Evins v. Curry
Plaintiff: William L. Evins
Defendant: Ben Curry
Case Number: 4:2008cv02537
Filed: May 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 20 Motion to Compel; granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING SUPERVISORY LIABILITY CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT CURRY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/28/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/4/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evins v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Evins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?