Shoemaker v. R & L Brosamer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charlene Shoemaker
Defendant: R & L Brosamer, Inc., Guy Culp, John Polegard, Shawn Othein and Jose Escobedo
Case Number: 4:2008cv03098
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil terminating 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting 17 Motion to Remand (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT THE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 11/13/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 11/12/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 10/1/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoemaker v. R & L Brosamer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Shoemaker
Represented By: Sofian Dawood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & L Brosamer, Inc.
Represented By: Carla J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Culp
Represented By: Carla J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Polegard
Represented By: Carla J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Othein
Represented By: Carla J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Escobedo
Represented By: Carla J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?