Sorensen v. Ampro Tools Corporation
Plaintiff: Jens Erik Sorensen
Defendant: Ampro Tools Corporation
Case Number: 4:2008cv00096
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/31/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CONDITIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 7/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re 82 granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/24/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 71 70 VACATING CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 GRANTING STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Case referred to mediation.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 2/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 48 Motion to Strike ; granting 33 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Following December 8, 2008, Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 12/9/08. (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING re 33 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Ampro Tools Corporation Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/7/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOLLOWING OCTOBER 29, 2008 HEARING RE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENTSigned by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 10/31/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorensen v. Ampro Tools Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jens Erik Sorensen
Represented By: Melody Ann Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ampro Tools Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?