Taylor v. AT&T Corp et al
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Taylor
Defendant: AT&T Corp and Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv03271
Filed: July 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 GRANTING STIPULATION for Dismissal. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/10/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER re 16 GRANTING STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Case referred to mediation. Deadline for ADR session is 12/23/08.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/25/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 9 GRANTING STIPULATION Dismissing AT&T Corp. and Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. as Defendants, and Joining AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 as a Defendant. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. AT&T Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Taylor
Represented By: Paul Randall Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?