Werth et al v. Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe LLP et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs seek recovery of damages in the amount of 60 days' pay and ERISA benefits, unpaid wages, and vacation time on behalf of the employees of Defendant Heller Ehrman White & McAuliffe who were terminated because of Defendant's dissolution.

Plaintiff: Laura Werth, Carl Goodman and Anna Scarpa
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe LLP, Heller, Ehrman White & McAuliffe A Professional Corporation, Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Washington), P.S., Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe, A Professional Corporation, Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Oregon), P.C., Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Alaska), P.C. and Heller Ehrman (China), P.C.
Case Number: 4:2008cv04799
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 39 GRANTING STIPULATION selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Case referred to early neutral evaluation.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 4/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 granting Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Anna Scarpa, Laura Werth, Garfield Granett, Carl Goodman, Attorney Steven Aaron Blum for Laura Werth, Carl Goodman, Garfield Granett and Anna Scarpa added. Attorney Paul J. Lukas; Matthew C Helland and James Harvey Kaster terminated.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/2/09. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 granting as modified STIPULATION for a Court Order Extending Due Date for Responsive Pleading. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/9/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 1
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages, Restitution & Injunctive Relief & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe LLP, Heller; Ehrman White & McAuliffe A Professional Corporation; Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Washington), P.S.; Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe, A Professional Corporation; Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Oregon), P.C.; Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Alaska), P.C. & Heller Ehrman (China), P.C., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 3411024570] Filed by Plaintiffs Laura Werth, Carl Goodman & Anna Scarpa. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werth et al v. Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Werth
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Goodman
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Scarpa
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman White & McAuliffe A Professional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Washington), P.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe, A Professional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Oregon), P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller, Ehrman, White & McAuliffe (Alaska), P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller Ehrman (China), P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?