Martone et al v. Burgess et al
Plaintiff: Massimiliano Martone and Martone Radio Technology Inc
Defendant: David Burgess, Kestrel Signal Processing Inc. and Range Networks Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv02379
Filed: May 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1391 Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re 49 granting STIPULATION Dismissing Action with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(A)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 47 granting Sixth Stipulation Extending Deadline to Add New Parties. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 granting Fifth Stipulation Extending Deadline to Add New Parties. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/5/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 43 granting STIPULATION Extending Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 granting STIPULATION Continuing Deadline. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 granting STIPULATION Extending Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/24/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 granting Stipulation Granting Brief Extensions on the Deadlines Relating to Mediation and Addition of New Parties. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/3/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 20 Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting The Lodging Under Seal of the Declaration of Massimiliano Martone re: Analysis of Software Code; denying 21 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Denying in Part Without Prejudice Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Order to Show Cause (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martone et al v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massimiliano Martone
Represented By: Edward Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martone Radio Technology Inc
Represented By: Edward Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kestrel Signal Processing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Range Networks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?