Google Inc. v. Netlist, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv04144
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 Filing 193 JOINT STATUS REPORT RE Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 192 NOTICE of Change In Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance of Donald F. Frederick Zimmer, Jr. and Cheryl A. Sabnis as Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That Defendant Netlist, Inc., Substitute Sean C. Cunningham, John M. Guaragna, John D. Kinton and Jesse Hindman of DLA Piper LLP as attorneys of record in place of Adrian M. Pruetz and Erica J. Pruetz of Pruetz Law Group LLP and Enoch H. Liang and Steven R. Hansen of Lee Tran & Liang APLC. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/26/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 189 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and Proposed Order, filed by Sean C. Cunningham (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 10/20/2010) Modified on 10/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 182 Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING action. Parties to submit status reports every (6) six-months. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/13/10. ***Civil Case Terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 187 Reply Memorandum re 182 Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386 filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 Filing 186 Statement of Non-Opposition to 182 Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 181 Motion to Shorten Time (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 1, 2010 Filing 184 Memorandum in Opposition re 181 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byNetlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Taylor)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 183 Joint MOTION And Proposed Order Re: Equipment for Summary Judgment Hearing filed by Netlist, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 182 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386 filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 (1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 2 (2 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 181 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the 08/03/10 Mandatory Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James shall not take place. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 EXHIBITS re 152 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibits A, B, F, G, K, L and M to Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 153 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 152 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 EXHIBITS re 150 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit A to Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner In Support Of Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 151 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 150 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 CLERKS NOTICE: Continuing Motion Hearing to 9/14/2010 at 01:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re 80 Cancellation of 08/03/10 Mandatory Settlement Conference filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Joint MOTION re: Equipment for Summary Judgment hearing and Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/20/2010) Modified on 7/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 171 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits D-G, I-P, R-T, and V to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit N, # 10 Exhibit O, # 11 Exhibit P, # 12 Exhibit R, # 13 Exhibit S, # 14 Exhibit T, # 15 Exhibit V)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of 172 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement filed byNetlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) 172 ) (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 171 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 138 Motion to File Under Seal Motion of Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement and Exhibits D-G, I-P, R-T and V to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010) Modified on 7/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Netlist's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities Under Seal filed by Netlist, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Joint Stip. and Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 164 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1 and 5 of the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen In Support of Netlist, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of 165 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed byNetlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 165 ) (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 164 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Netlist's Reply Brief and Exhibits 1 and 5 to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/08/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 164 *** STIPULATION AND ORDER, Document sealed. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010) Modified on 7/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 7/6/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010) Modified on 7/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Memorandum in Opposition re Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Netlist's Opposition to Google, Inc.'s MSJ of Invalidity, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, # 3 Exhibits B - H to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 OBJECTIONS to 157 Document E-Filed Under Seal: Opposition to Netlist's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Support of Google's Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Netlist's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Related Exhibits filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 EXHIBITS B, C, E, L, Q, BB, C in Support re 157 Document E-Filed Under Seal to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit BB, # 6 Exhibit CC)(Related document(s) 157 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified on 7/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 156 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO NETLIST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SCOTT T. WEINGAERTNER AND EXHIBITS A, D, F-K, M-P, R-AA, DD-FF by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit M, # 11 Exhibit N, # 12 Exhibit O, # 13 Exhibit P, # 14 Exhibit R, # 15 Exhibit S, # 16 Exhibit T, # 17 Exhibit U, # 18 Exhibit V, # 19 Exhibit W, # 20 Exhibit X, # 21 Exhibit Y, # 22 Exhibit Z, # 23 Exhibit AA, # 24 Exhibit DD, # 25 Exhibit EE, # 26 Exhibit FF)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 154 Motion to Seal Exhibits A, D, F-K, M-P, R-AA, and DD-FF to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 156 *** STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 154 Motion to Seal Exhibits A, D, F-K, M-P, R-AA, and DD-FF to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to 154 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities and Related Exhibits filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 EXHIBITS A, B, F, G, K, L, M re 152 Document E-Filed Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 152 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010) (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4) Modified on 6/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 149 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Google's Opposition and Counter Motion and Exhibits C, D, E, H, I, J, and N to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit J, # 8 Exhibit N)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 EXHIBIT A re 150 Document E-Filed Under Seal to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 150 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010) (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4) Modified on 6/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 148 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Google's Invalidity Motion and Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition and Counter-Motion and Exhibits C, D, E, H, I, J and N to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 144 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Invalidity Motion and Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 149 *** STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Google's Opposition and Counter-Motion and Exhibits C, D, E, H, I, J and N to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 148 *** STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Google's Invalidity Motion and Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Counter Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Counter Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Related Exhibits filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE by Netlist, Inc. re 138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion of Summary Judgment of Infringement and Related Exhibits Pursuant to N.D. Cal. Civ. R. 7-13 (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 [REDACTED VERSION] Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of 141 Document E-Filed Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Netlist's Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities)(Related document(s) 141 ) (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ***DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT DOCUMENT 140 *** MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven Hansen (Part 1), # 2 Declaration of Steven Hansen (Part 2), # 3 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits B, C, D, E and G to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities and Related Exhibits to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/1/2010) Modified on 6/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Motion of Summary Judgment of Infringement and Related Exhibits, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/1/2010) Modified on 6/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 119 Motion to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Opposition and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Allison Altersohn. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING Motion for Leave to Amend Infrigement Contentions in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Judge Laporte on 4/30/2010. Case did not settle. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Reply Memorandum re 113 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven R. Hansen ISO Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Steven R. Hansen)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 4/20/2010) Modified on 4/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 115 *** ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 114 Motion to Seal Portions of Exhibit J to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Netlist's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to 120 Motion to Seal. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 12 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 10 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 9 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 8 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 4 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 3 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 2 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 1 re 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Manual Filing re [Confidential] Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Patent L.R. 3-1 and 3-6) by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Declaration of Leo Spooner III in Support of 120 Motion to Seal [Corrected] filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 120 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Seal Portions re 117 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions [Corrected] filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order ***Deadlines terminated. 119 Motion to Seal (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Opposition and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Allison Altersohn , filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support of 117 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 117 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 [REDACTED] Memorandum in Opposition re 113 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byGoogle Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 116 *** EXHIBIT J to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support re 113 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Netlist, Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 131 *** (Related document(s) 113 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010) Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 EXHIBIT J to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support re 113 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byNetlist, Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 115 *** (Related document(s) 113 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Seal Document 113 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Netlist's Administrative Motion to File Portions of Exhibit J to the Decl. of Steven Hansen ISO Netlist's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Under Seal filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing, # 2 Declaration of Edward Quon, # 3 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 4 Redacted Copy of "Exhibit J" to Declaration of Steven Hansen ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 5 Proof of Service of Documents (personally served))(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Netlist, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven Hansen in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Personal Service of Documents)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 111 Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA; GRANTING 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:09-cv-05718-SBA. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Laura Huffman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 4461004963.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 4/30/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/11/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Early Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/4/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed, as amended, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/05/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order ***Deadlines terminated. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Select Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Early Settlement Conference, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE OF STIPULATION to Select Magistrate Judge Trumbull for Early Settlement Conference and Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SECOND AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Expert Designations Pursuant to Order for Pretrial Preparation re 81 , filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Settlement Conference, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/16/2010) Modified on 2/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2010 03:15 PM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 85 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 03/04/10 at 3:15 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott T. Weingaertner (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Susan Kim (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Allison Altersohn (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 90 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark H. Francis (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 91 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Miller (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Allison Altersohn ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan Kim ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott T. Weingaertner ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Miller ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mark H. Francis ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Robert F. Perry, filed by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That Attorney Timothy Tully Scott, Leo Spooner for Google Inc., Timothy Tully Scott, Geoffrey M. Ezgar, Leo Spooner for Google Inc. added and Attorney Shelley Kay Mack; David James Miclean; Howard Glenn Pollack; Jason W. Wolff; Juanita R. Brooks and Robert John Kent, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 01/21/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Substitute Attorney and Proposed Order Approving Substitution, filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re 85 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 1/6/2010) Modified on 1/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 1/6/2010) Modified on 1/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 83 Motion to Relate Case: C-09-5718-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Relate Case and Consolidate: C-09-5718-CRB, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 12/17/2009) Modified on 12/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Howard Glenn Pollack Notice of Withdrawal of Seth M. Sproul (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 8/3/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/16/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/12/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009), Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009), Further Case Management Conference held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009), Scheduling Conference held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009). 7 Day Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Fact Discovery cutoff 3/30/2010; Expert Discovery Cutoff 5/17/2010. Plaintiff name experts by 4/15/2010; Defendant name experts by 4/30/2010. Dispositive Motion hearing cutoff date is 7/27/2010 at 1:00pm. Pretria Papers due 9/21/2010. Motions in Limine filed 9/28/2010; responses to Motions in Limine by 10/5/2010. Referred to Magistrate for Mandatory Settlement Conference to be held in August 2010. Parties agree to private mediation.(Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2009)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE to 76 Objection to Use of 386 Prosecution History During Claim Construction by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kent, Robert) (Filed on 11/10/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OBJECTIONS to Google's Use of the '386 Patent's Prosecution History in its Claim Construction Presentation by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 74 Joint Motion regarding equipment for tutorial and claim construction hearing on 11/12/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint MOTION and Proposed Order re Equipment for Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/4/2009) Modified on 11/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 11/2/2009) Modified on 11/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION re Additional Agreed-Upon Claim Constructions as to 33 Claim Construction Statement filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Jt. Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Amended))(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/28/2009) Modified on 10/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Christina D. Jordan as Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/6/2009) Modified on 10/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Robert John Kent, Jr., filed by Google Inc. (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2009) Modified on 10/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Howard Glenn Pollack, filed by Google Inc. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/6/2009) Modified on 10/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Statement of Recent Decision, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 10/1/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 56 Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support Thereof (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009) Modified on 9/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Declaration of Jayesh R. Bhakta in Support of 62 Reply Memorandum in Support of Claim Construction Brief filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 62 ) (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of 62 Reply Memorandum in Support of Claim Construction Brief filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 62 ) (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Reply Memorandum re Claim Construction Brief filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Declaration in Support of 66 Brief: Claim Construction filed byGoogle Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 65 *** (Related document(s) 66 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 BRIEF: Claim Construction filed byGoogle Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 65 *** (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 52 Statement, 58 Proposed Order, 57 Declaration in Support, 55 Proposed Order, 60 Notice, 53 Declaration in Support, 59 Certificate of Service, 54 Exhibits, 51 Claim Construction Statement, 56 Motion to Seal Document Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING re Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof filed by Google Inc. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 52 Statement, 58 Proposed Order, 57 Declaration in Support, 55 Proposed Order, 53 Declaration in Support, 54 Exhibits, 51 Claim Construction Statement, 56 Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Proposed Order re 56 Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support of 56 Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 56 ) (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof, filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Proposed Order re 51 Claim Construction Statement filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 EXHIBITS 3-6 re 53 Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 53 ) Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4 (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support of 51 Claim Construction Statement (REDACTED VERSION), filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 51 ) (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Appendix 1 to 51 Claim Construction Statement, filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (RESPONSIVE) - REDACTED VERSION filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/18/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order, by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 8/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That the Pruetz Law Group LLP and Lee Tran & Liang APLC will serve as counsel for Netlist, Inc., in place of Morrison & Foerster LLP. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 08/10/09. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Change In Counsel and Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 8/3/2009) Modified on 8/4/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Confirming Deposition Dates of Jayesh Bhakta and Jeffrey Solomon. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/31/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Declaration of Adrian M. Pruetz in Support of 44 Brief: Opening Claim Construction filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 44 ) (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 7/28/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Brief: Opening Claim Construction, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 7/28/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Confirming Deposition Dates of Jayesh Bhakta and Jeffrey Solomon, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 7/28/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Adrian Mary Pruetz, filed by Netlist, Inc. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Erica Jean Pruetz, filed by Netlist, Inc. (Pruetz, Erica) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero in response to Plaintiff's letter of 07/21/09, from Daniel A. Zlatnik, dated 07/24/09 (Zlatnik, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2009) Modified on 7/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Scheduling Deposition, from Christina D. Jordan, dated 07/21/09. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 7/21/2009) Modified on 7/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JOINT INSPECTION PROTOCOL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/25/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Proposed Order re Joint Inspection Protocol, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 6/24/2009) Modified on 6/25/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/19/2009 before Joseph C. Spero re: docket no. 34 on protocol for inspection of a Google server. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Dimissing Count of Contributory Infrigement Without Prejudice, signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/15/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) Modified on 6/16/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Discovery Dispute (Production Server), from L. Scott Oliver and Christina Jordan, dated 06/12/09. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2)(Miclean, David) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Dismissing Count of Contributory Infringement Without Prejudice, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING re 27 Joint Letter Brief Re: Netlist's Request for production No. 12 filed by Netlist, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/29/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 5/29/2009 before Joseph C. Spero re: Joint letter brief, docket no. 27. Parties to meet and confer and submit a joint letter brief or proposed form or order regarding the protocol for inspection of a server by 6/12/9. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: re 29 Discovery Hearing set for 5/29/2009 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE that the telephonic discovery hearing prev. set for 5/29/2009 at 9:30 AM has been ADVANCED TO THE SAME DAY, at 09:00 AM. The Court will initiate the phone contact. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE that a telephonic discovery hearing has been set for 5/29/2009 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re: Joint Discovery Letter. Court to initiate the phone contact. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Discovery Dispute (Production Server), from Counsel for Netlist and Google, dated 05/19/09 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 5/19/2009) Modified on 5/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 4/27/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 4/27/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for all Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/23/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Stipulated and Proposed Protective Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 4/22/2009) Modified on 4/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/12/2009 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Discovery due by 7/20/2009.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/19/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: re 22 Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2009 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: re 21 Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/12/2009 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/18/2009 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Claim Construction Hearing CONTINUED to 11/12/09 at 9:00 AM (Date Filed: 2/18/2009). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2009) Modified on 2/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2009 03:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 2/2/2009) Modified on 2/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2009 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/17/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 12/12/2008) Modified on 12/15/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Reply to Counterclaim by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Google Inc. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Netlist, Inc. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/21/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2009 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/20/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/20/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Netlist, Inc. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Netlist's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byNetlist, Inc.. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Maria Elena James on 11/3/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment (Miclean, David) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. of Summons and Complaint (Miclean, David) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2008. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/08. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Standing Order, # 2 Court Standing Order, # 3 Consent/Decline Form)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. re 1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Netlist, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611003825.). Filed byGoogle Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2008: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2008: # 5 Summons Issued) (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Netlist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Allison Altersohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Richard Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?