Boddie v. Curry
Petitioner: Roderick Boddie
Respondent: Ben Curry
Case Number: 4:2008cv01956
Filed: April 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT, entered in favor of Respondent. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/17/09. ***Civil Case Terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 12/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING Petitioner an Extension of Time to File Opposition re 9 Motion to Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition. Petitioner's Opposition due (30) thirty-days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/7/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 7 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Respondent's Answer due by 3/11/2009. Petitioner's traverse is due (60) sixty-days after his receipt of answer. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/29/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boddie v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roderick Boddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?