American Piledriving Equipment, Inc. v. Bay Machinery Corporation
Plaintiff: American Piledriving Equipment, Inc.
Defendant: Bay Machinery Corporation
Case Number: 4:2008cv01934
Filed: April 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 118 Case Management Conference - Further. Non-Expert Discovery due by 8/19/2011. Amended Expert Reports due by 9/20/2011. Rebuttal due by 10/20/2011. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/28/2011. Final Pre trial Conference set for 4/5/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 4/30/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 115 Stipulation filed by Bay Machinery Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR RAMANDED CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/9/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DEVISING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULE FOR PATENT CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/5/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge and Scheduling Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/25/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 64 Stipulation filed by Bay Machinery Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/15/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Construing Claims. Signed by Judge Hamilton on June 12, 2009. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED REQUEST TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE re 44 Stipulation filed by Bay Machinery Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/8/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE re 42 Stipulation filed by Bay Machinery Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/1/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 38 Stipulation filed by Bay Machinery Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/12/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE re 34 Stipulation filed by American Piledriving Equipment, Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Piledriving Equipment, Inc. v. Bay Machinery Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Piledriving Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Craig J Madson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Machinery Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?