Rogers v. Potter
Plaintiff: Fred Rogers
Defendant: John E. Potter
Case Number: 4:2008cv02897
Filed: March 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/20/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED ORDER re 44 Order, Terminated Case,,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/20/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/20/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: That the Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 6/7/2010 at 08:30 AM. The Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 6/1/2010 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010) Modified on 3/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MEDIATION. Parties may complete mediation no later than 07/07/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009) Modified on 7/2/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 3/31/2010 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/13/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/6/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Rogers
Represented By: Michael C. Cohen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Represented By: Abraham A. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?