Second Walnut Creek Mutual v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Second Walnut Creek Mutual
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv02874
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 21 granting STIPULATION Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/31/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 GRANTING STIPULATION To Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Case Management Conference and Related Dates. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2008 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/2/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Second Walnut Creek Mutual v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Walnut Creek Mutual
Represented By: Amy K. Tinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Frederick Remmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?