Thomas v. TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Thomas
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv02397
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1391 Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES TO CLASS COUNSEL AND A SERVICE FEE TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, JASON THOMAS. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/28/2009. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 58 Stipulation Setting Final Settlement Approval Hearing, filed by Gregory O'Donnell, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Jason Thomas. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 6/15/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) Modified on 6/16/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 50 Motion Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; granting 29 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, etc. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATIION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Brazil on 2/18/09. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009) Modified on 2/20/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 12/12/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET NEW MEDIATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATES. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/30/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Thomas
Represented By: Carrie S. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?