Bonilla v. Ayers
Petitioner: Steven W. Bonilla
Respondent: Robert Ayers, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2008cv00471
Filed: January 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PETITIONER'S 29 MOTION FOR RECUSAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER REFERRING PETITIONER'S PRO SE "CHALLENGE FOR CAUSE- INCOMPETENCY". Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/19/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PETITIONER'S 164 MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 185 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING RESPONDENTS 181 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DISCOVERY MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 172 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 170 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 161 Motion for Extension of Time to File (Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to Lodge the State Court Record). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 159 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DISMISSING ACTION; TERMINATING ALL PENDING MOTIONS in case no. C 14-2395 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/23/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DISMISSING ACTIONS; TERMINATING ALL PENDING MOTIONS (Re Case No. C 14-1990 CW and C 14-2091 CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TERMINATING PENDING MOTIONS re Case No. C 13-951 CW through C 13-955 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DENYING PETITIONERS REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/29/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 127 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER of dismissal of actions C-12-360, C-12-388, C12-976 and that this order be also filed in this action C-08-471-CW.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/11/2012. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER of dismissal re action numbers C-11-6306-CW, C-11-6307-CW, C-12-0026-CW, C-12-0027-CW, C-12-0206-CW, and that a copy of this order be also filed in this action. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/24/2012. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/22/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that this order be also filed in this action. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/25/2011. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that a copy of ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed in various civil rights actions be filed in this action Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011) Modified on 6/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/16/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 31 Motion for Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/29/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 Notice (Other) filed by Steven W. Bonilla. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/22/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re 6 Denying Request for Vaughn Indexing. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/30/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven W. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Ayers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?