class Reseller Representative And Reseller Counsel filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti In Support Of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion For Administrative Relief Requesting Appointment Of Settlement Class Reseller Representative And Reseller Counsel, #2 Declaration of Christopher T. Heffelfinger In Support Of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion For Administrative Relief Requesting Appointment Of Settlement Class Reseller Representative And Reseller Counsel, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher T. Heffelfinger In Support Of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion For Administrative Relief Requesting Appointment Of Settlement Class Reseller Representative And Reseller Counsel, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting Appointment of Settlement Class Reseller Representative And Reseller Counsel)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 2/23/2011) Modified on 2/24/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2011 Filing 1325 NOTICE by Michael Francis Ayers, Todd Berg, Judd Eliasoph, Craig Friedson, Susan Juiles, Chad Klebs, Arthur Madsen, Kym Masters, Jo Nash, Trong H. Nguyen, Mark Pierce, Candace Rowlette, Frederick Rozo, Jaimie Thompson, Henry Truong, Bekah Zietz // Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 2/21/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1209 Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Samsung. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 1322 Declaration of The Honorable Daniel Weinstein (Ret.) re #1307 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Cypress) filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1307 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 2/8/2011) Modified on 2/9/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2011 Filing 1323 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 2/7/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 2/7/2011). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 1320 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. Notice of Settlement with Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1319 Declaration of Susan Melius in Support of #1314 MOTION FORMER DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL TRANSACTIONAL DATABASES AT TRIAL filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1314 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1318 Declaration of Franklin Rubinstein in Support of #1314 MOTION FORMER DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL TRANSACTIONAL DATABASES AT TRIAL filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1314 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1317 Declaration of Matthew S. Leddicotte in Support of #1314 MOTION FORMER DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL TRANSACTIONAL DATABASES AT TRIAL filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1314 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1316 Declaration of Christina Brown in Support of #1314 MOTION FORMER DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL TRANSACTIONAL DATABASES AT TRIAL filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1314 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1315 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of #1314 MOTION FORMER DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL TRANSACTIONAL DATABASES AT TRIAL filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1314 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1314 MOTION FORMER DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL TRANSACTIONAL DATABASES AT TRIAL filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2011 Filing 1313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Trial Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1312 PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REVISED PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM by Westell, Inc. . (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 2/4/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2011 *** Hearing Date Terminated as to #1310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Administrative Motions Are Not Set For Hearing *** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 1311 RESPONSE to re #1303 Samsung's Objections to Plaintiffs' Opening Statement Materials by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/4/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2011 Filing 1310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/4/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2011 Filing 1309 Request for Judicial Notice at Trial Regarding the Date of the First Filed Direct Purchaser Complaint & Declaration in Support Thereof filed bySamsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 1308 NOTICE of Intent to Introduce Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 803(6), 902(11) and/or 902(12) by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cunningham, Tyler) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Filing 1307 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Cypress) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Cypress, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Cypress, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Preliminary Approval Of Settlement With Cypress)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS re #1305 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 1305 Notice of Intent to File Response re #1303 Objection by Westell, Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 ORDER Granting re #1300 Use of equipment at trial. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Filing 1303 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Opening Statement Materials by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 1302 Second Revised [proposed] Joint Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Westell Inc. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 2/2/2011) Modified on 2/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Filing 1301 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Notice of Lodging Original Deposition Transcripts (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 1300 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Permitting Use of Equipment at Trial by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 ORDER Granting #1295 Proposed Order PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 1298 Juror Questionnaire. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 1297 Second Revised [proposed] Special Verdict Form by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2011) Modified on 1/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Filing 1296 Supplemental Trial Exhibit List by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc... (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2011) Modified on 1/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Filing 1295 Proposed Order Permitting Use of Equipment at Trial by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Solouki, Mona) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1321 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 1/27/2011). (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 ORDER Granting #1293 Stipulation Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Time To Move For Relief Pursuant To The December 31, 2010 FTAIA Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1293 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Time To Move For Relief Pursuant To The December 31, 2010 FTAIA Order by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1292 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Notice of Settlement with Cypress Semiconductor Corporation (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 ORDER Granting #1289 Stipulation Request to Remove Hearing on Cypress's Further Motion to Decertify Certain Indirect Purchaser Classes From Calendar. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/26/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 1290 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 18, 2011, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2011. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 1289 STIPULATION -Request to Remove Hearing on Cypress's Further Motion to Decertify Certain Indirect Purchaser Classes From Calendar; [Proposed] Order by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 1288 STIPULATION by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Westell Inc. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/26/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 Filing 1287 Revised Joint [proposed] Voir Dire Questionnaire by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Westell Inc (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/26/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/26/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING SAMSUNG'S #1215 MOTIONFOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 ORDER ON PRE-TRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 1284 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 1/18/2011). Jury Selection set for 2/7/2011 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (4 weeks) set for 2/7/2011 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 ORDER Granting #1281 Stipulation Regarding Cypress's Reply in Support of Motions for Separate Trials and to Expedite Ruling on The FTAIA's Impact on Indirect Purchaser Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/18/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 14, 2011 Hearing Date of 1/27/2011 is terminated as to #1277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Administrative Motions are not Noticed Motions. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1230 Motion for separate trials. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 1281 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Regarding Cypress's Reply in Support of Motions for Separate Trials and to Expedite Ruling on The FTAIA's Impact on Indirect Purchaser Claims by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Reclaim Center Inc. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2011 Filing 1280 RESPONSE in Support re #1230 MOTION for separate trials filed bySamsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2011) Modified on 1/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2011 Filing 1279 Proposed Order re #1277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 1278 Declaration of Lee H. Rubin in Support of #1277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s) #1277 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 1277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG'S #1221 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE LENIENCY AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 1275 Reply Memorandum Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Name New Tennessee Class Representatives filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 1274 MEMORANDUM in Opposition To Cypress Motion To Expedite Ruling On The FTAIAs Impact On Indirect Purchaser Claims filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 1273 MEMORANDUM in Opposition To Cypress Motion For Separate Trials filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 1272 Declaration of Mona Solouki in Support of #1270 Reply Memorandum, in support of Samsung's Motion for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Decisions as to Westell's Standing filed bySamsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #1270 ) (Solouki, Mona) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 1271 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO re #1230 MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1230 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 1270 Reply Memorandum in support of Samsung's Motion for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Decisions as to Westell's Standing filed bySamsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Solouki, Mona) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER Granting #1221 SAMSUNG'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE LENIENCY AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011) ** DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. 1276 FOR CORRECT ORDER **
January 12, 2011 Filing 1268 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. Notice of Lodging of Samsung Defendants' Interrogatory Response Designations (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1267 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. Notice of Lodging of Samsung Defendants' Trial Exhibits (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1266 Proposed Trial Exhibit List by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc... (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 1265 OBJECTIONS to Trial Exhibits by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 1264 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Designations from Depositions and Discovery Responses by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 1263 NOTICE by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation of Lodging of Trial Exhibits (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1262 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Notice of Lodging Plaintiffs' Joint Trial Exhibits, Plaintiffs' Joint Discovery Designations and Joint Deposition Designations (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1261 Joint Objections to Samsung Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by Westell, Inc... (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 1260 Joint Objections to Defendant Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's Exhibit List by Westell, Inc., Reclaim Center Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 1259 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Joint Trial Exhibit List by Westell, Inc., Reclaim Center Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 1258 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Notice Of Lodging Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Trial Exhibits, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Discovery Designations (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1257 Exhibit List Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Trial Exhibit List by Reclaim Center, Inc... (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1256 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1255 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Designations of Discovery Responses by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1254 Exhibit List by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 1253 Plaintiffs' Joint Reply Brief on Damages Issues filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 Filing 1252 Joint [proposed] Voir Dire Questionnaire by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corp. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 Filing 1251 Memorandum in Opposition re #1214 MOTION To Name New Tennessee Class Representatives filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 1250 Joint [Proposed] Agenda for January 18, 2011 Pretrial Conference by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronic Company, Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 Filing 1249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Amended Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62 filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane N. Yi In Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Amended Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Amended Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Filing 1248 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62 filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jane N. Yi In Support Of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 ORDER Granting #1237 Stipulation Regarding Submission of Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questionnaire. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 1246 DECLARATION OF STEVEN N. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF #1245 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1245 ) (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/5/2011) Modified on 1/6/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2011 Filing 1245 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/5/2011) Modified on 1/6/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2011 Filing 1244 [Proposed] Revised Joint Jury Instructions. by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011) Modified on 1/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2011 Filing 1243 Revised [proposed] Special Verdict Form by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011) Modified on 1/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2011 Filing 1242 Defendants' Joint Damages Brief filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc . (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/4/2011) Modified on 1/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2011 Filing 1241 Proposed Form of Verdict by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 1240 Proposed Form of Verdict by Westell, Inc. Plaintiffs' Proposed Special Verdict Forms. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 1239 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #1238 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Leniency Agreement for In Camera Review by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting SAMSUNG'S #1221 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE LENIENCY AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 1237 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Submission of Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questionnaire by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Westell Inc, et al. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011) Modified on 1/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 ORDER by Judge Wilken granting in part and denying in part #1211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 1235 Memorandum in Opposition re #1221 Administrative Motion to File Leniency Agreement Under Seal for In Camera Review (Civ. L.R. 79-5) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 1/3/2011) Modified on 1/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 ORDER Granting #1227 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule and to expedite Ruling on the FTAIA's Impact on Indirect Puchaser Claims; Granting #1226 MOTION to Expedite. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 ORDER Granting #1218 Stipulation Regarding Corporate Defendant Family References and Settlement Setoffs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 31, 2010 Filing 1232 REVISED Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's Motions for Deconsolidation and to Expedite Ruling on Defendants' Motion Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction Over Foreign Conduct by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation (Amendment to #1227 . (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/31/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 ORDER by Judge Wilken granting in part and denying in part #1037 Motion Challenging Subject Matter Jurisdiction (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2010)
December 31, 2010 Filing 1230 MOTION for separate trials WITH CORRECTED TABLES OF CONTENTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/31/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2010 Filing 1229 Proposed Order on motion for separate trials by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/31/2010)
December 31, 2010 Filing 1228 Declaration of Gary A. Winters in support of stipulation regarding briefing schedule filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/31/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2010 Filing 1227 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order regarding briefing schedule by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/31/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2010 Filing 1226 MOTION to Expedite ruling filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/31/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 1225 MOTION SEPARATE TRIALS filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 ORDER Expediting Briefing re #1214 MOTION To Name New Tennessee Class Representatives filed by Reclaim Center, Inc., #1215 MOTION for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Decisions as to Westell's Standing filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. Signed by Judge Wilken on 12/30/2010. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 1223 Declaration of Christina Brown in Support of #1211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byHynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1211 ) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 1222 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 14, 2010, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2011. (rhm, ) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 1221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration **Restricted**, #2 Exhibit A (submitted in camera), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2010) Modified on 12/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2010 Filing 1219 Plaintiffs' Joint Brief on Damages Issues filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/28/2010) Modified on 12/29/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2010 Filing 1218 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Corporate Defendant Family References and Settlement Setoffs by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Reclaim Center., Inc, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/28/2010) Modified on 12/29/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 1217 Proposed Order re #1215 MOTION for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Decisions as to Westell's Standing by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Solouki, Mona) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 1216 Declaration of Mona Solouki in Support of #1215 MOTION for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Decisions as to Westell's Standing filed bySamsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #1215 ) (Solouki, Mona) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 1215 MOTION for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Decisions as to Westell's Standing filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Solouki, Mona) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 1214 MOTION To Name New Tennessee Class Representatives filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Name New Tennessee Class Representatives)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 1213 Proposed Order re Cypress's Administrative Motion to Seal by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 1212 Declaration of Joann Liao in Support of Cypress's Administrative Motion to Seal filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 1211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 ORDER Granting #1207 Amended Stipulation Regarding Pretrial Submission of Trial Exhibits, Pretrial Conference Statement and Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2010 Filing 1209 MOTION for Prelminary Approval of Settlement (Samsung) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Francis O. Scarpulla In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement With Samsung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration Of Francis O. Scarpulla In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement With Samsung, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Samsung)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2010) Modified on 12/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2010 Filing 1208 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. of Settlement with Cypress Semiconductor Corporation (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/22/2010) Modified on 12/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2010 Filing 1207 Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Pretrial Submission of Trial Exhibits, Pretrial Conference Statement and Pretrial Conference by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Inc, et al. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2010) Modified on 12/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 ORDER by Judge 12/16/2010 regarding the parties' Motions in Limine #1161 ; #1162 ; #1169 ; and #1172 , and pretrial preparation. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 ORDER Granting in Part Defendant Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 1039): Direct Purchaser Claims Related to Purchases of PSRAM. Signed by Judge Wilken on 12/16/2010. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 14, 2010 Filing 1220 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/2010 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/14/2010), Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2010 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/14/2010). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 ORDER DENYING PART OF DEFENDANT SAMSUNG'S #1039 MOTION for Summary Judgment; DIRECT PURCHASER WESTELL'S INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 ORDER Denying Cypress' #1068 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/10/10. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1202 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Vincent J. Connelly. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 8, 2010 Filing 1202 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Vincent J. Connelly (Filing fee $275, receipt number 44611006119) filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #1 Receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2010 *** Hearing Date re #1197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is terminated *** Administrative Motions are not to be set for hearing unless ordered by the court (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken on Defendants Samsung and Cypress's #1068 Motion for Summary Judgment or partial summary judgment in indirect purchaser actions. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) Modified on 12/9/2010 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Filing 1199 Proposed Order RE: #1162 SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Filing 1198 Proposed Order RE: #1172 DEFENDANT CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATIONS MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Filing 1197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Joint Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62 filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jane N. Yi In Support Of Plaintiffs Joint Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Joint Administrative Motion To Seal Documents Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) And General Order No. 62)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 7, 2010 Filing 1196 [Proposed] Omnibus Order Regarding #1162 , #1169 , #1172 Motions In Limine by Samsung, Cypress, and Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Filing 1195 Memorandum in Opposition to #1172 Defendant Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's Motions In Limine, and #1169 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motions In Limine filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Filing 1194 Declaration of Lee H. Rubin in Support of #1192 Memorandum in Opposition to Motions in Limine filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #1192 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 7, 2010 Filing 1193 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #1194 . *** Declaration of Lee H. Rubin in Support of #1192 Memorandum in Opposition to Motions in Limine filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #1192 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/8/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Filing 1192 Memorandum in Opposition to #1169 Motions in Limine filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 ORDER by Judge Wilken denying #1050 Motion to Decertify DP and IP Plaintiff Classes, and #1052 Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 2/11/2011 08:30 AM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 1190 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of #1176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1176 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1189 Proposed Jury Instructions by Cypress Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. [proposed] Joint Jury Instructions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. and Cypress Semiconductor, Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1188 TRIAL BRIEF by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1187 Proposed Form of Verdict by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1186 Proposed Form of Verdict by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1185 TRIAL BRIEF by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1184 Proposed Form of Verdict by Reclaim Center, Inc. Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Proposed Special Verdict Form (Antitrust Only). (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1183 Proposed Form of Verdict by Westell, Inc. Plaintiffs' Proposed Special Verdict Forms. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1182 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Trial Brief by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 1181 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix of Jury Instructions filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 1180 NOTICE of Motion Hearing by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation re #1172 Motions in Limine. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/1/2010) Modified on 12/2/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2010 Filing 1179 Re-Notice re #1162 Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2010) Modified on 12/2/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2010 Filing 1178 Proposed Order granting #1176 adminstrative motion to seal by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 12/1/2010) Modified on 12/2/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1177 Declaration of J. Joann Liao in Support of #1176 Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/2/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 1175 Proposed Order granting #1172 Motions in limine by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1174 Proposed Findings of Fact by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 1173 Witness List by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 1172 MOTIONS in Limine filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1171 JOINT Witness List by Reclaim Center, Inc., Westell, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1170 JOINT Pretrial Conference Statement by Westell, Inc. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1169 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion In Limine filed by Reclaim Center, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1168 Proposed Findings of Fact by Reclaim Center, Inc. Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Claims for Injunctive Relief and Under Section 17200. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 1167 Proposed Findings of Fact by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. Samsung Defendants' [proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Claim for Injunctive Relief. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 1166 Witness List by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 1165 Declaration of Michael W. Scarborough in Support of #1162 MOTIONS in Limine and Trial Brief filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #1162 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1164 Proposed Order re #1161 Omnibus MOTION in Limine by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1163 Declaration of Neil Swartzberg in Support of #1161 Omnibus MOTION in Limine filed by Westell, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1161 ) (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1162 MOTIONS in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1161 Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Westell, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 11/30/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2010 Filing 1160 Proposed Findings of Fact by Westell, Inc. Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Claim for Injunctive Relief. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 ** Date set according to Docket no. 1159 ** Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2011 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That parties submit items by 11/30/10; submit Trial Briefs, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Verdict forms by 12/03/10; Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/10 at 2:00 PM; Further Pretrial Conference set for 01/18/11 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken, on 11/24/2010. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2010 Filing 1158 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Pretrial Submissions of Trial Exhibits, Pretrial Conference Statement and Pretrial Conference by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 2/3/2011 08:30AM. Jury Trial (6 week)set for 2/3/2011 08:30 AM. #1157 (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 1156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 1157 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2010 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 10/14/2010). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 1155 Proposed Order re #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 by James B Wright. (Wright, James) (Filed on 10/14/2010) Modified on 10/15/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. #1127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ** Administrative Motions are not noticed motions, therefore hearing date set by counsel is terminated ** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1153 Proposed Order re #1137 Motion to File Under Seal by Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Felix, Victor) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/8/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2010 Filing 1152 Declaration of Donald Timms in Support of #1137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byKyocera Wireless Corporation. (Related document(s) #1137 ) (Felix, Victor) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1151 Proposed Order GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Sinclitico, Dennis) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1150 Declaration of JORGE PONT IN SUPPORT OF INDIRECT PURCHASER DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 filed byCisco Systems, Inc.. (Sinclitico, Dennis) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1149 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Westell, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, et al. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/8/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2010 Filing 1148 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ETRON DEFENDANTS (Indirect Purchaser Class). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1147 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE HYNIX DEFENDANTS (Indirect Purchaser Class). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1146 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE MICRON DEFENDANTS (Indirect Purchaser Class). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1145 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE NEC DEFENDANTS (Indirect Purchaser Class). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1144 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE TOSHIBA DEFENDANTS (Indirect Purchaser Class). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 1143 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE RENESAS-HITACHI-MITSUBISHI DEFENDANTS (Indirect Purchaser Class). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1084 Motion Interim Reimbursement of Expenses. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Settlement (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/6/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 1140 Second Supplemental Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of #1084 MOTION for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Second Supplemental Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Exhibit 2 to Second Supplemental Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #3 Exhibit 3 to Second Supplemental Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #4 Exhibit 4 to Second Supplemental Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #5 Exhibit 5 to Second Supplemental Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #6 Proposed Order Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Interim Reimbursement of Expenses)(Related document(s) #1084 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 Filing 1154 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/30/2010 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/30/2010). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to #1084 Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #1102 Motion for Settlement and Fairness Hearing as to #1013 Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010) Modified on 10/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 Filing 1139 Proposed Order re #1137 Administrative Motion to Seal by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 9/30/2010) Modified on 10/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 Filing 1138 Declaration of Joann Liao in Support re #1137 Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 9/30/2010) Modified on 10/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 Filing 1137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 1136 Reply Memorandum re #1052 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Levy filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 9/30/2010) Modified on 10/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 Filing 1135 Proposed Order GRANTING #1127 INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Sinclitico, Dennis) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified on 9/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 Filing 1134 Declaration of JORGE PONT IN SUPPORT OF #1127 INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) AND GENERAL ORDER NO. 62 filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Sinclitico, Dennis) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified on 9/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 Filing 1133 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of #1127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62. filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1127 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified on 9/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Filing 1132 Declaration of Donald Timms in Support of #1127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byKyocera Wireless Corporation. (Related document(s) #1127 ) (Felix, Victor) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1039 Motion for Summary Judgment (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 1130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 1129 Proposed Order Denying Defendants Motion to Decertify the Direct and Indirect Purchaser Classes Or in the Alternative to Stay the Action Pending Identification of Appropriate Class Representatives by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 1128 Proposed Order Denying Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Mark Dwyer by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 1127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 And 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane N. Yi in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/17/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 Filing 1126 Memorandum in Opposition re #1052 Joint MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Levy filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil Swartzberg in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Armando Levy, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Armando Levy, #3 [Proposed] Order Denying Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Armando Levy)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 9/17/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 Filing 1125 Memorandum in Opposition re #1050 Motion to Decertify the Direct Purchaser Class or in the Alternative to Stay the Action Pending Identification of New Class Representative CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1124 filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Motion to Decertify the Direct Purchaser Class or in the Alternative to Stay the Action Pending Identification of New Class Representative CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1124 )(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 9/17/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 Filing 1124 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCUMENT #1125 *** Memorandum in Opposition re #1050 MOTION to Decertify the Direct Purchaser Class or in the Alternative to Stay the Action Pending Identification of New Class Representative filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Motion to Decertify the Direct Purchaser Class or in the Alternative to Stay the Action Pending Identification of New Class Representative)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 9/17/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 Filing 1123 Supplemental Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 1122 Letter from Gary Joseph Bonas II re to clarify some misstatements and or misunderstandings plaintffs' counsel made in their 8/26/10 memo for reimbursement of expenses. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 1121 Declaration of Gary A. Winters in Support of #1120 Reply memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #1120 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 1120 Reply memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 1119 Declaration of Michael W. Scarborough I/S/O Samsung's MSJ Reply Briefs filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 1118 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment in Indirect Purchaser Actions by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 1117 REPLY in support of Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment in Indirect Purchaser Actions filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 1116 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment in Direct Purchaser Actions by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 1115 REPLY in support of Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment in Direct Purchaser Actions filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 1114 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction over Foreign Conduct in Direct Purchaser Actions by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.,Cypress Semiconducotr Corporation., Cypress Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 1113 Joint Reply to Direct Purchase Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction Over Foreign Conduct in Direct Purchaser Actions filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 1112 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction Over Foreign Conduct in Indirect Purchaser Actions by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 1111 Joint REPLY to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction Over Foreign Conduct in Indirect Purchaser Actions filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER re #1109 Granting Stipulation Regarding Defendant Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's Filing Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limit. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ** Hearing Date Terminated. Administrative Motions are not calendared ** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 1109 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendant Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's Filing Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limit by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 1108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by F5 Networks, Inc. re #1107 Declaration in Support,, (Thomopulos, Euphemia) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 1107 Amended Declaration of Jeffrey Christianson in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byF5 Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1078 ) (Thomopulos, Euphemia) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 1106 Declaration of Jeffrey Christianson in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byF5 Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1078 ) (Thomopulos, Euphemia) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER re #1101 Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Non-Parties F5 Networks, Inc. and CDW Corporation to File Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Joint Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-59(D) and Gen eral Order No. 62. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 1104 CLERKS NOTICE to Counsel for CDW Corporation, Inc. re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer regarding manually filed document #1103 . (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 1103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CDW Corporation, Inc. re Proposed Order Granting Joint Administrative Motion to Seal Documents. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2010 Filing 1102 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Memorandum In Support Of Final Approval Of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Christopher T. Micheletti In Support Of Final Approval Of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration Of Christopher T. Micheletti In Support Of Final Approval Of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration Of Christopher T. Micheletti In Support Of Final Approval Of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration Of Christopher T. Micheletti In Support Of Final Approval Of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration Of Christopher T. Micheletti In Support Of Final Approval Of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #6 Declaration Of Dennis Gilardi Re Dissemination Of Notice Of Class Members, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration Of Dennis Gilardi Re Dissemination Of Notice Of Class Members, #8 Exhibit B to Declaration Of Dennis Gilardi Re Dissemination Of Notice Of Class Members, #9 Exhibit C to Declaration Of Dennis Gilardi Re Dissemination Of Notice Of Class Members, #10 Exhibit D to Declaration Of Dennis Gilardi Re Dissemination Of Notice Of Class Members, #11 Exhibit E to Declaration Of Dennis Gilardi Re Dissemination Of Notice Of Class Members, #12 Exhibit F to Declaration Of Dennis Gilardi Re Dissemination Of Notice Of Class Members, #13 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval Of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #14 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To The Etron Defendants, #15 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To The Hynix Defendants, #16 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To The Micron Defendants, #17 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To The NEC Defendants, #18 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To The Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi Defendants, #19 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To The Toshiba Defendants, #20 Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/3/2010) Modified on 9/7/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 Filing 1101 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Non-Parties F5 Networks, Inc. and CDW Corporation to File Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Joint Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-59(D) and General Order No. 62 by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/1/2010) Modified on 9/2/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 Filing 1100 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 1099 Declaration of Christina Brown in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byHynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1078 ) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1098 Proposed Order re #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corp.. (Swartz, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1097 Declaration of Jonathan Swartz in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corp.. (Related document(s) #1078 ) (Swartz, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1096 Proposed Order re #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Derby, Elisabeth) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1095 Supplemental Declaration of Diane Honda in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byExtreme Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1078 ) (Derby, Elisabeth) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1094 Declaration of David J. White in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #1078 ) (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1093 Declaration of Steve Larson in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1078 ) (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1092 Declaration of Alan Marten in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed bySmart Modular Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1078 ) (Sandrock, Ryan) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1091 Proposed Order re #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1090 Declaration of Kyung Whan Kim in Support of #1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) #1078 ) (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 1089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials Filed by Indirect Purchaser (IP) Plaintiffs [Civil Local Rule 7-11, 79-5(d)] filed by Third Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Timms ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 1088 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 1087 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER re Granting Cypress and SamSung Defendant's Administrative Motion to Seal Documents #1043 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 1084 MOTION for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses, #9 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Interim Reimbursement of Expenses)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1043 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 1082 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Westell, Inc. re #1075 Proposed Order, #1076 Proposed Order, #1074 Declaration in Support,, #1077 Proposed Order Certificate of Service (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 1081 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lingel Hart Winters (Winters, Lingel) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 1080 OBJECTIONS to SRAM settlement filed by Chase A. Thompson. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 1079 Proposed Order Denying Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment in Indirect Purchaser Actions by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 1078 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) and General Order No. 62 filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane N. Yi in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to Seal)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 1077 [Proposed] Order Denying Samsungs Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment in Direct Purchaser Action by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 1076 [Proposed] Order Denying Cypress Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 1075 [Proposed] Order Denying Defendants Joint Motion Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 1074 Declaration of Mark Skowronski in Support of Plaintiffs: (1) Opposition to Samsungs Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment in Direct Purchaser Actions; (2) Opposition to Cypress Semiconductor Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment; and (3)Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction Over Foreign Conduct filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 1073 Special Masters Order Discovery Order No. 1: Motion Of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs To Compel Production To Expert Reports And Testimony. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 1071 Proposed Order re #1043 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corp.. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/17/2010) Modified on 8/18/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2010 Filing 1072 OBJECTIONS of Rosemarie Bonas' Estate to class settlements filed by Gary Joseph Bonas II (Attachments: #1 envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 ORDER re #1069 Granting Stipulation REGARDING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' FILING JOINT OPPOSITION IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT [CIVIL L.R. 7-12]. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 1069 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' FILING JOINT OPPOSITION IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT [CIVIL L.R. 7-12] by Westell, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 8/12/2010) Modified on 8/13/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 Filing 1068 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 1067 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF FEDERAL AND STATE ANTITRUST LAWS, STATE CONSUMER PROTECTION LAWS AND STATE COMMON LAW OF UNJUST ENRICHMENT against Alliance Semiconductor Corporation, Crucial Technology, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Cypress Semiconductor, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Epson Electronics America Inc., Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited, Inc., Fujitsu Ltd., GSI Technology Inc, Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Ltd., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., IBM Microelectronics Ltd, Integrated Device Technology, Inc., Integrated Silicon Solution Inc, International Business Machines Corporation, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Mosel Vitelic Inc., NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, STMicroelectronics Inc, STMicroelectronics N.V., Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation, Semiconductor Company, Semiconductor Company, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronic Inc., Toshiba America Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Inc.. Filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER re #1064 Granting Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #1034 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 3, 2010 Filing 1064 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 Filing 1063 Unopposed ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for clarification of 8/2/2010 Order, or, in the alternative, an extension of page limits filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 8/3/2010) Modified on 8/4/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER Consolidating Briefing. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 08/02/10. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 1061 Reply Memorandum re #1034 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 1060 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of #1043 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed byRenesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corp.. (Related document(s) #1043 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Filing 1059 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed by Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Timms ISO Amended Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Filing 1058 Memorandum in Opposition re #1034 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 1057 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed by Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Timms ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 1056 Proposed Order re #1043 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 Filing 1055 Declaration of Richard A. Baker, Jr. in Support of #1043 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed byHewlett-Packard Company. (Related document(s) #1043 ) (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2010 Filing 1054 NOTICE by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney (Cecchini, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1053 Proposed Order re Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Armando Levy by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1052 Joint MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Levy filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., and Samsung Electronics America Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1051 Proposed Order re MOTION to decertify direct purchaser and indirect purchaser classes, or in the alternative, to stay actions pending identification of appropriate class representatives by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1050 MOTION to decertify direct purchaser and indirect purchaser classes, or in the alternative, to stay actions pending identification of appropriate class representatives filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1049 Proposed Order on the Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1048 ***STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER #1062 ***MOTION for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 8/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1047 Proposed Order on the Motion for Summary Judgment by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1046 ***STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER #1062 *** MOTION for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cypress Semiconductor, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 8/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1045 Proposed Order re #1043 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1044 Declaration of John S. Whittaker in Support of #1043 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1043 ) (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1043 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1042 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment in Indirect Purchaser Actions and Declaration in support thereof filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1041 Declaration of Elizabeth Boyd in Support of #1039 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Direct Purchaser Actions and in Indirect Purchaser Actions filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) #1039 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1040 Declaration of Oh Seung Kwon in Support of #1039 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Direct Purchaser Actions and in Indirect Purchaser Actions filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) #1039 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1039 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgmentin Direct Purchaser Actions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1038 Declaration of Daniel L. Rubinfeld in Support of #1037 Joint MOTION Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction over Foreign Conduct filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1037 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1037 Joint MOTION Raising Factual Challenge to Subject Matter Jurisdiction over Foreign Conduct filed by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corp. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 1036 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gilmur Roderick Murray (Murray, Gilmur) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #993 Interim Reimbursement of Expenses (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 1034 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/8/2010) Modified on 7/9/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2010 Filing 1033 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Samsung Summary Judgment Briefing in Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Actions by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 1032 NOTICE by Terry Bisel OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE (Hinson, Sarina) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1031 Letter from Neil Swartzberg. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1030 Corrected Supplemental Declaration of Neil Swartzberg in Support of #993 MOTION For Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #993 ) (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/2/2010) Modified on 7/6/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2010 Filing 1029 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE TOSHIBA DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1028 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ETRON DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1027 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE HYNIX DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1026 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ISSIINEC DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1025 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE MICRON DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1024 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE NEC DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1023 Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi Defendants. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 1022 Supplemental Declaration of Neil Swartzberg in Support of #993 MOTION For Interim Reimbursement of Expenses (with Exhibit A) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #993 ) (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/2/2010) Modified on 7/6/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #994 Final Approval of Plan of Allocation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 1, 2010 Filing 1020 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2010 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/1/2010). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 1019 Statement of Non-Opposition re #993 MOTION For Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed byHynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Related document(s) #993 ) (Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 1018 Declaration of ERIC J. MILLER in Support of #993 MOTION For Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #993 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 1017 Declaration in Support of #993 MOTION For Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #993 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 14, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: #1013 Order. Fairness Hearing set continued to 9/30/2010 02:00 PM pursuant this order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 1016 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change of Format of MDL Master Case Number. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 1015 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change of MDL Master Case Number Format. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 SECOND AMENDED ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED FORMS OF NOTICE REGARDING CLASS ACTION AND PARTIAL SETTLEMENTS AND GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS (MICRON, HYNIX, RENESAS-HITACHI-MITSUBISHI, ETRON, TOSHIBA, NEC). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010) Order is refiled with the correct version of Exhibit A
June 10, 2010 Filing 1012 Letter from Christopher T. Micheletti regarding request that the Court refile correct version of Exhibit A to IP Plaintiffs' Amended Proposed Order. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED FORMS OF NOTICE REGARDING CLASS ACTION AND PARTIAL SETTLEMENTS AND GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS (MICRON, HYNIX, RENESAS-HITACHI-MITSUBISHI, ETRON, TOSHIBA, NEC). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 1010 Letter from Christopher T. Micheletti REGARDING ENTRY OF AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER FILED JUNE 7, 2010. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 1009 NOTICE by Westell Technologies, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Charles E. Tompkins (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 1008 Proposed Order re #1007 Letter Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC) by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Proposed Forms of Notice of Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #2 Exhibit B to Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC))(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 1007 Letter from Christopher T. Micheletti re: Request for Entry of Amended Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlements and Revised Summary Notice. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1014 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2010 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/3/2010). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1006 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Toshiba Defendants by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1005 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi Defendants by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1004 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the NEC Defendants by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #985 Preliminary Approval of Settlements (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1002 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Micron Defendants by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1001 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the ISSI Defendant by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1000 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Hynix Defendants by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 999 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Etron Defendants by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 998 Proposed Order re #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval of Plan of Allocation by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 997 Declaration of Erin Ostenson in Support of #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation, #995 Declaration in Support,, Declaration of Erin Ostenson filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #994 , #995 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 996 Declaration of Eric J. Miller in Support of #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation, #995 Declaration in Support,, Declaration of Eric J. Miller Re: Dissemination of Notice of Partial Class Action Settlements filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #994 , #995 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 995 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #994 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 994 MOTION for Settlement Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) and Plan of Allocation filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 993 MOTION For Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Interim Reimbursement of Expenses)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/25/2010) Modified on 5/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2010 Filing 992 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY of document #989 . (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 24, 2010 Filing 991 Proposed Order Granting Interim Reimbursement of Expenses by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2010) Modified on 5/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2010 Filing 990 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #993 Motion for Interim Reimbursement of Expenses filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #993 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2010) Modified on 5/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2010 Filing 989 ***FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT EVENT USED. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #993 *** NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Notice of Motion and Motion For Interim Reimbursement of Expenses (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Interim Reimbursement of Expenses)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2010) Modified on 5/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2010 Filing 988 NOTICE by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Ltd., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation Notice of Merger and New Name (van Panhuys, Vincent) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 987 Declaration of Dennis Gilardi re dissemination of notice to class members filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dennis Gilardi re Dissemination of Notice to Class Members, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dennis Gilardi re Dissemination of Notice to Class Members, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Dennis Gilardi re Dissemination of Notice to Class Members) (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/15/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2010 Filing 986 Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of #985 MOTION to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC) filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla in Support of Motion to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC))(Related document(s) #985 ) (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/15/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2010 Filing 985 MOTION to Approve Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Approving Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #2 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Order Approving Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC), #3 Exhibit B to [Proposed] Order Approving Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements and Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Hynix, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Etron, Toshiba, NEC))(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/15/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2010 Filing 984 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #983 Clerks Notice (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 6, 2010 Filing 983 CLERKS NOTICE Deeming Objection Denied (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 982 ORDER re #980 Granting Stipulation Amending Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/05/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2010: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (scc, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER re #979 Granting Stipulation Amending Order Granting IP Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/05/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 980 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Amending Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements by Reclaim Center, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Etron Technology America Inc, Etron Technology Inc, Hynix Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC Electronics Corporation, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba Corporation, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amending Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements, #2 Exhibit B to Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amending Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 4/1/2010) Modified on 4/2/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2010 Filing 979 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Amending Order Granting IP Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by Reclaim Center, Inc.Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Etron Technology America Inc, Etron Technology Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Toshiba America Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Hynix Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC Electronics Corporation, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, . (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 4/1/2010) Modified on 4/2/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/2/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER re #977 granting STIPULATION Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Proposed Forms Of Notice Of Class Action And Partial Settlements. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/29/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 977 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Proposed Forms Of Notice Of Class Action And Partial Settlements by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 976 ORDER re #969 granting AMENDED STIPULATION REGARDING REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2011 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/22/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 975 OBJECTIONS to Order by Special Master Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff's Motion to Compel The Production of Documents From Third Party, jabil Circuit, Inc or Alternatively, Motion For Modification of Master's Order or Alternatively Motion For Enlargement of Time and Request For Payment of Cost to Jabil For Producing Ordered Documents by Non-Party Jabil Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Jabil, #2 Exhibit Objection to Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Affidavit)(Woods, Kevin) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Filing 974 AFFIDAVIT of Special Master Martin Quinn [Rule 53(b)(3)]. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER VACATING APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE FERN SMITH AS DISCOVERY MASTER AND APPOINTING NEW DISCOVERY MASTER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/19/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 972 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #945 Motion for Settlement; granting #959 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Toshiba) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 971 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements by Reclaim Center, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements, #2 Exhibit B to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Proposed Forms of Notice Regarding Class Action and Partial Settlements)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified on 3/15/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2010 Filing 970 Letter from Neil Swartzberg Request for Entry of Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlements. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2010 Filing 969 AMENDED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE by Reclaim Center, Inc., Etron Technology America Inc, Etron Technology Inc, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC Electronics Corporation, Toshiba America Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Hynix Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi electric Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc . (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 Filing 968 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE by Reclaim Center, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor corporation, Etron Technology America Inc, Etron Technology Inc, Hynix Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Miron Technology Inc, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC Electgronics Corporation, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba Corporation. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 3/3/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2010 Filing 967 Special Masters Order ORDER BY SPECIAL MASTER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY JABIL CIRCUIT, INC.. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 966 ORDER BY SPECIAL MASTER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY, JABIL CIRCUIT, INC.. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 2/26/2010) Modified on 3/1/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2010 Filing 965 Special Masters Order ORDER RE: MOTION TO ORDER DEPOSITION OF WOUNG MOO LEE OR PROHIBIT HIS TESTIMONY AT TRIAL. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 964 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Wang for Defendant Cypress Semiconductor Corporation (Wang, Philip) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 963 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 3/18/10 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 962 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Westell, Inc. re #960 Declaration in Support, #961 Proposed Order, #959 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Toshiba) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 961 [Proposed] Order Granting re #959 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI, Toshiba) by Westell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 960 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #959 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Toshiba) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #959 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 959 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Toshiba) filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER OF USCA: Denying petition for permission to appeal the district court's 11/25/209 order granting class certification. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 957 AMENDED ORDER re (6 in 4:07-cv-02138-CW) ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING INDIVIDUAL CASES (This corrects an incorrect case number). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 956 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING INDIVIDUAL CASES.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 955 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony D. Shapiro (Shapiro, Anthony) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 950 ORDER Striking Portion of November 17, 2009 Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint #900 (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 949 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 2/25/10 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 21, 2010 Filing 948 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Westell, Inc. re #945 Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI), #946 Declaration in Support,, #947 Proposed Order,, Certificate of Service (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Filing 947 Proposed Order re #945 Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI) by Westell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Filing 946 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #945 Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #945 ) (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Filing 945 Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Micron, Renesas-Hitachi-Mitsubishi, Hynix, NEC, Etron, ISSI) filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER re #807 granting MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to L.R. 7-11. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/21/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER re #807 granting MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 and 79-5. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/21/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 942 Statement of Non-Opposition re #934 Order on Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #934 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/20/2010) Modified on 1/21/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 Filing 940 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris Redacted Public Version filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 Filing 939 Reply Declaration of Mark Dwyer, Ph.D. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Redacted Public Version filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 Filing 938 Reply Declaration of Michael J. Harris, Ph.D. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Redacted Public Versionfiled byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 Filing 937 EXHIBITS 48, 58, 80, 93, 95, 98, 103-107 to Corrected Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 936 Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification Redacted Public Version filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2010 Filing 935 Special Masters Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 1/18/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 934 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #901 Etron Technology, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 14, 2010 Filing 933 EXHIBITS 9-11 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Filing 932 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #933 . *** Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/14/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2010 Filing 931 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint for Violations of Federal and State Antitrust Laws, State Consumer Protection Laws and State Common Law of Unjust Enrichment against Alliance Semiconductor Corporation, Crucial Technology, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Cypress Semiconductor, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Epson Electronics America Inc., Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited, Inc., Fujitsu Ltd., GSI Technology Inc, Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Ltd., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., IBM Microelectronics Ltd, Integrated Device Technology, Inc., Integrated Silicon Solution Inc, International Business Machines Corporation, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Mosel Vitelic Inc., NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, STMicroelectronics Inc, STMicroelectronics N.V., Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation, Semiconductor Company, Semiconductor Company, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronic Inc., Toshiba America Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Inc.. Filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Filing 930 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/14/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/15/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER re #820 granting MOTION to Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER granting Avnet Inc.'s motion to seal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/13/2010. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 920 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #858 Motion to Seal Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 919 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #863 Motion to Seal Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #834 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #853 Request for Modification to Sealing Order (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #839 Motion to Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER re #820 granting in part MOTION to Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/12/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 914 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part #820 Motion to Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 913 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #807 Motion to Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #895 Motion to Seal Document (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #887 Motion to Seal Document (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 30, 2009 Filing 910 Special Masters ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Fern) (Filed on 12/30/2009) Modified on 12/31/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2009 Filing 909 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert J. Gralewski, Jr (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER re #904 granting STIPULATION re Substantive Discovery Produced After 12/11/09. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #906 Motion MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF CLASS NOTICE AND THEIR EXPERTS MERITS REPORTS PENDING THE DECISION OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS ON DEFENDANTS RULE 23(F) PETITION (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 906 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF CLASS NOTICE AND THEIR EXPERTS MERITS REPORTS PENDING THE DECISION OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS ON DEFENDANTS RULE 23(F) PETITION filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TO MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXTEND TIME FOR INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF CLASS NOTICE AND THEIR EXPERTS MERITS REPORTS PENDING THE DECISION OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS ON DEFENDANTS RULE 23(F) PETITION)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 905 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF CLASS NOTICE AND THEIR EXPERTS MERITS REPORTS PENDING THE DECISION OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS ON DEFENDANTS RULE 23(F) PETITION by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 12/16/2009) Modified on 12/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2009 Filing 904 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Substantive Discovery Produced After 12/11/09, filed by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #645 Motion to Certify Class; denying #706 Motion to Strike ; denying #797 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Rebuttal Opinions Of Mark Dwyer And Michael J. Harris; denying #799 Motion to Strike (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 902 FOURTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF FEDERAL AND STATE ANTITRUST LAWS, STATE CONSUMER PROTECTION LAWS AND STATE COMMON LAW OF UNJUST ENRICHMENT; JURY DEMAND against Reclaim Center, Inc.. Filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/19/2009) Modified on 11/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2009 Filing 901 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Etron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew S. Leddicotte, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas M. Jasinski, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grannon, Eric) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #886 INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 899 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Notice of Filing of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Post-Class Certification Hearing Memorandum (Unredacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Post-Class Certification Hearing Memorandum (Unredacted))(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 898 Reply Memorandum re #886 MOTION for Leave to File File Fourth Amended Complaint filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/5/2009) Modified on 11/6/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #879 Motion to Seal Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 896 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc. re Unredacted Copies of Documents Filed Under Seal (Leddicotte, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2009) Modified on 10/30/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2009 Filing 895 MOTION to Seal Document #892 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed by Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Leddicotte in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal)(Leddicotte, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2009) Modified on 10/30/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2009 Filing 894 NOTICE by Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc. of Manual Filing of Exhibits 4 and 5 to Leddicotte Declaration (Leddicotte, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 893 NOTICE by Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc. of Manual Filing of Opposition to Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Leddicotte, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 892 Memorandum in Opposition re #886 MOTION for Leave to File File Fourth Amended Complaint filed byEtron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Leddicotte, #2 Exhibit 1 to Leddicotte Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Leddicotte Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Leddicotte Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Leddicotte Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Leddicotte Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Leddicotte Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Leddicotte Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Leddicotte Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Leddicotte Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Leddicotte Declaration, #12 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint)(Leddicotte, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 891 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification re: Exhibit A to [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 890 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification re: Exhibits 9, 10, 11 to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 889 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification re: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 888 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification re: Exhibit A to Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 887 MOTION to Seal Document #886 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d), #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d))(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 886 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Motion, #3 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 to Micheletti Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Micheletti Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Micheletti Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Micheletti Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Micheletti Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Micheletti Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Micheletti Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Micheletti Declaration, #12 Exhibit 9 to Micheletti Declaration, #13 Exhibit 10 to Micheletti Declaration, #14 Exhibit 11 to Micheletti Declaration, #15 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #16 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Order)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/15/2009) Modified on 10/16/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 Filing 885 Declaration of Paul Alexander in Support of #879 MOTION to Seal Document Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) MOTION to Seal Document Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) MOTION to Seal Document Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byResearch In Motion Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #879 ) (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 884 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #883 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Eric Grannon (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 883 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Eric Grannon ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004199.) filed by Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #2 Receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2009 Filing 882 OBJECTIONS to and Request to Strike Unauthorized Filing by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Striking Defendants' Unauthorized Filing)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 10/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2009 Filing 881 OBJECTIONS to re #878 Response in Support by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 29, 2009 Filing 880 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification re: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Post-Class Certification Hearing Memorandum (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 28, 2009 Filing 879 MOTION to Seal Document Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d), #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d))(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 28, 2009 Filing 878 RESPONSE in Support Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Post-Class Certification Hearing Memorandum filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #872 Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief Regarding Inaccurate Statements and New Issues raised at the Hearing on Class Certification. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 876 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Joseph Barry, Esq (Barry, Brian) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 875 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief Regarding Inaccurate Statements and New Issues Raised at the Hearing on Class Certification filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/18/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2009 Filing 874 Proposed Order re #872 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING INACCURATE STATEMENTS AND NEW ISSUES RAISED AT THE HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 873 Declaration of Patrick M. Ryan in Support of #872 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING INACCURATE STATEMENTS AND NEW ISSUES RAISED AT THE HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Supp. Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Supp. Brief (Hearing Trans.), #3 Exhibit B -- Meet-and-Confer email string)(Related document(s) #872 ) (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 872 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING INACCURATE STATEMENTS AND NEW ISSUES RAISED AT THE HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 3, 2009 Filing 871 AMENDED Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/3/2009), Further Case Management Conference held on 9/3/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/3/2009). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2009)
September 3, 2009 Filing 870 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/3/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/3/2009), Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/3/2009) re #799 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Michelle M. Burtis filed by Reclaim Center, Inc., #706 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF MARK DWYER AND MICHAEL J. HARRIS filed by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., #797 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Rebuttal Opinions Of Mark Dwyer And Michael J. Harris filed by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., #645 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2009)
September 2, 2009 Filing 868 Amended Proposed Order re #645 MOTION to Certify Class by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/2/2009) Modified on 9/3/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2009 Filing 867 NOTICE by Etron Technology America, Inc., Etron Technology, Inc. to Remove Counsel (Mark Lambert) from Service List Due to Change of Firm Affiliation (Leddicotte, Matthew) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 1, 2009 Filing 866 Proposed Order re #645 MOTION to Certify Class by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 31, 2009 Filing 865 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avnet, Inc. re #864 Proposed Order, #863 Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to Seal (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 Filing 864 Proposed Order re #863 Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to Seal by Avnet, Inc.. (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 Filing 863 Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to Seal (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Filing 927 Declaration of Steve Larson in support of Avnet Inc.'s motion to seal filed byAvnet, Inc.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 28, 2009 Filing 926 MOTION to Seal filed by Avnet, Inc.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL*** Modified on 1/13/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Filing 869 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avnet, Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 Filing 862 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avnet, Inc. re #861 Proposed Order, #860 Declaration in Support, #859 Declaration in Support, #858 Motion (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Filing 861 Proposed Order re #858 Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version by Avnet, Inc.. (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Filing 860 Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang in Support of #858 Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Manual Filing Notification filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Related document(s) #858 ) (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Filing 859 Declaration of Steve Larson in Support of #858 Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Related document(s) #858 ) (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Filing 858 Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version by Avnet, Inc. (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 Filing 857 Declaration of Donald Timms in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byThird Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 Filing 856 Proposed Order re #839 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 by Non-Party 3Com Corporation. (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 Filing 855 Declaration of Richard A. Baker in Support of #839 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Non-Party 3Com Corporation (Related document(s) #839 ) (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 Filing 854 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Third Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp. re #853 Request for Modification to Sealing Order, [857 Declaration (Felix, Victor) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 Filing 853 Request for Modification to Sealing Order by Third Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #2 Proposed Order)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Filing 852 Declaration of James Pruitt in Support of #820 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #820 ) (Meek, Catherine) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER re #842 granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Unredacted Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order on Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/26/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #843 MOTION re Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rules 7-6 and 7-11 and General Order No. 58 IV.E. re #645 MOTION to Certify Class (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 846 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rules 7-6 and 7-11 and General Order No. 58 IV.E. filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rules 7-6 and 7-11 and General Order No. 58 IV.E.)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 Filing 923 Omnibus Reply to motions to exclude the expert opinions and rebuttal opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 21, 2009 Filing 844 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of #843 MOTION Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rules 7-6 and 7-11 and General Order No. 58 IV.E. filed by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Related document(s) #843 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 Filing 843 MOTION Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rules 7-6 and 7-11 and General Order No. 58 IV.E. re #645 MOTION to Certify Class filed by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 Filing 842 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Unredacted Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order on Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 Filing 841 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation re #838 Reply Memorandum, Unredacted Version (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 840 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of #839 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Related document(s) #839 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 Filing 839 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Filing 845 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re memorandum in opposition to defendants' motion to exclude the expert rebuttal opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris (submitted under seal version) by Reclaim Center, Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009) (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Filing 838 Reply Memorandum re #706 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF MARK DWYER AND MICHAEL J. HARRIS, #797 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Rebuttal Opinions Of Mark Dwyer And Michael J. Harris filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 837 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Filing 836 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Filing 835 NOTICE by United States Department of Justice Of Removal Of Counsel (Maher, Lidia) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 834 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Filing 833 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude The Expert Rebuttal Opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2009 Filing 832 Amended Proposed Order by Third Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 8/19/2009) Modified on 8/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2009 Filing 831 Declaration of Eric Klein in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(3) filed byThird Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 19, 2009 Filing 830 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF NON-PARTY 3COMS DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5). (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 8/19/2009) Modified on 8/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2009 Filing 829 Declaration of Richard A. Baker in Support of #820 MOTION to Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Non-Party 3Com Corporation. (Related document(s) #820 ) (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 8/19/2009) Modified on 8/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part #751 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #781 Motion to Seal Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 827 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #770 Motion to Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER re #813 GRANTING AS MODIFIED Stipulation Regarding Revised Case Management Schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2011 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 825 DUPLICATIVE FILING OF DOCKET #809 ORDER re #792 granting MOTION to Permit Disclosure to Intel Corporation of Documents Filed Under Seal [Local Rule 7-11]. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 8/17/2009 (scc, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2009 Filing 941 EXHIBIT C to the Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in opposition to defendants' motions to exclude the expert opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 14, 2009 Filing 922 EXHIBIT D to the Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in opposition to defendants' motions to exclude the expert opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 14, 2009 Filing 921 Memorandum in Opposition defendants' motion to exclude the expert rebuttal opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed by Indirect Pruchaser Plaintiff,Reclaim Center, Inc.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)***FILE UNDER SEAL ***
August 14, 2009 Filing 824 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Filing 823 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. re #822 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Manual Filing Notification Re: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris (Filed Under Seal Version) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Filing 822 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification Re: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris (Filed Under Seal Version) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 821 Memorandum in Opposition re #799 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Michelle M. Burtis filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 820 MOTION to Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d), #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d))(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/13/2009) Modified on 8/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2009 Filing 819 DECLARATION of Christopher T. Micheletti in Opposition to #818 Memorandum in Opposition, #817 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C & D)(Related document(s) #818 , #817 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 818 *** FILED IN ERROR. SEE REFILED DOCUMENT #833 . *** Memorandum in Opposition Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Rebuttal Opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/13/2009) Modified on 8/20/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/21/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/13/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2009 Filing 817 Memorandum in Opposition Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mark Dwyer and Michael J. Harris filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 816 Declaration of Donald Timms in Support of #807 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 filed byThird Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #807 ) (Felix, Victor) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 815 Proposed Order re #807 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion by U.S. Cellular Corp.. (Patel, Menesh) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 814 Declaration of Claire M. Korenblit in Support of #807 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 filed byU.S. Cellular Corp.. (Related document(s) #807 ) (Patel, Menesh) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 12, 2009 Filing 813 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Revised Case Management Schedule by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2009 Filing 812 Declaration of Richard A. Baker, Jr. in Support of #807 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Non-Party 3Com Corp: (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF NON-PARTY 3COMS DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5)(Related document(s) #807 ) (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 8/11/2009) Modified on 8/12/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 Filing 811 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jung-Ying Joann Liao (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #733 Motion for Extension of Time to File (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #792 Motion for Disclosure (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 808 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 6, 2009 Filing 954 EXHIBITS GGG and HHH to the declaration of Patrick M. Ryan in support of defendants' surreply to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' motion for class certification filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 6, 2009 Filing 953 EXHIBITS 114 - 116 and 119 to the surrebuttal declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 6, 2009 Filing 952 Surrebuttal Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 6, 2009 Filing 951 Surreply to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
August 6, 2009 Filing 807 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 filed by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal)(Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 8/6/2009) Modified on 8/7/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2009 Filing 806 Surrebuttal Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis Ph.D. filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 112 - List of Additional Materials Considered, #2 Exhibit 113 Petroleum-Refining Industry Business Interruption Losses due to, #3 Exhibit 114 - 10-K Document, #4 Exhibit 115 - Dr. Dwyer's Regression Analysis, #5 Exhibit 116 - Dr. Dwyer's Regression Analysis, #6 Exhibit 117 Consisting of 117A-B Articles by J. Nieberding and D. Gujarati, #7 Exhibit 118 Consisting of 118A-C - Articles by ABA, D. Rubenfeld, and D. Gujarati, #8 Exhibit 119 - Dr. Dwyer's Test of SRAM Cost Price, #9 Exhibit 120 - Cost Pass-Through in Differentiated Product Markets: The Case of U.S. Processed Cheese, #10 Exhibit 121 - Stigler, Kindahl, and Means on Administered Prices, #11 Exhibit 122 The Rigidity of Prices, #12 Exhibit 123 - Handbook of Industrial Organization, #13 Exhibit 124 - Part 1 of 2, Consisting of 124A-C - Articles by D. Levy, M. Bergen, S. Dutta, and R. Venabale; J. Hess and E. Gerstner; and E. Anderson and D. Simester, #14 Exhibit 124 Part 2 of 2, Consisting of 124C (continued) and 124D Article by T. Nagle and J. Hogan, #15 Exhibit 125 Part 1 of 2, Consisting of 125A - Article by R. Harris and L. Sullivan, #16 Exhibit 125 Part 2 of 2, Consisting of 125A (continued), 125B and 125C - Articles by J. Nieberding and R. Cantor; and S. Hussain, D. Garrett, and V. Howell)(Related document(s) #803 ) (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 8/6/2009) Modified on 8/7/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2009 Filing 805 Declaration of Patrick M. Ryan in Support of #803 Reply Memorandum, filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GGG - Selected Excerpts From the Deposition of Steven Watts, Taken June 18, 2009, #2 Exhibit HHH - Selected Excerpts From the Deposition of Mark Lieberman, Taken June 19, 2009, #3 Exhibit III - Selected Excerpts from the deposition of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D., taken June 5, 2009)(Related document(s) #803 ) (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 6, 2009 Filing 803 Surreply re #645 MOTION to Certify Class filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix H Part 1 of 3, Case 1 Court Decisions Not Publicly Available, #2 Appendix H Part 2 of 3, Case 2-5 Court Decisions Not Publicly Available, #3 Appendix H Part 3 of 3, Case 6-9 Court Decisions Not Publicly Available)(Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 8/6/2009) Modified on 8/7/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #800 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Catherine E. Palmer (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER re #796 DENYING Stipulation Regarding Revised Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 3, 2009 Filing 801 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 8/6/09 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 Filing 800 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Catherine E. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003927.) filed by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #1 receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2009 Filing 799 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Michelle M. Burtis; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Jane Yi Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Yi Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Yi Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Yi Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Yi Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Yi Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Yi Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Yi Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Yi Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Yi Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Yi Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Yi Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Yi Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Yi Declaration, #15 Proposed Order)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 7/30/2009) Modified on 7/31/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2009 Filing 798 Declaration of Patrick M. Ryan in Support of #797 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Rebuttal Opinions Of Mark Dwyer And Michael J. Harris byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I (Part 1 of 3) Book:The Theory And The Facts Of How Markets Clear, #2 Exhibit I (Part 2 of 3) Book: The Theory And The Facts Of How Markets Clear, #3 Exhibit I (Part 3 of 3) Book: The Theory And The Facts Of How Markets Clear, #4 Exhibit II Article: The Magnitude Of Menu Costs, #5 Exhibit III Article: Loss Leader Pricing And Rain Check Policy, #6 Exhibit IV Article: The Role Of Pricing Endings, #7 Exhibit V Book: The Strategy And Tactics Of Pricing, #8 Exhibit VI Article: Estimating Overcharges In Antitrust Cases Using A Reduced-Form Approach, #9 Exhibit VII Book: Basic Econometrics, #10 Exhibit VIII Book: Econometrics Legal, Practical, And Technical Issues)(Related document(s) #797 ) (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 7/30/2009) Modified on 7/31/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2009 Filing 797 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Rebuttal Opinions Of Mark Dwyer And Michael J. Harris re #747 Declaration in Support, #749 Reply to Opposition, #748 Declaration in Support; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, filed by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 7/30/2009) Modified on 7/31/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2009 Filing 796 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Revised Case Management Schedule by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/29/2009) Modified on 7/30/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #784 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket Item 781-7 (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 27, 2009 Filing 794 Proposed Order Re Administrative Motion to Permit Disclosure to Intel Corporation of Documents Filed Under Seal by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Filing 793 Declaration of Neil Swartzberg in Support of Administrative Motion to Permit Disclosure to Intel Corporation of Documents Filed Under Seal filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #792 ) (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Filing 792 MOTION to Permit Disclosure to Intel Corporation of Documents Filed Under Seal [Local Rule 7-11] filed by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2009 Filing 791 Reply Declaration of Janet Craycroft in Support of #733 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Opt-Out Class filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) #733 ) (Spillner, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2009) Modified on 7/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2009 Filing 790 Reply Memorandum re #733 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Intent to Opt-Out of Class filed byIntel Corporation. (Spillner, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 23, 2009 Filing 789 Proposed Order re #770 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) by Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 7/23/2009) Modified on 7/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2009 Filing 788 Declaration of John S. Whittaker in Support of #770 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) #770 ) (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 7/23/2009) Modified on 7/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2009 Filing 787 Declaration of Kyung Whan Kim in Support of #770 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Related document(s) #770 ) (Whittaker, John) (Filed on 7/23/2009) Modified on 7/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER re #769 GRANTING STIPULATION re Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 7/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 20, 2009 Filing 784 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket Item 781-7 filed by Avnet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Avnet, Inc.'s Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document)(Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 20, 2009 Filing 783 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Avnet, Inc.. Amendment to #781 MOTION to Seal Document Non-Party Corrected Exhibit D. (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 785 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avnet, Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 782 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avnet, Inc. re #781 MOTION to Seal Document Non-Party (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 781 *** EXHIBIT D DELETED PER ORDER #795 . PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #783 . *** MOTION to Seal Document Non-Party filed by Avnet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Steve Larson In Support of Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang In Support of Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Manual Filing Notification, #3 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang In Support of Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang In Support of Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang In Support of Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang In Support of Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang In Support of Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal - Public Version, #8 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Avnet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal)(Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified on 7/20/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 Filing 780 Notice of filing of Declaration of Michael J. Harris, Ph.D. in Support of #645 MOTION to Certify Class (Unredacted) filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Related document(s) #645 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified on 7/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 Filing 779 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Westell, Inc. re #771 Declaration in Support, #776 Declaration in Support, #775 Declaration in Support, #777 Certificate of Service,, #774 Memorandum in Opposition, #772 Proposed Order, #773 Notice (Other), #770 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) Amended Certificate of Service (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 850 EXHIBIT A re #775 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Opposition to Intel Corporation's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Exclude Itself from the Class filed byWestell Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #775 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
July 16, 2009 Filing 778 Joint Statement of Non-Opposition re #733 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Intent to Opt-Out of Class filed byToshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba Corporation, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Etron Technology America Inc, Etron Technology Inc, Hitachi America Ltd., Hitachi Ltd., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC Electronics Corporation, Integrated Silicon Solution Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Related document(s) #733 ) (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 777 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Westell, Inc. re #771 Declaration in Support, #776 Declaration in Support, #775 Declaration in Support, #774 Memorandum in Opposition, #772 Proposed Order, #773 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #770 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) Certificate of Service (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 776 Declaration of Eric J. Miller re: Dissemination of Notice of Pendency of Class Action Lawsuit to Intel Corporation - Redacted filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 775 Declaration in Support of #774 Memorandum in Opposition to Intel Corporation's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Exclude Itself from the Class filed byWestell, Inc.. (Related document(s) #774 ) (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 774 Memorandum in Opposition to Intel Corporation's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Exclude Itself from the Class filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 773 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. of Manual Filing (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 772 Proposed Order re #770 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 771 Declaration of Neil Swartzberg in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 770 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Westell, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 769 STIPULATION re Substitution of Counsel and [Proposed] Order filed by Integrated Silicon Solution Inc (Davis, Lisa) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2009 Filing 766 Declaration of Gary Beck PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5(d) IN SUPPORT OF A SEALING ORDER FOR EXHIBIT 45 FILED WITH INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byResearch In Motion Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 765 Declaration of Laura Guillen in Support of #751 MOTION to Seal l Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents)(Related document(s) #751 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 9, 2009 Filing 848 EXHIBITS 45, 47, 51, 55-57, 60-79, 81, 83-92, 97, 99-102 & 108 re #752 Declaration of Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byIndirec Purchaser Class (Related document(s) #752 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
July 9, 2009 Filing 764 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Filing 763 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 8, 2009 Filing 762 ERRATA re #752 Declaration in Support,,,, Errata to Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Errata, #2 Exhibit 18 (Corrected) to Micheletti Corrected Declaration, #3 Exhibit 19 (Corrected) to Micheletti Corrected Declaration, #4 Exhibit 94 (Corrected) to Micheletti Corrected Declaration, #5 Exhibit 105 and 106 (Corrected) to Micheletti Corrected Declaration (Redacted Version), #6 Certificate of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 925 Reply Declaration of Mark Dwyer, Ph.D in support of plaintiffs' motion for class certification filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 1/13/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***FILED UNDER SEAL***
July 6, 2009 Filing 924 Reply Memorandum in support of motion for class certification filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs,Reclaim Center, Inc.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
July 6, 2009 Filing 847 Reply Declaration of Michael J. Harris, Ph.D.; Exhibits 4 and 6 filed byIndirect Purchaser Class(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
July 6, 2009 Filing 760 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification Re: Reply Declaration of Mark Dwyer, Ph.D. in Support of Reply Brief (Filed Under Seal Version) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 759 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification Re: Reply Declaration of Michael J. Harris in Support of Reply Brief (Filed Under Seal Version) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 758 ***FILED IN ERROR PER MINDY DAVIES*** NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification Re: Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Reply Brief (Filed Under Seal Version) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/6/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2009 Filing 757 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Manual Filing Notification Re: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Filed Under Seal Version) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 756 EXHIBITS 49 to 111 to Micheletti Declaration filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50, #2 Exhibit 51, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 53, #5 Exhibit 54, #6 Exhibit 55-58, #7 Exhibit 59, #8 Exhibit 60-81, #9 Exhibit 82, #10 Exhibit 83-95, #11 Exhibit 96, #12 Exhibit 97-110, #13 Exhibit 111)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 755 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 754 Proposed Order Granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 753 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 752 Declaration of Micheletti in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47-48, #48 Proof of Service)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/9/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***PLEASE ALSO SEE DOCUMENT #762 RE CORRECTION***
July 2, 2009 Filing 751 MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/6/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2009 Filing 750 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. re #749 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/6/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2009 Filing 749 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/6/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2009 Filing 748 Declaration of Harris (Redacted Version) filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proof of Service)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 747 Reply Declaration of Mark Dwyer, Ph.D. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/6/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2009 Filing 746 NOTICE by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation Notice of Re-Filing of the Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. and Certain Exhibits Thereto Pursuant to the Courts Orders on Defendants Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. Part 1, #2 Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. Part 2, #3 Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. Part 3, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26, #15 Exhibit 27 Part 1, #16 Exhibit 27 Part 2, #17 Exhibit 31 Part 1, #18 Exhibit 31 Part 2, #19 Exhibit 32 Part 1, #20 Exhibit 32 Part 2, #21 Exhibit 33, #22 Exhibit 34, #23 Exhibit 35, #24 Exhibit 36, #25 Exhibit 37, #26 Exhibit 38, #27 Exhibit 39, #28 Exhibit 40, #29 Exhibit 41, #30 Exhibit 42, #31 Exhibit 45, #32 Exhibit 47, #33 Exhibit 49, #34 Exhibit 52, #35 Exhibit 58, #36 Exhibit 101)(Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 745 NOTICE by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation Notice of Re-Filing of Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Patrick. M. Ryan Pursuant to the Courts Orders on Defendants Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mike Anderson in Support of Foundry Response to Subpoena, #2 Exhibit C - Declaration of Steve Watts in Support of Kyocera Response to Subpoena, #3 Exhibit D - Declaration of Mark Lieberman in Support of Kyocera Response To Subpoena, #4 Exhibit PP - Costco Bill Prescott Declaration)(Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 744 NOTICE by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation Notice of Re-Filing of Defendants Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification Pursuant to the Courts Orders on Defendants Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Defendants Opposition To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification Part 1, #2 Defendants Opposition To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification Part 2)(Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 768 EXHIBIT 12 re #746 Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Related document(s) #746 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
June 29, 2009 Filing 767 EXHIBITS C and D re #745 Declaration of Patrick M. Ryan in support of defendants' opposition to indirect purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Related document(s) #745 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
June 29, 2009 Filing 761 EXHIBIT 50 to the Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER re #732 granting Request for Modification to Sealing Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER re #726 granting DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO SEAL EXHIBIT 50 TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. BURTIS, PH.D.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER re #740 granting STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to File Unredacted Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order(s) on Defendants' Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 740 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time for Defendants to File Unredacted Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order(s) on Defendants' Motion to Seal by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, Reclaim Center Inc, Toshiba America Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Etron Technology Inc, Cypress Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 6/26/2009) Modified on 6/29/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2009 Filing 739 Statement of Non-Opposition Joint Statement of Non-Opposition to Third Party Kyocera Wireless Corporation's Request for Modification to Sealing Order filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 738 Proposed Order re #732 Notice (Other) Granting Modified Order in Part Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal by Third Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 737 NOTICE by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Ltd., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation of Withdrawal of Daniel E. Alberti as Attorney of Record (Jacobs, Matthew) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 23, 2009 Filing 736 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request to Seal Exhibit 50 to the Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 6/23/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 735 Declaration of Michael C. Spillner in Support of #733 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Intent to Opt-Out of Class filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #733 ) (Spillner, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 734 Declaration of Janet Craycroft in Support of #733 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Intent to Opt-Out of Class filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #733 ) (Spillner, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 733 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Intent to Opt-Out of Class filed by Intel Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spillner, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 732 Request for Modification to Sealing Order by Kyocera Wireless Corporation(Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #2 Affidavit)(Felix, Victor) (Filed on 6/22/2009) Modified on 6/23/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #730 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Franklin M. Rubinstein (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009) Modified on 6/22/2009 (kk, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2009 Filing 730 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Frankin M. Rubinstein (Filing fee $210, receipt number 44611003752) filed by Integrated Silicon Solution Inc. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #1 receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER re #727 granting STIPULATION ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JUNE 5, 2009 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/12/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 728 Letter from Patrick M. Ryan to The Honorable Claudia Wilken. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 727 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JUNE 5, 2009 ORDER by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 726 NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5 filed by NEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 6/10/2009) Modified on 6/11/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part #688 Motion to Seal Document ; granting in part and denying in part #695 Motion to Seal (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #648 Motion to Seal Document (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 720 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Davis and Scott A. Sher on behalf of Defendant Integrated Silicon Solutions, Inc. (Davis, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #718 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Aimee D. Latimer-Zayets (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 718 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Aimee D. Latimer-Zayets ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003658.) filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #1 receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2009 Filing 717 Special Masters Order Order Re: Deposition Location for W.M. Lee. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER re #677 ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR ALLEGED DISCOVERY VIOLATIONS BY INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 715 Letter from Francis O. Scarpulla to The Honorable Claudia Wilken. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 714 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert S. Green NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Green, Robert) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 713 STATEMENT OF PARTIAL NON-OPPOSITION AND RESPONSE TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS #701 OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to proposed order adopting Special Master's Report)(Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 5/15/2009) Modified on 5/18/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER re #705 granting Amended Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Reply Papers in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification; for Defendants to Respond to Same; and Change Hearing Date. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2009 02:00 PM. Indirect-Purchaser Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER re #701 ON FILING A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR ALLEGED DISCOVERY VIOLATIONS BY INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 5/13/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 Filing 710 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiffs filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 709 Letter from Francis O. Scarpulla to The Honorable Claudia Wilken. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 708 Letter from Patrick M. Ryan. (Chan, Eva) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 707 MOTION TO ADOPT SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR ALLEGED DISCOVERY VIOLATIONS BY INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS filed by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Chan, Eva) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 706 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF MARK DWYER AND MICHAEL J. HARRIS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES) filed by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Eva) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 705 Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Reply Papers in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification; for Defendants to Respond to Same; and Change Hearing Date by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba Corporation, Etron Technology America Inc., Cypress Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd, Samsun Semiconductor Inc(Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 704 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. re #701 Objection Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs' Ojbections to The Special Discovery Master's Report and Recommendation Filed on April 17, 2009 (Dkt. No. 677) (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 703 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Order Adopting in Part and Modified in Part Special Discovery Master's Report and Recommendation For Alleged Discovery Violations By Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #701 ) (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 702 Proposed Order Adopting in Part and Modified in Part Special Discovery Master's Report and Recommendation for Alleged Discovery Violations by Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 701 OBJECTIONS to The Special Discovery Master's Report and Recommendation Filed on April 17, 2009 (Dkt. No. 677) by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 700 Declaration of Ellen F. De Los Santos in Support of #688 Amended MOTION to Seal Document filed by Non-Party Blue Coat Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #688 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 699 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avnet, Inc. re #697 Declaration in Support, #695 MOTION to Seal Non-Party Avnet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to Seal, #698 Proposed Order, #696 Declaration in Support (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 698 Proposed Order re #695 MOTION to Seal by Avnet, Inc.. (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 697 Declaration of Steve Larson in Support of #695 MOTION to Seal filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Related document(s) #695 ) (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 696 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION re Declaration of Gigi C. Hoang in Support of #695 MOTION to Seal filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Related document(s) #695 ) (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 695 MOTION to Seal filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 694 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Reply Papers in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification; for Defendants to Respond to Same; and Change Hearing Date by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 693 Declaration of Claire M. Korenblit in Support of #688 Amended MOTION to Seal Document filed byU.S. Cellular Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #688 ) (Patel, Menesh) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 692 Proposed Order re Amended Administrative Motion to Seal by Sun Microsystems, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 691 Declaration of Warren Mootrey in Support of #688 Amended MOTION to Seal Document filed bySun Microsystems, Inc.. (Related document(s) #688 ) (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2009 Filing 690 Declaration of Donald Timms in Support of #688 Amended MOTION to Seal Document #684 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #681 Memorandum in Opposition,, #683 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,, filed byThird Party Witness Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #688 ) (Felix, Victor) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 725 Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
May 4, 2009 Filing 724 EXHIBITS 3-10,14,21,22,24,28-30,43,44,56,67 to the Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
May 4, 2009 Filing 723 Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNEC Electronics America Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
May 1, 2009 Filing 689 Declaration of Eva Chan in Support of #688 Amended MOTION to Seal Document filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Chan Decl.)(Related document(s) #688 ) (Chan, Eva) (Filed on 5/1/2009) Modified on 5/4/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 Filing 688 Amended MOTION to Seal Document by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Amended Motion to Seal)(Chan, Eva) (Filed on 5/1/2009) Modified on 5/4/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2009 Filing 687 Declaration of Eva Chan filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Dec. of Eva Chan)(Chan, Eva) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 686 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCUMENT #687 *** Declaration of Eva Chan in Support of #685 MOTION to Seal Document #684 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #681 Memorandum in Opposition,, #683 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Seal Document #684 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #681 Memorandum in Opposition,, #683 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,, filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Related document(s) #685 ) (Chan, Eva) (Filed on 4/30/2009) Modified on 5/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2009 Filing 685 MOTION to Seal Document #684 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #681 Memorandum in Opposition,, #683 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,, filed by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Chan, Eva) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 684 Declaration of Patrick M. Ryan filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Mike Anderson in Support of Foundrys Response, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 of 6 Harris Depo, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 of 6 Harris Depo, #4 Exhibit B Part 3 of 6 Harris Depo, #5 Exhibit B Part 4 of 6 Harris Depo, #6 Exhibit B Part 5 of 6 Harris Depo, #7 Exhibit B Part 6 of 6 Harris Depo Exhibits, #8 Exhibit C Declaration of Steve Watts in Support of Kyocera Response, #9 Exhibit D Declaration of Mark Lieberman in Support of Kyocera Response To Subpoena, #10 Exhibit E Part 1 of 2 Kicia Depo, #11 Exhibit E Part 2 of 2 Kicia Depo Exhibits, #12 Exhibit F Part 1 of 2 Brooks Depo, #13 Exhibit F Part 2 of 2 Brooks Depo Exhibit 1, #14 Exhibit G Part 1 of 2 Sterenberg Depo, #15 Exhibit G Part 2 of 2 Sterenberg Depo Exhibits, #16 Exhibit H Part 1 of 3 Culver Depo, #17 Exhibit H Part 2 of 3 Culver Depo Exhibits 1-4, #18 Exhibit H Part 3 of 3 Culver Depo Exhibits 5-6, #19 Exhibit I Part 1 of 4 Munoz Depo, #20 Exhibit I Part 2 of 4 Munoz Depo Exhibit 1, #21 Exhibit I Part 3 of 4 Munoz Depo Exhibit 2, #22 Exhibit I Part 3 of 4 Munoz Depo Exhibit 2, #23 Exhibit I J Part 1 of 6 Edwards Depo, #24 Errata J Part 2 of 6 Edwards Depo Exhibits 1-4, #25 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 3 of 6 Edwards Depo Exhibits 5-6, #26 Exhibit J Part 4 of 6 Edwards Depo Exhibit 7 to 0726, #27 Exhibit J Part 5 of 6 Edwards Depo Exhibit 7 0727-0757, #28 Errata J Part 6 of 6 Edwards Depo Exhibit 7 0758-0790, #29 Exhibit K Part 1 of 2 Stargate Films Depo, #30 Exhibit K Part 2 of 2 Stargate Films Depo Exhibits, #31 Exhibit L Part 1 of 3 Dwyer Depo pp 1-114, #32 Exhibit L Part 2 of 3 Dwyer Depo pp 115-226, #33 Exhibit L Part 3 of 3 Dwyer Depo Exhibits, #34 Exhibit M Custom SRAM Declaration, #35 Exhibit N JP Micro Rog Responses Depo Exhibit B, #36 Exhibit O NYT article Hiding in Plain Sight, Google Seeks More Power, #37 Exhibit P Third Party Linksys Amended Objections and Responses, #38 Exhibit Q Part 1 of 2 Allen Depo, #39 Exhibit Q Part 2 of 2 Allen Depo Exhibits, #40 Exhibit R Part 1 of 3 Cater Depo pp 1-67, #41 Exhibit R Part 2 of 3 Cater Depo pp 68-133, #42 Exhibit R Part 3 of 3 Cater Depo Exhibits, #43 Exhibit S Part 1 of 3 CHP Media Depo, #44 Exhibit S Part 2 of 3 CHP Media Depo Exhibits 2, #45 Exhibit S Part 3 of 3 CHP Media Depo Exhibits 3, #46 Exhibit T Part 1 of 2 JP Micro Depo, #47 Exhibit T Part 2 of 2 JP Micro Depo Exhibits, #48 Exhibit U Part 1 of 2 Markey Depo, #49 Exhibit U Part 2 of 2 Markey Depo Exhibits, #50 Exhibit V Part 1 of 2 Mudlin Depo, #51 Exhibit V Part 2 of 2 Mudlin Depo Exhibits, #52 Exhibit W Reclaim Center Depo, #53 Exhibit X Part 1 of 3 Solo Depo, #54 Exhibit X Part 2 of 3 Solo Depo Exhibits 1-3, #55 Exhibit X Part 3 of 3 Solo Depo Exhibits 4-5, #56 Exhibit Y Part 1 of 2 UFCW Local 8 Depo, #57 Exhibit Y Part 2 of 2 UFCW Local 8 Depo Exhibits, #58 Exhibit Z Part 1 of 2 Yohalem Depo, #59 Exhibit Z Part 2 of 2 Yohalem Depo Exhibits, #60 Exhibit AA Part 1 of 2 Culinary Workers Union Local 226 Depo, #61 Exhibit AA Part 2 of 2 Culinary Workers Union Local 226 Depo Exhibits, #62 Exhibit BB Part 1 of 2 Giauque, #63 Exhibit BB Part 2 of 2 Giauque Depo, #64 Exhibit CC Part 1 of 2 nXio Depo, #65 Exhibit CC Part 2 of 2 nXio LLC Depo Exhibits, #66 Exhibit DD Part 1 of 3 Penobscot Eye Care Depo, #67 Exhibit DD Part 2 of 3 Penobscot Eye Care Depo Exhibits 1-5, #68 Exhibit DD Part 3 of 3 Penobscot Eye Care Depo Exhibit 6, #69 Exhibit EE Part 1 of 2 Perez Depo, #70 Exhibit EE Part 2 of 2 Perez Depo Exhibits, #71 Exhibit FF Part 1 of 2 Gatti Depo, #72 Exhibit FF Part 2 of 2 Gatti Depo Exhibits, #73 Exhibit GG Part 1 of 2 Hogue Depo, #74 Exhibit GG Part 2 of 2 Hogue Depo Exhibits, #75 Exhibit HH Part 1 of 2 UFCW Local 99 Depo, #76 Exhibit HH Part 2 of 2 UFCW Local 99 Depo Exhibits, #77 Exhibit II Part 1 of 3 Harmon Depo, #78 Exhibit II Part 2 of 3 Harmon Depo Exhibits 1-3, #79 Exhibit II Part 3 of 3 Harmon Depo Exhibits 4-7, #80 Exhibit JJ Part 1 of 2 ODonnell Depo, #81 Exhibit JJ Part 2 of 2 ODonnell Depo Exhibits, #82 Exhibit KK IPPs Objections to NECs First RPD, #83 Exhibit LL Part 1 of 2 Kelley Depo, #84 Exhibit LL Part 2 of 2 Kelley Depo Exhibits, #85 Exhibit MM Part 1 of 2 H & S Art. Passing on the Monopoly Overcharge pp 269 315, #86 Exhibit MM Part 2 of 2 H & S Art. Passing on the Monopoly Overcharge pp 316 - 360, #87 Exhibit NN Transcript of Proceedings April 9 2009 before Judge Smith, #88 Exhibit OO Cheese Article Dwyer Depo Exhibit 7, #89 Exhibit PP Costco Bill Prescott Declaration, #90 Exhibit QQ Noll Report Redacted, #91 Exhibit RR Part 1 of 3 Noll Depo pp 1-73, #92 Exhibit RR Part 2 of 3 Noll Depo pp 74-156, #93 Exhibit RR Part 3 of 3 Noll Depo pp 157233, #94 Exhibit SS Sterenberg Objections and Responses to Micron First Rogs, #95 Exhibit TT Harmons Objections and Responses to Cypress Set One Rogs, #96 Exhibit UU Culver Objections and Responses to Renesas First Rogs, #97 Exhibit VV nXio Objections and Responses to Renesas First Rogs, #98 Exhibit WW Allen Obj and Supp Resp to Hitachi First Set of Rogs, #99 Exhibit XX CHP Media Objections and Responses to Renesas First Rogs, #100 Exhibit YY Part 1 of 2 Smith Depo, #101 Exhibit YY Part 2 of 2 Smith Depo Exhibits, #102 Exhibit ZZ 2009-04-07 Email SRAM Michigan Withdraw, #103 Exhibit AAA Email C. Micheletti to M. Elisofon, #104 Exhibit BBB IP SRAM 0908, #105 Exhibit CCC IP SRAM 0925-0928, #106 Exhibit DDD Culver Email, #107 Exhibit EEE Mudlin Objection and Responses, #108 Exhibit FFF Warner Depo pt 1 of 2, #109 Exhibit FFF Warner Depo pt 2 of 2)(Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 683 Declaration of Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. in Support of #681 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46 - Part 1, #47 Exhibit 46 - Part 2, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89 - Part 1, #91 Exhibit 89 - Part 2, #92 Exhibit 90, #93 Exhibit 91, #94 Exhibit 92, #95 Exhibit 93, #96 Exhibit 94, #97 Exhibit 95, #98 Exhibit 96, #99 Exhibit 97, #100 Exhibit 98, #101 Exhibit 99, #102 Exhibit 100, #103 Exhibit 101, #104 Exhibit 102, #105 Exhibit 103, #106 Exhibit 104, #107 Exhibit 105, #108 Exhibit 106, #109 Exhibit 107, #110 Exhibit 108, #111 Exhibit 109, #112 Exhibit 110, #113 Exhibit 111)(Related document(s) #681 ) (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 682 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc. DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, and ALL APPENDICES THERETO; (2) DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. BURTIS, PH.D; and ALL EXHIBITS THERETO; (3) DECLARATION OF PATRICK M. RYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, and ALL EXHIBITS THERETO (Chan, Eva) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 681 Memorandum in Opposition re #645 MOTION to Certify Class filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A -- Choice of Law, #2 Appendix B -- Varations in State Consumer Protection Laws, #3 Appendix C -- Variations in State Antitrust Laws, #4 Appendix D -- Variations in State Unjust Enrichment Laws, #5 Appendix E -- Typicality, #6 Appendix E -- Adequacy, #7 Appendix G Part 1 of 2 -- Unpublished Decisions, #8 Appendix G Part 2 of 2 -- Unpublished Decisions)(Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 680 Letter from Francis O. Scarpulla to The Honorable Claudia Wilken. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 20, 2009 Filing 679 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Notice re: Class Notice and Requests for Exclusion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 678 Proposed Order Adopting Special Master's Report And Recommendation For Alleged Discovery Violations By Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 677 Special Master's Report and Recommendation for Alleged Discovery Violations by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by Fern M Smith. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 4/17/2009) Modified on 4/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER re #669 granting Stipulation Regarding Revised Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 14, 2009 Filing 675 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Casandra Leann Thomson for Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. (Thomson, Casandra) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 674 Special Masters Order Order Re: Motion to Compel (Hynix, NEC and Renesas). (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 673 Special Masters Order Order Re: Motion to Compel (Samsung). (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 672 Special Masters Order Order Re Depositions. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 9, 2009 Filing 671 Letter from Patrick M. Ryan to The Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 April 8, 2009 Letter Brief to Hon. Fern M. Smith, #2 Order Appointing Judge Smith)(Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 670 Letter from Christopher T. Micheletti to The Honorable Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' 3/27/09 Letter Brief, #2 IP Plaintiffs' 4/6/09 Letter Brief)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 669 Stipulation & [Proposed] Order Regarding Revised Case Management Schedule by Westell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 4/6/2009) Modified on 4/7/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2009 Filing 668 Special Masters Order Stipulation and Order Re: Production of Documents by Etron Technology, Inc.. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 667 Special Masters Order SRAM Discovery Order Re: Toshiba #2. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 666 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel E. Alberti NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER re #658 granting STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE NEW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, EXTEND TIME TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS, AND CHANGE HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 26, 2009 Filing 663 Notice of Counsel representing Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America, Ltd., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric and Electronics USA Inc.; Renesas Technology Corp and Renesas Technology America, Inc (van Panhuys, Vincent) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #662 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Willam H. Barrett (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 661 NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek G. Howard (Howard, Derek) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 23, 2009 Filing 662 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Willam H. Barrett ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003205.) filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #1 receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2009 Filing 660 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of #658 Stipulation, and Proposed Order to Substitute New Class Representatives, Extend Time to File Class Certification Opposition and Reply Briefs, and Continue Hearing Date filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) #658 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 20, 2009 Filing 659 Declaration of Vincent C. van Panhuys in Support of #658 Stipulation, filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Hitachi America Ltd., Hitachi Ltd. (Related document(s) #658 ) (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified on 2/23/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2009 Filing 658 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE NEW CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, EXTEND TIME TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS, AND CHANGE HEARING DATE by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Toshiba Corporation, Etron Technology America Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc,Renesas Technology America Inc, Reneseas Technology Corporation, Hitachi America Ltd., Hitachi Ltd, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Semiconductor Inc . (Ryan, Patrick) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified on 2/23/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2009 Filing 657 (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L. R. 7-11 AND 79-5 by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 2/12/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2009 Filing 656 Special Masters Order Discovery Order Re: Dispute Over Production of Toshiba Corp. Documents. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 655 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' re #648 MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) -- by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Chan, Eva) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/9/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 Filing 654 DECLARATION OF EVA C. CHAN IN SUPPORT OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) -- filed byNEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc.. (Chan, Eva) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/9/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 Filing 653 Declaration of DANIEL E. ALBERTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 AND 79-5 filed byMitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 652 Letter Brief Letter Brief to Honorable Fern Smith from Neil Swartzberg, February 5, 2009 filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4)(Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 651 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Errata to Expert Report of Michael J. Harris, Ph.D. (Submitted Under Seal) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 650 ERRATA to Expert Report of Michael J. Harris, Ph.D. by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. of Expert Report of Michael J. Harris, Ph.D. (Document Submitted Under Seal) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 648 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Reclaim Center, Inc. Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Micheletti Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Filing 647 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Filing 646 Proposed Order re #645 MOTION to Certify Class by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 645 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix A to Memorandum, #3 Appendix B to Memorandum, #4 Dwyer Expert Report, #5 Exhibit 1 to Dwyer Expert Report, #6 Exhibit 2 to Dwyer Expert Report, #7 Harris Expert Report, #8 Exhibit 1 to Harris Expert Report, #9 Exhibit 2 to Harris Expert Report, #10 Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit 1 to RJN, #12 Exhibit 2 to RJN, #13 Exhibit 3 to RJN, #14 Exhibit 4 to RJN, #15 Exhibit 5 to RJN, #16 Exhibit 6 to RJN, #17 Exhibit 7 to RJN, #18 Exhibit 8 to RJN, #19 Exhibit 9 to RJN, #20 Exhibit 10 to RJN, #21 Exhibit 11 to RJN, #22 Exhibit 12 to RJN, #23 Exhibit 13 to RJN, #24 Exhibit 14 to RJN, #25 Exhibit 15 to RJN, #26 Exhibit 16 to RJN, #27 Exhibit 17 to RJN, #28 Exhibit 18 to RJN, #29 Exhibit 19 to RJN, #30 Exhibit 20 to RJN, #31 Exhibit 21 to RJN, #32 Exhibit 22 to RJN)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 644 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Notice of Order (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 643 Special Masters Order Order Re: Production by Integrated Silicon Solution, Inc.. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 642 Special Masters Order Amendment to Discovery Order of January 5, 2009. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 19, 2009 Filing 641 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/08, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Starr A. Wilson, Telephone number (415) 239-8398. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2009. (Wilson, Starr) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 640 NOTICE by Chip-Tech, Ltd. Notice Of Withdrawal Of Interested Party Chip-Tech, Ltd. (Barton, Joseph) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 639 Declaration of Joseph Neumayer Regarding the Cost and Burden For Production of PSRAM Documents re #624 Special Masters Order by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Ashmore Regarding The Cost and Burden For Production of PSRAM Documents)(Cecchini, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009) Modified on 1/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 638 Memorandum in Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within Scope of Plaintiffs' Claims, or, Alternatively, To Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusion of Such Claims filed byIntegrated Silicon Solution Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Samsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Etron Technology, Inc., Etron Technology America, Inc., Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Cypress Semiconductor, Inc., Hitachi America Ltd, Micron Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Hess in Support of Defendants' Opposition, #2 Exhibits 4 through 11 of Declaration of Joshua D. Hess in Opposition)(Cecchini, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/14/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***Re-filed pursuant to order #576 ***
January 12, 2009 Filing 637 Reply Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Unredacted) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9-19, #6 Exhibit 20-31, #7 Exhibit 32-33, #8 Exhibit 34-35, #9 Exhibit 36-45, #10 Exhibit 46-47, #11 Exhibit 48-51)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). refiled pursuant to order #578
January 12, 2009 Filing 636 Declaration of Jesse R. Merritt in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Unredacted) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). refiled pursuant to order #578
January 12, 2009 Filing 635 Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Unredacted) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). refiled pursuant to order #578
January 12, 2009 Filing 634 Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification (Unredacted) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). refiled pursuant to order #578
January 12, 2009 Filing 633 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, and Motion: (1) To Substitute Real Party in Interest; and (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, or, Alternatively, to Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusion of Such Claims, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Unredacted) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D part 1, #5 Exhibit D Part 2, #6 Exhibit D part 3, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). refiled pursuant to order #578
January 12, 2009 Filing 632 MOTION to (1) Substitute Real Party in Interest; and, (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, or, Alternatively, to Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusion of Such Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Unredacted) filed by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). refiled pursuant to order #578
January 9, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2009 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN granting #627 Joint Administrative Motion to Extend Page Limit for and Time to File Class Certification Briefs Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-2(b) and 7-11 (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER re #621 granting STIPULATION RE: CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/7/09. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Filing 629 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Page Limit of and Time to File Class Certification Briefs by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Woodside, Pamela) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Filing 628 Declaration of Pamela E. Woodside in Support of Joint Administrative Motion to Extend the Page Limit of and the Time to File Class Certification Briefs filed byReclaim Center, Inc.. (Woodside, Pamela) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Filing 627 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Administrative Motion to Extend Page Limit for and Time to File Class Certification Briefs Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-2(b) and 7-11 filed by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Woodside, Pamela) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 626 STIPULATION RE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC. by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Woodside, Pamela) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 625 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. Notice of Firm Name Change (Woodside, Pamela) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 624 Special Masters Order Order Re: Discovery Motion. (Smith, Fern) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 31, 2008 Filing 623 Letter from Steven N. Williams to Molly C. Dwyer, Clerk of the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 31, 2008 Filing 622 NOTICE by Henry Kornegay Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Woodside, Pamela) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 30, 2008 Filing 621 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CLASS NOTICE by Westell, Inc., Toshiba America Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Westell Inc, Etron Technology America Inc, Etron Technology Inc, Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Ltd, Hynix Semiconductor Inc, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc, Integrated Silicon Solution Inc, Micro Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC Electronics Corporation, Renesas Technology America Inc, Renesas Technology Corporation, Samsun Electronics America, Samsun Electronics Company Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Semiconductor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/30/2008) Modified on 12/31/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2008 Filing 620 Letter from Daniel M. Wall to Molly C. Dwyer, Clerk of the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Circuit Decision)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER DEFINING CUSTOM SRAM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/17/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER APPROVING CLASS REPRESENTATIVES NOTICE OF CLASS ACTION FOR MAILING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/19/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER re #614 granting Stipulation re: Voluntary Dismissal of Toshiba America, Inc. [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 23(e) & 41(a)(2)]. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/19/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 615 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Jamie Maites by Jamie Maites. (Dove, Thomas) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 619 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2008 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/18/2008). (Court Reporter Starr Wilson.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 614 Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re: Voluntary Dismissal of Toshiba America, Inc. [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 23(e) & 41(a)(2)] by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #598 Motion to Seal Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 610 Joinder of Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs In Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Reclaim Center, Inc.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 609 Letter Brief re Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Reply ISO Supplemental Mtn to Compel (Defendant-Specific Issues) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2008 Filing 608 Letter Brief re Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production by Defendants to Direct Plaintiff's 1st RFPs, and to Indirect and Direct Plaintiffs' 1st Joint RFPs (Common Disputed Issues) filed byWestell, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2008 Filing 607 NOTICE of Change of Address by Guido Saveri (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 606 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua David Hess for Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 4, 2008 Filing 613 EXHIBITS E,F and G re #596 DECLARATION OF DANIEL E. ALBERTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' BRIEF ON THE DEFINITION OF CUSTOM SRAM filed byMitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Related document(s) #596 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
December 4, 2008 Filing 612 Brief on definition of custom SRAM filed byMitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
December 4, 2008 Filing 605 [Proposed] Order re: Custom SRAM by Westell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 604 Direct Purchaser Class' Brief re: Custom SRAM filed byWestell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 603 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 4, 2008 Filing 602 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 4, 2008 Filing 601 Memorandum in Opposition To Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Motion To Compel filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Chng, Rena) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 4, 2008 Filing 600 Proposed Order re #598 MOTION to Seal by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 599 Declaration in Support of #598 MOTION to Seal filed byMitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Related document(s) #598 ) (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 598 MOTION to Seal Portions of re #596 Declaration, #595 Brief filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 597 Proposed Order re [ #595 DEFINITION OF CUSTOM SRAM by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 596 DECLARATION OF DANIEL E. ALBERTI IN SUPPORT OF #595 DEFENDANTS' BRIEF ON THE DEFINITION OF CUSTOM SRAM - REDACTED filed byMitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #595 ) (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Filing 595 BRIEF ON DEFINITION OF CUSTOM SRAM filed byMitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc., Renesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2008 Filing 594 NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura Ann Guillen Notice of Change of Firm and Address of Attorneys for NEC Electronics America, Inc. and NEC Electronics Corporation (Guillen, Laura) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 593 Direct Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Comments to Notice of Class Action for Mailing and Other Matters Related to a Class Notice Program; Request for Hearing filed byWestell, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/26/2008) Modified on 12/1/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 Filing 592 AMENDED EXPERT REPORT OF GREGORY K. LEONARD, PH.D. REDACTED PURSUANT TO JUDGE WILKEN'S 11.04.08 ORDER filed byRenesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2a-2b, #4 Exhibit 3a-3b, #5 Exhibit 4a-4i, #6 Exhibit 5a-5i, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8a-8d, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11a-11b, #13 Exhibit 12a-12b)(Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/21/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 Filing 591 DECLARATION OF DANIEL E. ALBERTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION - FILED PURSUANT TO JUDGE WILKEN'S 11.04.08 ORDER filed byRenesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/21/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 Filing 590 CORRECTED OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION - REDACTED PURSUANT TO JUDGE WILKEN'S 11.04.08 ORDER filed byRenesas Technology Corporation, Renesas Technology America, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi America Ltd. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/21/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2008 Filing 589 NOTICE by Westell Technologies, Inc. re Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Letter Brief re Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/18/2008) Modified on 11/19/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2008 Filing 588 NOTICE of Change of Address by Josef D. Cooper (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 587 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Lebsock Michael P. Lehmann, and Jon T. King (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 586 NOTICE by Trong H. Nguyen of Michael P. Lehmann, Christopher L. Lebsock, and Jon T. King's Withdrawal as Counsel for Trong Nguyen and Certain Other Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 585 Comments to re #572 Notice Of Class Representative's [Proposed] Notice Of Class Action For Mailing And Other Matters Related To A Class Notice Program by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proof of Service)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 11/13/2008) Modified on 11/14/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #493 Motion to Seal; denying #514 Motion to Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #433 Motion to Seal Direct Purchasers' Mtn for Class Certification; Declaration of Joseph W. Cotchett iso Mtn. for Class Certification; Expert Report of Roger G. Noll (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #532 Motion to Seal Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part #477 Motion to Seal Document (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER re #572 GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR HEARING. Hearing set for 12/18/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/31/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER re #571 granting as modified STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' List of Class Members. Hearing set for 12/18/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/31/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 572 NOTICE by Westell, Inc. Notice of Class Representative's [Proposed] Notice of Class Action for Mailing and Other Matters Related to a Class Notice Program; Request for Hearing (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 571 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants' List of Class Members by Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Alexander Ma, et al (Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2008) Modified on 10/29/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2008 Filing 570 Letter from Steven N. Williams Letter from Steven N. Williams. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 569 Letter from Neil Swartzberg. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 568 NOTICE by Mitchell Salzman, Stacy Salzman of Change of Firm Affiliation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Goldstein, Jayne) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 567 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2009 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/7/2010 08:30 AM. Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 3/26/2009 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2010 02:00 PM. FurtherCase Management Conference set for 5/13/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/29/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #437 Motion to Certify Class (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #497 Motion To Substitute Real Party in Interest; and, (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, or, Alternatively, to Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusion of Such Claims (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 563 Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; jury demand byHynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.. (Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 9/22/2008) Modified on 9/23/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 562 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark John Tamblyn and Notice of Change of Firm Name (Tamblyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 564 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2008 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/18/2008), Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2008 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/18/2008) re #497 MOTION (1) To Substitute Real Party in Interest; and, (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, or, Alternatively, to Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusions of Such Claims MOTION (1) To Substitute Real Party in Interest; and, (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, or, Alternatively, to Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusions of Such Claims MOTION (1) To Substitute Real Party in Interest; and, (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, or, Alternatively, to Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusions of Such Claims filed by Westell Technologies, Inc., #437 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Westell Technologies, Inc.. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #558 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Hillary A. Webber. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #559 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Pamela J. Marple. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 16, 2008 Filing 559 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Pamela J. Marple ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611002623.) filed by Renesas Technology Corporation, Hitachi America Ltd. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #1 receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2008 Filing 558 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Hillary A. Webber ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611002623.) filed by Renesas Technology Corporation, Hitachi Ltd.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2018: #1 receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 557 Etron Technology America, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint) byEtron Technology America, Inc.. (Leddicotte, Matthew) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 556 Defendants Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs bySamsung Electronics Company Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 555 Defendant Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff's Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint byCypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 554 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba America, Inc. re #549 Answer to Amended Complaint, #551 Answer to Complaint, #552 Answer to Complaint, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 553 NOTICE by NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America Inc. of Law Firm Name Change (Swartz, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 552 TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.'S ANSWER (TO THE THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS; JURY DEMAND byToshiba America Electronic Components. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/16/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 551 TOSHIBA AMERICA INC.'S ANSWER TO THE THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS; Jury Demand byToshiba America, Inc.. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/16/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 550 Defendants' Answer to Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint for Violations of Federal and State Antitrust Laws, State Consumer Protection Laws and State Common Law of Unjust Enrichment byMicron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Inc.. (Cecchini, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/16/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 549 TOSHIBA CORPORATION'S ANSWER to the THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OF INDIRECT PURCHASERS; Jury Demand byToshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Toshiba America, Inc.. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/16/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 548 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Consolidated byMitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 547 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Consolidated byMitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA Inc.. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 546 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Consolidated byRenesas Technology Corporation. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 545 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Consolidated byRenesas Technology America, Inc.. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 544 ANSWER to Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Indirect Purchaser Class) byNEC Electronics America Inc.. (Swartz, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/16/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 543 ANSWER to Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Indirect Purchaser Class) byNEC Electronics Corporation. (Swartz, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/16/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 Filing 542 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Westell Technologies, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 541 Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion: (1) To Substitute Real Party in Interest; and, (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, or, Alternatively, to Amend Complaint to Clarify the Inclusion of Such Claims filed byWestell Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Guido Saveri In Support of Direct Purchaser's Reply in Support of Motion: (1) To Substitute Real Party in Interest; and (2) For Order Finding PSRAM Claims Within the Scope of Plaintiff's Claims, #2 Certificate of Service)(Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified on 9/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2008 Filing 540 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION AND MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC & ELECTRONICS USA, INC. (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified on 9/5/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER re #533 regarding Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/28/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER re #529 granting Stipulation Order Establishing Preservation Protocol. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/28/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 537 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Stanton Hales (Hales, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 27, 2008 Filing 536 NOTICE by Reclaim Center, Inc. of Plaintiff Thomas Hark's Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice (Woodside, Pamela) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 535 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Westell Technologies, Inc. re #533 Letter, #534 Proposed Order (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 534 Proposed Order Re: Case Management Conference by Westell Technologies, Inc.. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 533 Letter from Neil Swartzberg regarding Case Management Conference. (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 8/25/2008)