Singh v. LSG Sky Chefs Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sukh Deo Singh
Defendant: Walter Gehl, Mary Donnelly and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2008cv01353
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 Stipulation filed by Life Insurance Company of North America, Sukh Deo Singh. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/1/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 57 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; finding as moot 68 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to 08/21/09 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson, on 7/7/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009) Modified on 7/8/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 IT IS SO ORDERED THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN CONTINUED TOJuly 15, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/4/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/27/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/3/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. LSG Sky Chefs Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukh Deo Singh
Represented By: Charles Joshua Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Gehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Charan M. Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?