Chin v. Wachovia Financial Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Chin
Defendant: Wachovia Financial Services Inc., Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, Wachovia Services Inc., World Mortgage Company, Wachovia Commercial Mortgage Inc, World Savings Inc, Wachovia Equity Servicing LLC, Wachovia Bank N.A. and Wachovia Corporation
Case Number: 4:2008cv00684
Filed: January 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/16/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Determining Good Faith and Granting 51 Final Approval of Settlement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING NOVEMBER 18, 2010 HEARING DATE TO DECEMEBR 9, 2010 re 52 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Class Representative Enhancement Award, 51 Joint MOTION for Settlement : Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/28/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 Granting Stipulation RESCHEDULING HEARING ON JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Granting Stipulation VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re (24 in 4:08-cv-00684-CW) DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/31/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chin v. Wachovia Financial Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Chin
Represented By: Mark Yablonovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Financial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Commercial Mortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Equity Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?