Pecover et al v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Pecover, Andrew Owens, Samuel Michael Keller and Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Miscellaneous: National Football League
Case Number: 4:2008cv02820
Filed: June 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 478 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 474 Stipulation Regarding Late Claims. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 466 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 485 MOTION REQUESTING NUNC PRO TUNC APPROVAL OF SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' proposed modified distribution of the settlement fund. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on April 2, 2013. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR RESPONSE BRIEF OF OBJECTOR THEODORE H. FRANK. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/25/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' 424 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013) Modified on 2/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART, AND DEFERRING IN PART, PLAINTIFFS 424 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 373 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference to 9/27/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Granting 371 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Schedule and Proposed Order for Case Schedule Modification. Reset Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2012 02:00 PM. Motions due by 7/31/2012. Response/Cross Motions due by 8/14/2012. Replies due by 8/21/2012. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/10/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS 368 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Responses due by 5/9/2012. Replies due by 5/13/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER CONCERNING DUTIES AND INSTRUCTIONS FOR COURT-APPOINTED TECHNICAL ADVISOR AND MODIFYING THE CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/23/2012. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: Dkt. No. 1 in 12-mc-80064. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 3/20/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Order of referral to consider whether 12-mc-80064-CRB is related to C-08-2820-CW. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/8/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 329 BRIEIFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/1/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 317 Stipulation Supplementing Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Non-Party CLC Documents and Materials. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/21/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 304 Stipulation (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 299 Stipulation Supplementing Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Non-Party ESPNs Deposition Testimony. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/6/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Granting 284 Stipulation Supplementing Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Non-Party NFL Players Documents and Materials. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 259 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER RE LODGING OF DOCUMENT FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFFS 259 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY AND TO INCREASE NUMBER OF DEPOSITIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/31/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS 192 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Granting 207 Stipulation Approving Class Notice Plan. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/22/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pecover et al v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Pecover
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Owens
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Michael Keller
Represented By: Leonard W Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: Kirsten Marie Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: National Football League
Represented By: Richard Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?