California Restaurant Association v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Case Number: 4:2008cv03247
Filed: July 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re (57 in 4:08-cv-03685-CW) (69 in 4:08-cv-03247-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION re Dismissal. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/7/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re (67 in 4:08-cv-03247-CW), (55 in 4:08-cv-03685-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Staying ADR Deadlines under Civil Local Rule 16-8 and ADR Local Rule 3-5. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/17/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re (53 in 4:08-cv-03685-CW) (64 in 4:08-cv-03247-CW) granting STIPULATION Vacating Hearing On Plaintiff's Motions For Declaratory Relief and Preliminary Injunction; Scheduling Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/23/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re (50 in 4:08-cv-03685-CW) (61 in 4:08-cv-03247-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Vacating and Rescheduling Hearing On Plaintiff's Motions For Declaratory Relief and Preliminary Injunction and Extending Stay of Enforcement of Ordinances. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/14/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/9/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re (47 in 4:08-cv-03685-CW) granting STIPULATION Regarding Case Scheduling Order, (58 in 4:08-cv-03247-CW) granting STIPULATION Regarding Case Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re (56 in 4:08-cv-03247-CW) granting STIPULATION VACATING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND EXTENDING STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF ORDINANCES, (45 in 4:08-cv-03685-CW) granting STIPULATION VACATING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND EXTENDING STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF ORDINANCES Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Restaurant Association v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?