Infuturia Global Ltd. v. Sequus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Infuturia Global Ltd.
Defendant: Sequus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Hebrew University of Jerusalem and Yechezkel Barenholz
Case Number: 4:2008cv04871
Filed: October 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Sequus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and against Plaintiff Infuturia Global Ltd.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/16/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009) Modified on 6/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER DEFERRING RULE 26 DISCLOSURES: to (20) twenty-days following filing/service of responsive pleadings by Sequus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/10/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING AS MOOT 60 Motion to Stay and GRANTING 126 Motion to Dismiss. all claims against Defendants The Hebrew University of Jerusalem and Yechezkel Barneholz in this action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009) Modified on 3/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstron, DENYING 37 Motion to Remand; DENYING AS MOOT 63 Ex Parte Motion to Stay or Continue; GRANTING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 24 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint within (20) twenty-days from the date of this Order. Defendant to file responsive pleadings within (20) twenty-days. The Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 04/01/09 at 3:15 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009) Modified on 2/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING Substitution of Attorney Thomas R. Duffy for The Hebrew University of Jerusalum. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/08/08. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infuturia Global Ltd. v. Sequus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infuturia Global Ltd.
Represented By: Clay Robbins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Billie Desiree Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hebrew University of Jerusalem
Represented By: Debra G. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yechezkel Barenholz
Represented By: Debra G. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?