Goldstein v. Horsley et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Lee Goldstein
Defendant: Don Horsley, Greatrindle, Trisha Sanchez, Randleman, Carole Bowen and County of San Mateo
Case Number: 4:2008cv04840
Filed: October 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 41 Motion to Vacate ; granting 48 Motion for Settlement; denying 50 Motion to Stay; denying 58 Motion to Strike ; denying 61 Motion to Strike ; denying 34 Motion (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Complaint ; granting 26 Motion Copy of Original Complaint (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: That Plaintiff is hereby is to file copies of the Certificate of Funds and prisoner trust account statement, within thirty (30) days of this Order, re 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/12/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008) Modified on 12/15/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein v. Horsley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Lee Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Horsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatrindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?