In Re David Bruntz
Respondent: Thomas Fowlie
Case Number: 4:2008cv04613
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING WITH PREJUDICE 41 Motion to Dismiss. The letter of undertaking is released. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/7/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009) Modified on 10/8/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 36 Motion to Close Period for Filing of Claims and Default All Non-Appearing Potential Claimants (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009) Modified on 7/1/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER FOR MONITION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/8/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 3 Motion for Court Approval of Letter of Undertaking and Issuance of Monition or Injunction filed by David Bruntz. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/25/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009) Modified on 2/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR AD INTERIM STIPULATION re 5 Stipulation, Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/11/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Dismissal of Claim Limitation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/9/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009) Modified on 1/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re David Bruntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Fowlie
Represented By: Timothy Mark Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?