Wangson Biotechnology Group, Inc. v. Tan Tan Trading Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wangson Biotechnology Group, Inc.
Defendant: Tan Tan Trading Co., Inc. and Cathay Chinese Herbs
Case Number: 4:2008cv04212
Filed: September 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Cathay Chinese Herbs terminated., ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/15/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/21/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 24 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Within Which to File a Responsive Pleading; and Ex Parte Motion to Continue OSC re Preliminary Injunction (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008) Modified on 10/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 2 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wangson Biotechnology Group, Inc. v. Tan Tan Trading Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wangson Biotechnology Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Villagran Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tan Tan Trading Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathay Chinese Herbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?