Greenwood v. Compucredit Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Greenwood, Ladelle Hatfield and Deborah McCleese
Defendant: Compucredit Corporation and Columbus Bank and Trust
Case Number: 4:2008cv04878
Filed: October 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 417 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Administrator of Deborah McCleeses Estate for Deceased Plaintiff Deborah McCleese; MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Deborah McCleeses Claims With Prejudice, and to Voluntarily Dismiss the Claims of the UCL Class Without Prejudice (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 404 Motion to Withdraw. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS UNDER THE CREDIT REPAIR ORGANIZATIONS ACT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/3/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 397 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on November 23, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER Granting 372 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Motion to Compel Arbitration on Plaintiff's UCL Claim. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER Granting re 368 STIPULATED EXTENSION. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER Granting 364 Stipulation Extending Deadlines. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/16/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying defendants' 351 Motion for Certificate of Appealability (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER Granting 358 Stipulation REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING DATES. (to be filed) Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/16/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER by Judge Wilken denying 334 Motion to Decertify Class (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 324 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 307 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER re 323 Granting Stipulation Enlarging Time for Discovery. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/8/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 280 Motion (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 267 Plaintiffs' Motion for Verification of Class Size and Membership Pursuant to Class Certification Notice Plan (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 245 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 246 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 249 Motion to Compel (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 248 Stipulation, filed by Ladelle Hatfield, Wanda Greenwood, Compucredit Corporation, Deborah McCleese. Signed by MAgistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 24, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER Overruling Defendants' Objections to Proposed Third Party Administrator's Contract (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 237 Stipulation, filed by Ladelle Hatfield, Wanda Greenwood, Compucredit Corporation, Deborah McCleese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 7, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER re 223 CLASS CERTIFICATION NOTICE PLAN. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/23/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER with signature re 213 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Notice Plan filed by Columbus Bank and Trust (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010) Modified on 2/9/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***CORRECTION OF DOCUMENT # 218 ***
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 132 Motion to Certify Class (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 151 Response in Support, filed by Columbus Bank and Trust, 149 MOTION to Seal Document , Exhibit 9 to Docket Number 125 (125-9) and Exhibit 9 to Docket Number 130 (130-9) filed by Ladelle Hatfield, Wanda Greenwood, Deborah McClees e, 191 Response in Support filed by Columbus Bank and Trust, 183 MOTION to Seal Document Docket Number 172-1 and Docket Number 176-1 filed by Ladelle Hatfield, Wanda Greenwood, Deborah McCleese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 17, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE STIPULATED REQUEST for Order Extending Time for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Protective Orders and Shortening Time for Defendants' Reply re 118 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/5/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MODIFIED ORDER Granting re 115 Stipulation Changing Times Set Forth In Case Management Order, filed by Compucredit Corporation Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/24/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re 92 GRANTING STIPULATION Requesting Order Changing Time. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 87 VACATING HEARING DATE.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 71 TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 6/11/09 hearing vacated. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 5/8/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 17 Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying 27 Motion to Compel Arbitration (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwood v. Compucredit Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Greenwood
Represented By: Laurie Adrea Traktman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladelle Hatfield
Represented By: Laurie Adrea Traktman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah McCleese
Represented By: Laurie Adrea Traktman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compucredit Corporation
Represented By: David L. Hartsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Bank and Trust
Represented By: Tim A. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?