Williams, et al v. City of Antioch, et al
Plaintiff: Santeya Danyell Williams, Mary Ruth Scott, Alyce Denise Payne, Karen Latreece Coleman and Priscilla Bunton
Defendant: City of Antioch, Antioch Police Department, James Hyde, Mitch Schwitters, Steve Bias, Desmond Bittner and William Dillard, II
Case Number: 4:2008cv02301
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 232 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment In Support of Final Approval of Settlement filed by Priscilla Bunton, Mary Ruth Scott, Karen Latreece Coleman, Alyce Denise Payne, City of Antioch, Santeya Danyell Williams. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/3/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/5/2011. Jury Trial set for 5/7/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Motions due by 2/14/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DENYING 214 Stipulation, filed by Priscilla Bunton, Mary Ruth Scott, Karen Latreece Coleman, Alyce Denise Payne, City of Antioch, Santeya Danyell Williams. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/1/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 124 Motion to Bifurcate (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Allowing Plaintiffs' reply brief to be 25 pages long. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/17/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) Modified on 12/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 127 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition Brief re Motion for Class Certification (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/13/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER: to modify expert disclosure dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, on 8/13/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009) Modified on 8/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENTS re 81 Letter filed by Priscilla Bunton, Mary Ruth Scott, Karen Latreece Coleman, Alyce Denise Payne, Santeya Danyell Williams. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/7/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 65 Motion to Compel (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009) Modified on 8/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER [AS MODIFIED] To Shorten Time re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due 07/15/09; Defendant's Opposition due 07/22/09; Plaintiff's Reply due 07/28/09 at 12:00 PM; Proposed Hearing date 08/04/09; Discovery cut-off 08/21/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, on 7/17/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified on 7/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to 08/18/09 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge James Larson on 5/27/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009) Modified on 5/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Modifying Motion Hearing date to 1/12/2010 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/20/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009) Modified on 5/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING Discovery Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, on 3/10/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009) Modified on 3/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, on 2/26/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Document Retention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/6/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009) Modified on 1/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/10/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 24, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. re 31 Stipulation, filed by Priscilla Bunton, Mary Ruth Scott, Karen Latreece Coleman, Alyce Denise Payne, Santeya Danyell Williams. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/14/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/21/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, et al v. City of Antioch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santeya Danyell Williams
Represented By: Charles D Forster, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ruth Scott
Represented By: Charles D Forster, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyce Denise Payne
Represented By: Charles D Forster, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Latreece Coleman
Represented By: Charles D Forster, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Bunton
Represented By: Charles D Forster, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Antioch
Represented By: Thomas G. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Schwitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desmond Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dillard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?